Case v. Case
Plaintiff: Wan Wang Case
Defendant: Clifford Kevin Case
Case Number: 5:2020cv00042
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2020 Notice of Pro Se E-Noticing - Pro se party Wan Wang Case has consented to receiving electronic service of all motions, notices, orders, and documents in civil cases in the Eastern District of North Carolina. All documents filed in CM-ECF will be served on this party via email pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 5.1. (Stouch, L.)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/10/2020. Copy sent via US Mail to Wan Wang Case 10301 Falls Mill Dr., Apt. # 101, Raleigh, NC 27614. (Stouch, L.)
March 10, 2020 Filing 13 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Wan Wang Case. (Stouch, L.)
March 10, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Wan Wang Case (Stouch, L.)
March 3, 2020 Filing 11 Certificate of Service regarding #10 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Gene Tanner. (Stouch, L.)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney.. Signed by Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 2/25/2020. Copy sent via US Mail to Wan Wang Case 10301 Falls Mill Drive, Apartment 101, Raleigh, NC 27614 and Gene Tanner and Meredith Parker at 133 Fayetteville Suite, Suite 500, Raleigh, NC 27601. (Stouch, L.)
February 26, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Wan Wang Case. (Stouch, L.)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to File Manually. Signed by Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 2/25/2020. Copy sent via US Mail to Wan Wang Case 10301 Falls Mill Drive, Apartment 101, Raleigh, NC 27614 and Gene Tanner and Meredith Parker at 133 Fayetteville Suite, Suite 500, Raleigh, NC 27601. (Stouch, L.)
February 25, 2020 Motion Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #7 MOTION for Leave to File Manually. (Stouch, L.)
February 19, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File Manually filed by Wan Wang Case. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel, #3 Proposed Order allowing Withdrawal) (Stouch, L.)
February 12, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Clifford Kevin Case. (deRosset, Robert)
February 5, 2020 Filing 5 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's Counsel Meredith J. Parker and Gene Brentley Tanner of Parker Bryan Family Law at 133 Fayetteville Street, Suite 500, P. O. Box 1069, Raleigh, NC 27601 mailed via US Mail on February 5, 2020. (Rudd, D)
February 5, 2020 Remark - All defense counsel has complied by filing their notices of appearance. (Rudd, D.)
February 5, 2020 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
February 5, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew Burke on behalf of Clifford Kevin Case. (Burke, Matthew)
February 5, 2020 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Clifford Kevin Case (deRosset, Robert)
February 5, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Robert C. deRosset, IV on behalf of Clifford Kevin Case. (deRosset, Robert)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Clifford Kevin Case from Wake County Superior Court, case number 19 CvS 17089. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5299043), filed by Clifford Kevin Case. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Civil Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Servicemembers Civil Relief Act Affidavit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet) (deRosset, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Case v. Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wan Wang Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford Kevin Case
Represented By: Matthew Burke
Represented By: Robert C. deRosset, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?