Securities and Exchange Commission v. Beane et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Stacey L Beane, Justin N Deckert and Travis Laska
Case Number: 5:2020cv00095
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Referring Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 12:22
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2020 Filing 11 FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT JUSTIN N. DECKERT - Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 5/1/2020. (Sellers, N.)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND OTHER RELIEF AS TO DEFENDANT TRAVIS LASKA - Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 5/1/2020. (Sellers, N.)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND OTHER RELIEF AS TO DEFENDANT STACEY L. BEANE - Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 5/1/2020. (Sellers, N.)
May 1, 2020 Filing 8 SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Consent of Defendant Travis Laska to Order of Permanent Injunction And Other Relief by Securities and Exchange Commission (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Sullivan, Edward)
May 1, 2020 Filing 7 SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Consent of Defendant Stacey L. Beane to Order of Permanent Injunction And Other Relief by Securities and Exchange Commission (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Sullivan, Edward)
April 17, 2020 Filing 6 SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Consent of Travis Laska To Order of Permanent Injunction And Other Relief by Securities and Exchange Commission (Attachments: #1 Order of Permanent Injunction And Other Relief As to Defendant Travis Laska) (Sullivan, Edward)
April 17, 2020 Filing 5 SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Consent of Stacey L. Beane To Order of Permanent Injunction And Other Relief by Securities and Exchange Commission (Attachments: #1 Order of Permanent Injunction and Other Relief As To Defendant Stacey L. Beane) (Sullivan, Edward)
April 17, 2020 Notice to Counsel regarding: #5 Settlement Agreement, #6 Settlement Agreement. The main document in these docket entries are very difficult to read as they are faded and D.E. #5 is pixelated. Please re-file these documents with better copies. (Sellers, N.)
March 16, 2020 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. At the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned United States District Judge James C. Dever III for all further proceedings. United States District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan is no longer assigned to the case. All future filings shall reflect the revised case number of 5:20-CV-95-D. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/16/2020. (Hockaday, A.)
March 13, 2020 Notice to Counsel. Counsel's filings notate the incorrect division of court in the case number. The correct case number should read 5:20-cv-00095-FL and future filings should reflect this. No action needed at this time. (Collins, S.)
March 12, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Stacey L Beane, Justin N Deckert, Travis Laska. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Edward G. Sullivan on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission. (Sullivan, Edward)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Related Case filed by Securities and Exchange Commission . (Sullivan, Edward)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Injunctive and Other Relief against Stacey L Beane, Justin N Deckert, Travis Laska, filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Beane, #3 Proposed Summons Deckert, #4 Proposed Summons Laska, #5 Consent of Justin N. Deckert to Final Judgment, #6 Text of Proposed Order Final Judgment As to Justin N. Deckert, #7 Appearance of Edward G. Sullivan as Counsel for SEC) (Sullivan, Edward)
March 12, 2020 Notice to Counsel regarding: [1-7] Notice of Attorney Appearance - Notice of Appearance is a stand alone event. Counsel should refile the notice of appearance using the event "Notices - Notice of Attorney Appearance". (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Beane et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacey L Beane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin N Deckert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Laska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Edward G. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?