Barnett v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Tracy Alan Barnett
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons and United States of America
Case Number: 5:2020ct03259
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this action is hereby dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 9/18/2020. Copy of judgment and notice of appellate right sent to plaintiff via U.S. Mail. (Poole, A)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - Plaintiff failed to comply with the magistrate judge's order. Accordingly, his action is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to prosecute. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 9/18/2020. Copy of order sent to plaintiff via U.S. Mail. (Poole, A)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of Deficiency. The complaint is not on the forms prescribed for use by this court. You must either file an application to proceed without prepayment of fees and affidavit or pay $400.00. Responses due by 9/8/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr., on 8/18/2020. Copy of order and forms sent to plaintiff via U.S. Mail. (Poole, A)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Letter regarding case opening sent via U.S. Mail to Tracy Alan Barnett at Butner - F.M.C. (Poole, A)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Order of Mandamus or Injunction filed by Tracy Alan Barnett. (Attachments: #1 Documents in Support, #2 Envelope) (Indig, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnett v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Alan Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?