Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC v. 0.961 Acre, +/-, in Johnston County, North Carolina, PIN No. 09-H-15-010-M, Described as Tract 1 in That Certain Deed Recorded in DB 2605, P. 113, Instrument No. 59667 et al
Plaintiff: Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC
Defendant: Monica Diann Lee and 0.961 Acre, +/-, in Johnston County, North Carolina, PIN No. 09-H-15-010-M, Described as Tract 1 in That Certain Deed Recorded in DB 2605, P. 113, Instrument No. 59667
Case Number: 5:2019cv00521
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15:717
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Filing 7 Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Kitchin, Henry)
December 9, 2019 Filing 6 Notice filed by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC regarding proof of service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Acceptance of Service for Monica Diann Lee and the real property owned thereby described in the Complaint) (Kitchin, Henry)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 12/9/2019. (Stouch, L.)
December 7, 2019 Filing 4 DEFENDANT LEE'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by 0.961 Acre, /-, in Johnston County, North Carolina, PIN No. 09-H-15-010-M, Described as Tract 1 in That Certain Deed Recorded in DB 2605, P. 113, Instrument No. 59667, Monica Diann Lee. (Lollar, Charles)
November 20, 2019 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Henry L. Kitchin, Jr on behalf of Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Kitchin, Henry)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Dominion Energy, Inc., Corporate Parent Duke Energy Corp., Corporate Parent Southern Company for Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Kitchin, Henry)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5188462.), filed by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits to Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1 - Depiction of Lee Property, #3 Exhibit 2 - FERC Certificate, #4 Exhibit 3 - Map Depicting Route of ACP Project, #5 Exhibit 4 - Plat of Lee Easements, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Notice of Filing of Complaint in Condemnation, #8 Notice Regarding Use of Notice of Filing in Lieu of Summons) (Kitchin, Henry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC v. 0.961 Acre, +/-, in Johnston County, North Carolina, PIN No. 09-H-15-010-M, Described as Tract 1 in That Certain Deed Recorded in DB 2605, P. 113, Instrument No. 59667 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC
Represented By: Henry L. Kitchin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Diann Lee
Represented By: Charles M. Lollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.961 Acre, +/-, in Johnston County, North Carolina, PIN No. 09-H-15-010-M, Described as Tract 1 in That Certain Deed Recorded in DB 2605, P. 113, Instrument No. 59667
Represented By: Charles M. Lollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?