Willis v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Brian K. Willis
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 5:2020cv00060
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Joint Motion to Stay. This matter is hereby stayed for a period of ninety (90) days. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 4/15/2020. (Collins, S.)
April 15, 2020 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #8 Joint MOTION to Stay. (Collins, S.)
April 14, 2020 Filing 9 Financial Disclosure Statement by Ford Motor Company (Golden, Abigail)
April 14, 2020 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Stay filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Golden, Abigail)
March 17, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Sergei Lemberg on behalf of Brian K. Willis. (Lemberg, Sergei)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER VACATING CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER - A conditional transfer order was filed in the actions on the attached schedule on March 3, 2020. In light of the recent Suggestion of Remand (ECF No. 1146) issued by the transferee judge, the Honorable Federico A. Moreno, it is ORDERED that the Panel's conditional transfer order designated as CTO-94" filed on March 3, 2020, is VACATED. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel, on 3/10/2020. (Collins, S.)
February 25, 2020 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Brian K. Willis. Ford Motor Company waiver sent on 2/24/2020, answer due 4/24/2020. (Serbin, Lawrence)
February 21, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ford Motor Company. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
February 21, 2020 Notice to Counsel regarding: [1-1] Exhibit. Counsel did not properly identify attachments pursuant to Section V.E. of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. Attachments must be clearly labeled (i.e., "Exhibit A" is not a sufficient description). Additionally, when filing a document with more than five attachments, the first attachment must be an index of all of the subsequent attached documents. *No further action is needed. (Rudd, D.)
February 21, 2020 Notice to Counsel - Counsel is reminded that the filing user must lock or flatten the PDF summons. Failure to flatten documents may result in the clerks office issuing a notice of deficiency. Counsel should "flatten" the document prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No further action is needed at this time. (Rudd, D.)
February 21, 2020 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Collins, S.)
February 21, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint - Counsel failed to file a JS44 Civil Cover Sheet as required by the Court. Counsel should file a Cover Sheet using the event "Notice-Other" as soon as possible. (Rudd, D.)
February 21, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTION regarding: Notice of Deficiency failure to file JS44 Civil Cover Sheet. Counsel filed the civil cover sheet as an attachment at [DE #2-1]. Counsel has complied with the court's requirement. No further action is needed. (Rudd, D.)
February 20, 2020 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Brian K. Willis (Serbin, Lawrence)
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Lawrence Brian Serbin on behalf of Brian K. Willis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Serbin, Lawrence)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5322560.), filed by Brian K. Willis, Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- A list of names, vehicle year, vehicle make, vehicle model and vehicle VIN, #2 Proposed Summons) (Serbin, Lawrence) Modified on 2/21/2020 to describe exhibit. (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willis v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Abigail A. Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian K. Willis
Represented By: Lawrence Brian Serbin
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?