Flynn v. Wilson et al
Plaintiff: Catherine M. Flynn
Defendant: John Doe Members of the Utilization Management Section, Stephen M Wilson, John and Jane Does, Medical Staff Employed by North Carolina Department of Public Safety and Vivian Poetter
Case Number: 5:2020ct03321
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Case transferred in from Western CV Division on 10/14/2020. Case Number 5:20-cv-521. (Collins, S.)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order - At the direction of the Court, and for the continued efficient administration of justice, the above-captioned case is redesignated as a Western Division Prisoner Civil Rights case. The Honorable Louise Wood Flanagan, United States District Judge, will remain the presiding judge. All future documents shall reflect the new case number of 5:20-CT-3321-FL. No further filing shall be made in 5:20-CV-521-FL. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/15/2020. (Collins, S.)
October 15, 2020 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Collins, S.)
October 9, 2020 Filing 9 Memorandum in Support regarding #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Vivian Poetter, Stephen M Wilson. (Wilson, Kristina)
October 9, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Vivian Poetter, Stephen M Wilson. (Wilson, Kristina)
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 Notice filed by Vivian Poetter, Stephen M Wilson regarding #1 Notice of Removal,, Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal in State Court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal to Federal Court) (Wilson, Kristina)
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 Financial Disclosure Statement by Vivian Poetter (Wilson, Kristina)
October 5, 2020 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by Stephen M Wilson (Wilson, Kristina)
October 5, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Kristina M. Wilson on behalf of Vivian Poetter, Stephen M Wilson. (Wilson, Kristina)
October 5, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by David Michael Fothergill on behalf of Vivian Poetter, Stephen M Wilson. (Fothergill, David)
October 5, 2020 Filing 2 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Counsel for Plaintiff, Stanley B. Green and Lindsey A. Bullard of Strauch Green & Mistretta, P.C. at 911 Paverstone Dr., Suite F, Raleigh, NC 27615 mailed via US Mail on October 5, 2020. (Rudd, D.)
October 5, 2020 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
October 5, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Vivian Poetter, Stephen M Wilson. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Vivian Poetter, Stephen M Wilson from Wake County Superior Court, case number 20 CVS 9656. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5652434), filed by Vivian Poetter, Stephen M Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Plaintiff's State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 Summons served on Def Wilson, #3 Exhibit 3 (Unfiled) State Court Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet) (Wilson, Kristina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flynn v. Wilson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Members of the Utilization Management Section
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen M Wilson
Represented By: Kristina M. Wilson
Represented By: David Michael Fothergill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does, Medical Staff Employed by North Carolina Department of Public Safety
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivian Poetter
Represented By: Kristina M. Wilson
Represented By: David Michael Fothergill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine M. Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?