Johnson v. Bennett et al
Plaintiff: Robert Johnson
Defendant: Melissa Morle, Shirley Bennett, Ms. Ramache, Cristal Vaughn, Dr. Clifford Curtis and Barbra Watson Hargrove
Case Number: 5:2020ct03198
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2020 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. (Indig, A.)
July 20, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION (in letter form) for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Robert Johnson. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.)
July 8, 2020 Filing 7 Letter from Robert H. Johnson regarding Sgt. Ramache's conduct, retaliation, etc. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.)
July 2, 2020 Filing 6 Letter from Robert H. Johnson regarding Sgt. Ramache's conduct, retaliation, etc. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Sellers, N.)
June 26, 2020 Filing 5 Letter from Robert Johnson correcting the spelling of defendant's name. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.)
June 17, 2020 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. (Indig, A.)
June 17, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION (in letter form) to Appoint Counsel filed by Robert Johnson. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.)
June 10, 2020 Case Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III for complaint review. (Indig, A.)
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 Letter regarding case opening sent via US Mail to Robert Johnson at Warren Correctional Institution. (Indig, A.)
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees filed by Robert Johnson. (Castania, M)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Shirley Bennett, Clifford Curtis, Barbra Watson Hargrove, Melissa Morle, Ms. Ramache, Cristal Vaughn, filed by Robert Johnson. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Castania, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Bennett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Morle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Ramache
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cristal Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Clifford Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbra Watson Hargrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?