Fraley v. Riddick et al
Plaintiff: Shawn Germaine Fraley
Defendant: Sergeant Riddick and Sergeant Dance
Case Number: 5:2020ct03222
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Filing 9 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement. (Indig, A.)
July 22, 2020 Case Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan for frivolity review. As soon as the screening is concluded, an order will issue and the next appropriate step will be taken. (Docket sheet mailed to plaintiff.) (Castania, M)
July 22, 2020 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. (Castania, M)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 7/21/2020. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.)
July 21, 2020 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. regarding #2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. (Castania, M)
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Shawn Germaine Fraley. (Castania, M)
July 9, 2020 Filing 6 TRUST FUND INFORMATION REQUESTED from NC Department of Public Safety. (Castania, M)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) - Response to Order due by 7/30/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 7/9/2020. Copy served via US Mail on plaintiff and on NC Department of Public Safety. (Castania, M)
July 8, 2020 Filing 4 Letter regarding case opening sent via US Mail to Shawn Germaine Fraley at Pasquotank Correctional Institution. (Indig, A.)
July 8, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Shawn Germaine Fraley. (Indig, A.)
July 8, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees filed by Shawn Germaine Fraley. (Indig, A.)
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sergeant Dance and Sergeant Riddick filed by Shawn Germaine Fraley. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Envelope) (Indig, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fraley v. Riddick et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Germaine Fraley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Riddick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Dance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?