Rankin Bey v. Curtis
Plaintiff: Napoleon J. Rankin Bey
Defendant: Dr. Clifford Curtis, NC Department of Public Safety and Ms. Flemaning
Case Number: 5:2020ct03187
Filed: May 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2020 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever,III regarding #5 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. Case also submitted for complaint review. (Indig, A.)
June 5, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees filed by Napoleon J. Rankin Bey. (Indig, A.)
June 5, 2020 Filing 4 CORRECTED COMPLAINT (on the form) against Clifford Curtis, Ms. Flemaning and NC Department of Public Safety filed by Napoleon J. Rankin Bey. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of Deficiency. The complaint is not on the forms prescribed for use by this court AND you must either file an application to proceed without prepayment of fees and affidavit or pay $400.00. Responses due by 6/19/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 5/29/2020. Copy of order and forms sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.)
May 28, 2020 Filing 2 Letter regarding case opening sent via US Mail to Napoleon J. Rankin Bey at Warren Correctional Institution. (Indig, A.)
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (in letter form) against Clifford Curtis filed by Napoleon J. Rankin Bey. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rankin Bey v. Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Napoleon J. Rankin Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Clifford Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NC Department of Public Safety
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Flemaning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?