Higgins v. Logan
Appellee: John F. Logan
Appellant: Melvin Higgins
Interested Party: Stephanie J. Butler
Case Number: 5:2020cv00156
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Docketing and Briefing Deadline regarding #7 Bankruptcy Record. Briefs must be filed in accordance with Rule 8018 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure. (Collins, S.)
May 26, 2020 Filing 11 Certificate of Readiness and Completion of Record filed by the Bankruptcy Court. (Donleycott, S.)
May 26, 2020 Filing 10 Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Donleycott, S.)
May 26, 2020 Filing 9 Transmitting copy of docket sheet. The Bankruptcy Court certifies that this is a true and accurate copy of the docket on file. (Donleycott, S.)
May 26, 2020 Filing 8 SEALED BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 6, 2020, before Judge David M. Warren. Court Reporter/Transcriber Dipti Patel. This document must be accessed through the originating Bankruptcy Court. (Donleycott, S.)
May 26, 2020 Filing 7 Appellant's Bankruptcy Record on Appeal filed. (Attachments: #1 Documents 1-15 from Designation) (Donleycott, S.)
April 27, 2020 Filing 6 Financial Disclosure Statement by John F. Logan (Staley, Stephen)
April 27, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Stephen Troy Staley on behalf of John F. Logan. (Staley, Stephen)
April 16, 2020 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Melvin Higgins (Sasser, Travis)
April 16, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Travis Philip Sasser on behalf of Melvin Higgins. (Sasser, Travis)
April 15, 2020 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
April 15, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Docketing and Briefing Deadline regarding #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Rudd, D.)
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 16-03043-5-DMW. (Attachments: #1 Judge David M. Warren's Order dated April 8, 2020) (Donleycott, S.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Higgins v. Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: John F. Logan
Represented By: Stephen Troy Staley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Melvin Higgins
Represented By: Travis Philip Sasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Stephanie J. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?