United States of America v. Summers
Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: Ryan Matthew Summers
Case Number: 5:2019hc02281
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Earl Britt
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 18:4241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Respondent's Mental Health Examiner as to Dr. Hans Stelmach (Pereira, Diana)
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Diana Helene Pereira on behalf of Ryan Matthew Summers. (Pereira, Diana)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Hearing - Competency Hearing set for 2/24/2020 at 10:00 AM in Raleigh - 7th Floor - Courtroom 2 before Senior Judge W. Earl Britt. GRANTING #3 Motion to Seal and the court ORDERS that the parties file any future forensic evaluations or other psychological or psychiatric documents in this case under seal, whether such documents are produced by government evaluators, independent examiners appointed by order of this court, or other mental health professionals. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 10/17/2019. (Indig, A.)
October 16, 2019 Motion Submitted to Senior Judge W. Earl Britt regarding #3 MOTION to Seal Document #2 PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report . (Edwards, S.)
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Seal Document #2 PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Petre, Genna)
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 SEALED (Selected Participants Only)Forensic Report received as to Ryan Matthew Summers (available to: Respondent Ryan Matthew Summers, Petitioner United States of America). (Petre, Genna) Modified on 10/18/2019 to remove the word "proposed." (Indig, A.)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 Certificate of Mental Disease or Defect and Dangerousness Pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 4246 against Ryan Matthew Summers, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Mental Disease or Defect and Dangerousness, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Petre, Genna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Genna D Petre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ryan Matthew Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?