American Lighting and Signalization, LLC v. City of Rocky Mount
Plaintiff: American Lighting and Signalization, LLC
Defendant: City of Rocky Mount
Case Number: 5:2020cv00168
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING - Discovery Plan due by 7/17/20. Counsel should read attached order in its entirety for critical information and deadlines. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 6/12/2020. (Collins, S.)
June 10, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against American Lighting and Signalization, LLC by City of Rocky Mount. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Advertisement for Bids, #2 Exhibit B - Bid Response) (Castellino, Dylan)
June 10, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #13 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim. Counsel did not properly identify exhibits pursuant to Section V.E. of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual (i.e., "Exhibit" is not a sufficient description). A Counsel is directed to refile. (Collins, S.)
June 10, 2020 Filing 13 **CORRECTED AND REFILED AT #14 ** ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against American Lighting and Signalization, LLC by City of Rocky Mount. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Castellino, Dylan) Modified on 6/10/2020 (Collins, S.).
May 7, 2020 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #12 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Defendant has up to and including June 10, 2020, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 5/7/2020. (Hockaday, A.)
May 6, 2020 Notice to Counsel regarding: #11 Affidavit of Service. Counsel did not properly identify exhibits pursuant to Section V.E. of the CM/ECF Policies and ProceduresManual (i.e., "Exhibit" is not a sufficient description). The deputy clerk corrected the entry. No action by counsel is required. (Collins, S.)
May 6, 2020 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint. (Collins, S.)
May 5, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint, filed by City of Rocky Mount. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Ellis, J.)
May 5, 2020 Filing 11 Affidavit of Service for Complaint and Summons filed by American Lighting and Signalization, LLC served on C. Saunders Robertson, Jr. on 4-30-2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Copy of Certified Mail Card) (Gregson, Maxwell) Modified on 5/6/2020 to label exhibits. (Collins, S.).
May 5, 2020 Filing 10 Financial Disclosure Statement by City of Rocky Mount (Ellis, J.)
May 5, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Dylan J. Castellino on behalf of City of Rocky Mount. (Castellino, Dylan)
May 5, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by J. Nicholas Ellis on behalf of City of Rocky Mount. (Ellis, J.)
April 30, 2020 Filing 7 Financial Disclosure Statement by American Lighting and Signalization, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Utilicon Solutions, LLC, Corporate Parent Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC for American Lighting and Signalization, LLC. (Anthony, Phillip)
April 30, 2020 SECOND NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to American Lighting and Signalization, LLC. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Collins, S.)
April 29, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Phillip J. Anthony on behalf of American Lighting and Signalization, LLC. (Anthony, Phillip)
April 24, 2020 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Collins, S.)
April 24, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to City of Rocky Mount. *NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summonses and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4.* (Collins, S.)
April 23, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Maxwell Lee Gregson on behalf of American Lighting and Signalization, LLC. (Gregson, Maxwell)
April 23, 2020 Filing 3 Notice filed by American Lighting and Signalization, LLC regarding #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet. (Gregson, Maxwell)
April 23, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0417-5399800. (Agiovlassitis, J.)
April 23, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to American Lighting and Signalization, LLC. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
April 23, 2020 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
April 23, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint - Counsel failed to file a JS44 Civil Cover Sheet as required by the Court. Counsel should file a Cover Sheet using the event "Notice-Other" as soon as possible. (Rudd, D.)
April 23, 2020 Notice to Counsel regarding: #2 Notice - other Proposed Summons - Counsel is reminded that the filing user must lock or flatten the PDF document. Failure to flatten documents may result in the clerks office issuing a notice of deficiency. Counsel should "flatten" the proposed summons prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No further action is needed. (Rudd, D.)
April 23, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint - Payment of the civil filing fee is due upon case initiation. Payments can be made in the form of cash, checks, or credit cards and paid at the clerk's office. Credit card payments can be made over the telephone to the clerk's office during regular business hours. Also, Pay.gov is an additional credit card option that allows the file to pay the filing fee contemporaneously with the case opening in CM/ECF. (See Section V.D(1)(a) of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. (Rudd, D.)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 Notice filed by American Lighting and Signalization, LLC regarding #1 Complaint Proposed Summons. (Gregson, Maxwell) (Main Document 2 flattened and replaced on 4/24/2020) (Edwards, S.).
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by American Lighting and Signalization, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Bid information, #2 Exhibit B- Letter to Steve Lowe dated 2/12/2018) (Gregson, Maxwell) Modified on 4/23/2020 to describe exhibits. (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Lighting and Signalization, LLC v. City of Rocky Mount
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Lighting and Signalization, LLC
Represented By: Maxwell Lee Gregson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Rocky Mount
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?