ALLEN v. CARY'S POLICE DEPARTMENT et al
Petitioner: DERRICK ALLEN
Respondent: N. COFFEY, TONI DEZOMITS and CARY'S POLICE DEPARTMENT
Case Number: 5:2020cv00144
Filed: April 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2020 Notice of Pro Se E-Noticing - Pro se party DERRICK ALLEN has consented to receiving electronic service of all motions, notices, orders, and documents in civil cases in the Eastern District of North Carolina. All documents filed in CM-ECF will be served on this party via email pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 5.1. (Stouch, L.)
April 27, 2020 Filing 15 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by DERRICK ALLEN. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Stouch, L.)
April 27, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by DERRICK ALLEN. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Stouch, L.)
April 23, 2020 Filing 13 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by DERRICK ALLEN. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Stouch, L.)
April 15, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to File Electronically filed by DERRICK ALLEN. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stouch, L.)
April 15, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Self-Representation filed by DERRICK ALLEN (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter requesting Financial Disclosure Statement Form, #2 Envelope) (Stouch, L.)
April 8, 2020 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank regarding #1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP. (Stouch, L.)
April 7, 2020 Filing 10 Notice to Pro Se Parties Regarding Transfer of Case to the Eastern District of North Carolina. The parties should read the notice in its entirety for additional information. (Rudd, D.)
April 7, 2020 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Middle. Case Number 1:19-cv-00969. Transfer order and docket sheet obtained from transferring district.
April 7, 2020 TEXT ORDER transferring this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. s 1406(a). Upon initial screening of this action, as required by 28 U.S.C. s 1915(e)(2), the Court noted apparent improper venue under 28 U.S.C. s 1391 and (via Text Order dated 11/18/2019) directed Plaintiff to show cause why the Court should not transfer the case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina, an apparent proper venue. Plaintiff thereafter filed #4 Motion to Show Cause, which (upon review) does not set forth grounds that establish proper venue in this Court or that counsel against transfer to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina. Accordingly, the Clerk shall transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina, where proper merits-based screening under Section 1915(e)(2) may occur. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 04/07/2020. (AULD, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/7/2020.]
April 6, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Signed Pro Se Electronic Service Consent by DERRICK ALLEN. Email address: 78derrickallen@gmail.com. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back) (Hicks, Samantha) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/7/2020.]
March 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by DERRICK ALLEN. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back) (Sheets, Jamie) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/7/2020.]
January 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address back to P.O. BOX 25419, DURHAM, NC 27702, filed by DERRICK ALLEN. (Sheets, Jamie) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/7/2020.]
January 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by DERRICK ALLEN, #10973, Durham County Jail, POB 771, Durham, NC 27701. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back) (Daniel, J) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/7/2020.]
December 2, 2019 Motions Referred: RE: #4 MOTION for Order to Show Cause, to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Garrett, Kim) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/7/2020.]
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Show Cause by DERRICK ALLEN. Response to Motion due by 12/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back)(Butler, Carol) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/7/2020.]
November 18, 2019 TEXT ORDER deferring ruling on #1 Application to Proceed IFP and requiring Plaintiff to show cause, on or before 12/09/2019, why this case should not be transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina, where the defendants apparently reside and where all material events underlying this action occurred. Failure by Plaintiff to comply with this order will result in the transfer of this case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 11/18/2019. (AULD, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/7/2020.]
September 25, 2019 Motion Referred to Magistrate Judge L. Patrick Auld RE: #1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP. (Coyne, Michelle) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/7/2020.]
September 20, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Standing Order 30. (Coyne, Michelle) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/7/2020.]
September 20, 2019 Case assigned to UNASSIGNED and MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Coyne, Michelle) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/7/2020.]
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (Coyne, Michelle) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/7/2020.]
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against CARY'S POLICE DEPARTMENT, N. COFFEY, TONI DEZOMITS, filed by DERRICK ALLEN. (Attachments: #1 COVER LETTER, #2 Envelope)(Coyne, Michelle) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/7/2020.]
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP by DERRICK ALLEN. (Coyne, Michelle) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/7/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALLEN v. CARY'S POLICE DEPARTMENT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: N. COFFEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: TONI DEZOMITS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CARY'S POLICE DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DERRICK ALLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?