Barnes v. Jones
Plaintiff: Cornelius Lamont Barnes
Defendant: George Frank Jones
Case Number: 5:2020ct03227
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Filing 8 Letter from Cornelius Barnes requesting a status update. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Response Letter) (Indig, A.)
July 23, 2020 Case Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III for complaint review. (Indig, A.)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 7/23/2020. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.)
July 23, 2020 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. regarding #2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. (Indig, A.)
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement. (Indig, A.)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 TRUST FUND INFORMATION REQUESTED. (Indig, A.)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act). Response to Order due by 8/7/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 7/17/2020. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 Letter regarding case opening sent via US Mail to Cornelius Lamont Barnes at Lenoir County Jail. (Indig, A.)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees filed by Cornelius Lamont Barnes. (Indig, A.)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against George Frank Jones filed by Cornelius Lamont Barnes. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnes v. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cornelius Lamont Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Frank Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?