Diop v. BMW of North America, LLC
Plaintiff: Ibrahima Diop
Defendant: BMW of North America, LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00025
Filed: January 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Referring Judge: Richard E Myers
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/11/2020. (Edwards, S.)
March 11, 2020 Filing 17 Memorandum in Support regarding #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by BMW of North America, LLC. (Wicker, Jackson)
March 11, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by BMW of North America, LLC. (Wicker, Jackson)
March 10, 2020 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time #12 . Defendant has up to and including March 11, 2020, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/10/2020. (Hockaday, A.)
March 10, 2020 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint . (Edwards, S.)
March 9, 2020 Filing 15 Financial Disclosure Statement by BMW of North America, LLC identifying Corporate Parent BMW (US) Holding Corp. for BMW of North America, LLC. (Mize, Leslie)
March 9, 2020 Filing 14 *CORRECTED AND REFILED AT DOCKET ENTRY #15 * - Financial Disclosure Statement by BMW of North America, LLC identifying Corporate Parent BMW (US) Holding Corp. for BMW of North America, LLC. (Mize, Leslie)
March 9, 2020 Filing 13 Memorandum in Support regarding #12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint filed by BMW of North America, LLC. (Mize, Leslie)
March 9, 2020 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint filed by BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Email chain, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Mize, Leslie)
March 9, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Vlad Hirnyk on behalf of Ibrahima Diop. (Hirnyk, Vlad)
March 9, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Leslie Lane Mize on behalf of BMW of North America, LLC. (Mize, Leslie)
March 9, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Jackson Dennis Wicker on behalf of BMW of North America, LLC. (Wicker, Jackson)
February 28, 2020 Filing 8 Notice directing plaintiff to proceed after failure to answer in accordance with Rule 55 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure within twenty-one (21) days of receipt of this notice. (Edwards, S.)
February 28, 2020 Filing 7 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Ibrahima Diop served on BMW of North America, LLC on 01/30/2020. (Serbin, Lawrence)
January 22, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to BMW of North America, LLC. *NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summonses and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4.* (Edwards, S.)
January 22, 2020 Notice to Counsel regarding: #2 Notice - other - Proposed Summons. Counsel is reminded that the court prefers flattened pdf fillable forms. Counsel should "flatten" the document prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No further action is needed. (Edwards, S.)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is reassigned to the Honorable Richard E. Myers II, United States District Judge, for all further proceedings. Chief United States District Judge Terrence W. Boyle is no longer assigned to the case. All future documents shall reflect the revised case number of 5:20-cv-25-M. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/22/2020. (Stouch, L.)
January 22, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Lawrence Brian Serbin on behalf of Ibrahima Diop. (Serbin, Lawrence)
January 22, 2020 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Ibrahima Diop (Serbin, Lawrence)
January 22, 2020 Filing 2 Notice filed by Ibrahima Diop Civil Cover Sheet. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) (Serbin, Lawrence) (Attachment 1 flattened and replaced on 1/22/2020) (Edwards, S.).
January 22, 2020 Notice to Counsel - No Summons provided for issuance or Waiver of Service filed. (Rudd, D.)
January 22, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint - Counsel failed to file a JS44 Civil Cover Sheet as required by the Court. Counsel should file a Cover Sheet using the event "Notice-Other" as soon as possible. (Rudd, D.)
January 22, 2020 Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
January 22, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Ibrahima Diop. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
January 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BMW of North America, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5274586.), filed by Ibrahima Diop. (Serbin, Lawrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diop v. BMW of North America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ibrahima Diop
Represented By: Lawrence Brian Serbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW of North America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?