Williams v. The Hon. Warrant Issuing Judge et al
Plaintiff: Chad S. Williams
Defendant: Patterson, Judge Charles J. Siragusa, M.C.J. Lt., Monroe County Jail Nurse, Sandra Doorley, Wadale Abdallah, Judge Victoria M. Argento, Judge Christopher Ciacco, Prosecutor, George R. Martin, Monroe County Jail, Sergeant Shellard, U.S. Marshals, M.C.J Captain, Judge Geraci, M.C.J, Rochester Police Department, M.C.J. Administration, M. C. J. Superintendant, Elizabeth Buckley, Roosevelt Smith, Public Defender Supervisor, The Hon. Warrant Issuing Judge, C.C.S., Craig Gestring, RPD and US Federal Marshals'
Consolidated Defendant: Warden J. C. Holland, Dr. Gillespie Wadsworth and Counselor Mrs. Wiggins
Case Number: 5:2020ct03064
Filed: February 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Filing 58 Letter regarding case opening sent via US Mail to Chad S. Williams at Orleans Correctional Facility. (Indig, A.)
February 14, 2020 Filing 57 Case transferred in from District of New York Western. Case Number 1:16-cv-00115. transfer order and docket sheet obtained from transferring district.
February 14, 2020 Plaintiff mailed original complaint, #56 Order, a blank 1983 complaint form and instructions for filing an amended complaint. (SG) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER denying #31 Motion for Default Judgment; denying #34 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying #36 Motion to Amend or Correct; denying #37 Motion ; denying #38 Motion to Expedite; denying #39 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part #44 Motion to Amend or Correct; denying #45 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying #49 Motion ; denying #50 Motion ; denying #51 Motion ; denying #52 Motion ; denying #54 Motion ; denying #55 Motion for Entry of Default; that defendants Wadsworth, Wiggins, and Holland are severed and transferred to the Eastern District of North Carolina, and the determination of whether those claims will survive review under 28:1915(e)(2)(B) and 1915A is deferred to that court; granting leave to file an amended complaint within 30 days of the date of this order; if plaintiff does not file the amended complaint within 30 days of the date of this order, the Clerk of Court shall cause the U.S. Marshal to serve copies of the Summons, Consolidated Amended Complaint (Dkt. 33), this Order and the order entered 6/27/18 (Dkt. 30) upon defendant Shellard without plaintiff's payment therefore, unpaid fees to be recovered if this action terminates by monetary award in plaintiff's favor; if however, Plaintiff files another amended complaint, the Court will screen the new allegations before directing service; this Court certifies that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and leave to appeal as a person is Denied. Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 2/11/20. (SG) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
December 27, 2019 Filing 55 MOTION for Entry of Default against Counselor Mrs. Wiggins, J. C. Holland, Shellard, Gillespie Wadsworth by Chad S. Williams.(KM) (Main Document 55 replaced on 1/2/2020 to show all pages in correct position) (KM). (Original document maintained in case file due to poor legibility.) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
December 26, 2019 Filing 54 MOTION for explanation by Chad S. Williams.(KLH) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
December 16, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION Requesting Subpoenas by Chad S. Williams.(KM) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
October 21, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION for response regarding the status of the assigned attorney general by Chad S. Williams.(KLH) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
October 9, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION for the Defendants to be Properly Summoned by Chad S. Williams.(KM) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
October 2, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION Requesting the Court conduct the correct and proper procedure pertaining to the summons by Chad S. Williams.(KM) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 48 Status by Chad S. Williams (NRE) (Status update letter sent to Plaintiff.) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
August 29, 2019 Remark: Document No. #48 will be maintained in the Clerk's Office due to poor scan from paper size. (NRE) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
August 23, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE to U.S. Marshals Regarding Status of Service of Summons by Chad S. Williams. (NRE) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 46 SUPPLEMENTARY Summary Judgment Objection to Improper Conduct of the Court by Chad S. Williams (NRE) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
June 28, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Chad S. Williams.(KM) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
June 27, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION to Amend the Complaint by Chad S. Williams.(KLH) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
May 30, 2019 Filing 43 Supplemental Complaints and Summons by Chad S. Williams. (Attachments: #1 envelope) (KM) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
February 19, 2019 Filing 42 Letter from Chad S. Williams, dated 2/13/2019, to Judge Vilardo. (KM)(Original document maintained in case file due to poor legibility.) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
January 22, 2019 Filing 41 AMENDED SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Chad S. Williams. (KM) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
December 26, 2018 Filing 40 EXHIBIT A filed by Chad S. Williams. (KM) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
