Infernal Technology, LLC et al v. Epic Games, Inc.
Plaintiff: INFERNAL TECHNOLOGY, LLC and TERMINAL REALITY, INC.
Defendant: EPIC GAMES INC. and Epic Games, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00516
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Earl Britt
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CORRECTED ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/10/2020. (Herrmann, L.)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/10/2020. (Herrmann, L.)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Epic Games, Inc.. (Van Arnam, Robert)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Financial Disclosure Statement by Epic Games, Inc. (Van Arnam, Robert)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Nicholas C. Kliewer on behalf of Infernal Technology, LLC, Terminal Reality, Inc.. (Kliewer, Nicholas)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Niky R. Bagley on behalf of Infernal Technology, LLC, Terminal Reality, Inc.. (Bagley, Niky)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Eric W. Buether on behalf of Infernal Technology, LLC, Terminal Reality, Inc.. (Buether, Eric)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Notice of Appearance filed by Robert C. Van Arnam on behalf of Epic Games, Inc.. (Van Arnam, Robert)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Van Arnam, Robert)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DISREGARD - Corrected document refiled at #15 . Notice of Appearance filed by Robert C. Van Arnam on behalf of Epic Games, Inc. (Van Arnam, Robert) Modified on 12/6/2019. (Herrmann, L.)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Notice of Appearance filed by Andrew Robert Shores on behalf of Epic Games, Inc.. (Shores, Andrew)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court: #14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint. (Herrmann, L.)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time #14 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Defendant has up to and including January 10, 2020, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 12/6/2019. (Hockaday, A.)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Michael C. Pomeroy on behalf of Infernal Technology, LLC, Terminal Reality, Inc.. (Pomeroy, Michael)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Michael D. Ricketts on behalf of Infernal Technology, LLC, Terminal Reality, Inc.. (Ricketts, Michael)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Christopher M. Joe on behalf of Infernal Technology, LLC, Terminal Reality, Inc.. (Joe, Christopher)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Infernal Technology, LLC, Terminal Reality, Inc.. (Borchers, Lynne)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Infernal Technology, LLC, Terminal Reality, Inc.. Epic Games, Inc. served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019. (Borchers, Lynne)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Herrmann, L.)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Peter D. Siddoway on behalf of Infernal Technology, LLC, Terminal Reality, Inc.. (Siddoway, Peter)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Lynne A. Borchers on behalf of Infernal Technology, LLC, Terminal Reality, Inc.. (Borchers, Lynne)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Epic Games, Inc. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*). (Rudd, D.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/15/2019: #1 Corrected flattened summons) (Rudd, D.).
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PATENT REPORT: Copy of report forwarded to Mail Stop 8, Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office, P.O. Box 1450 Alexandria, VA 22313-1450 via US Mail on November 15, 2019. (Rudd, D.)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by INFERNAL TECHNOLOGY, LLC, TERMINAL REALITY, INC. (Borchers, Lynne)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EPIC GAMES INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5184766.), filed by INFERNAL TECHNOLOGY, LLC, TERMINAL REALITY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 822 Patent, #2 Exhibit 2 - 488 Patent, #3 Exhibit 3 - '822 Claim Chart, #4 Exhibit 4 - '488 Claim Chart, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summons) (Borchers, Lynne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Infernal Technology, LLC et al v. Epic Games, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EPIC GAMES INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epic Games, Inc.
Represented By: Robert C. Van Arnam
Represented By: Andrew Robert Shores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INFERNAL TECHNOLOGY, LLC
Represented By: Lynne A. Borchers
Represented By: Michael D. Ricketts
Represented By: Peter D. Siddoway
Represented By: Michael C. Pomeroy
Represented By: Niky R. Bagley
Represented By: Christopher M. Joe
Represented By: Eric W. Buether
Represented By: Nicholas C. Kliewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERMINAL REALITY, INC.
Represented By: Lynne A. Borchers
Represented By: Michael D. Ricketts
Represented By: Peter D. Siddoway
Represented By: Michael C. Pomeroy
Represented By: Niky R. Bagley
Represented By: Christopher M. Joe
Represented By: Eric W. Buether
Represented By: Nicholas C. Kliewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?