December 18, 2018 Filing 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Chad S. Williams.(KM) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
October 16, 2018 Summons Issued as to Counselor Mrs. Wiggins, J. C. Holland, Shellard, Gillespie Wadsworth. (KM) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
October 10, 2018 Filing 38 MOTION to Expedite Intervention by Chad S. Williams. (KLH) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
September 19, 2018 Filing 37 MOTION for Status Update directly from Judge Vilardo by Chad S. Williams.(NRE) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
August 23, 2018 Filing 36 MOTION to File an Amended Complaint by Chad S. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint)(KM) (Original document maintained in case file due to poor legibility) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
July 27, 2018 Filing 35 Sealed Document - Exhibit A to #34 motion for Reconsideration. (KM) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
July 27, 2018 Filing 34 MOTION for Reconsideration re #30 Order, by Chad S. Williams.(KM) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
July 26, 2018 Filing 33 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Counselor Mrs. Wiggins, J. C. Holland, Shellard, Gillespie Wadsworth, filed by Chad S. Williams.(KM) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
July 18, 2018 Remark - A copy of documents #30 , #12 from the first action, and documents #13 , #19 from the second action with a copy request form have been mailed to plaintiff at the new address. (KM) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
July 16, 2018 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. #30 Order with documents #12 , #13 , #19 and forms sent to Chad S. Williams. (KM) Modified on 7/18/2018 to show the correct documents mailed. (KM) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
July 11, 2018 Filing 32 DECLARATION for Entry of Default filed by Chad S. Williams. (KM) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
July 11, 2018 Filing 31 MOTION for Default Judgment by Chad S. Williams.(KM) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
June 28, 2018 Remark - Plaintiff mailed a copy of documents and forms pursuant to the #30 Order. (KM) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
June 28, 2018 **DISREGARD summons not issued entry entered in error**Summons and second amended complaint issued as to Shellard. The Clerks Office has forwarded the service packets to the US Marshal. (KM) Modified on 6/29/2018 (KM). [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER consolidating case 16-cv-723 with case 16-cv-115. The case number 16-cv-115 is designated as the lead case and 16-cv-723 will be closed. (Please review entire order for additional details). Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 6/27/2018. (KM) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
April 20, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION for a Complete Status Sheet by Chad S. Williams.(KM) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
April 20, 2018 Filing 28 DECLARATION filed by Chad S. Williams. (KM) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
April 17, 2018 Filing 27 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS - Proposed (Second) Amended Complaint regarding #25 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Chad S. Williams. (KLH) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
April 4, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Chad S. Williams.(KM) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
April 4, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION to File An Amended Complaint by Chad S. Williams.(KM) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
March 28, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number BUF059284. (KM) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
March 22, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION for Rule 64 by Chad S. Williams.(KM) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
January 19, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint by Chad S. Williams.(KM) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
March 23, 2017 Filing 21 AMENDMENT MOTION to #20 MOTION to Dismiss Due To Speedy Trial Violation and Recusal by Chad S. Williams.(KM) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
March 23, 2017 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss Speedy Trial Violation and Recusal by Chad S. Williams.(KM) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
October 28, 2016 Filing 19 Letter from Chad S. Williams, to Court Clerk. Copy request forms mailed to plaintiff. (KM) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
October 28, 2016 Address change from 98 Ridgeway Avenue, Rochester, NY 14615 to Federal Medical Center, P.O. Box 1600, Butner, NC 27509. (KM) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
October 3, 2016 Filing 18 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Chad S. Williams.(SG) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
June 28, 2016 Filing 17 MOTION for Court to Electronically file 9 Summary Judgment & Issue Restraining Order by Chad S. Williams.(KM) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
June 21, 2016 Filing 16 Letter from Chad Williams, dated 6/21/2016, to Hon. Judge Payson. (KM) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
May 9, 2016 Filing 15 MOTION Requesting Intervention by Chad S. Williams.(KM) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
May 3, 2016 Filing 14 MOTION To Cease and Desist by Chad S. Williams.(KM) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
May 3, 2016 Filing 13 MOTION To Proceed Pro Se by Chad S. Williams.(KM) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
April 13, 2016 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Wadale Abdallah, Victoria M. Argento, Elizabeth Buckley, Craig Gestring, Monroe County Jail, Patterson, Rochester Police Department, Shellard, Roosevelt Smith(Federal Probation Officer), U.S. Marshal's, filed by Chad S. Williams.(KM) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
March 29, 2016 Filing 11 MOTION Notice of Motion to Cease to Exist Retaliation Conducted by Defendants by Chad S. Williams.(KM) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
March 25, 2016 Filing 10 MOTION Requesting All Papers Filed by Plaintiff be Electronically Filed re 9 Affidavit by Chad S. Williams.(KM) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
March 24, 2016 Plaintiff's address updated from Monroe County Jail, 130 Plymouth Avenue, Rochester NY 14614 to 98 Ridgeway Avenue, Rochester NY 14615. (KM) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
March 23, 2016 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT in Support of Motion of Motion for Discovery and Summary Judgment by Chad S. Williams. Document manually filed. (KM) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
March 14, 2016 Filing 8 Letter from Chad Williams, dated 3/3/2016, to Clerk, U.S. District Court (KM) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
March 3, 2016 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Chad S. Williams.(KM) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
March 3, 2016 Filing 6 MOTION for Order to Show Cause, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Chad S. Williams.(KM) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
March 3, 2016 Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Chad S. Williams.(KM) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/8/2016: #1 envelope) (KM). [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
March 3, 2016 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Chad S. Williams.(KM) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
February 22, 2016 Filing 3 JUDGMENT shall administratively terminate this action and grant plaintiff leave to re-open the case.. Signed by Mary C. Loewenguth, Clerk of Court on 2/22/2016. (KM) Copy of judgment mailed to plaintiff. [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
February 19, 2016 Filing 2 -CLERK TO FOLLOW UP- ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to administratively terminate this action and granting plaintiff leave to move to re-open the case within 30 days of the date of this Order. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on February 19, 2016. (APG) (A copy of this Text Order and the attached Order have been sent to plaintiff by Chambers.) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
February 16, 2016 Case Reassigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Hon. Leslie G. Foschio no longer assigned to the case. (KM) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]
February 10, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wadale Abdallah, Elizabeth Buckley, C.C.S. Corporation, Sandra Doorley, Federal Prosecutor, Monroe County Jail Administration, Monroe County Jail Captain, Monroe County Jail Lt., Monroe County Jail Nurse, Monroe County Jail Superintendent, R.P.D., Shellard, Rosevelt Smith(Federal Probation Officer), Rosevelt Smith(Federal Probation Officer, Supervisor), Supervising Western District Judge Geraci, The Hon. Judge Ciacco, The Hon. Warrant Issuing Judge, US Federal Marshals', Western District Judge Charles J. Siragusa, filed by Chad S. Williams. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet, #2 envelope)(KM) [Transferred from New York Western on 2/14/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. The Hon. Warrant Issuing Judge et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Charles J. Siragusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.C.J. Lt.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monroe County Jail Nurse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Doorley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wadale Abdallah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Victoria M. Argento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Christopher Ciacco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prosecutor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George R. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monroe County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Shellard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Marshals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.C.J Captain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Geraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.C.J
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rochester Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.C.J. Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. C. J. Superintendant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roosevelt Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Public Defender Supervisor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hon. Warrant Issuing Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.C.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Gestring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RPD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Federal Marshals'
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Warden J. C. Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Dr. Gillespie Wadsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Counselor Mrs. Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad S. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?