Kaneria et al v. Kendall et al
Plaintiff: VISHVKUMAR RAMESHBAI KANERIA, DEVKUMAR KANERIA, YASH GHANSHYAM MARADIA and SMITKUMAR PURUSHOTTAM KANERIA
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, Chad F. Wolf and SARAH KENDALL
Case Number: 5:2020cv00209
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2020 Filing 19 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Devkumar Kaneria, Smitkumar Purushottam Kaneria, Vishvkumar Rameshbai Kaneria, Yash Ghanshyam Maradia served on All defendants, United States Attorney's Office, and Attorney General on June 1, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (proof of service - Kendall), #2 Exhibit B (proof of service - Cuccinelli), #3 Exhibit C (proof of service - Wolf), #4 Exhibit D (proof of service - USCIS), #5 Exhibit E (proof of service - DHS), #6 Exhibit F (proof of service - USAO), #7 Exhibit G (proof of service - AG)) (Reingold, Steven)
June 1, 2020 Filing 18 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Steven C. Reingold on behalf of Devkumar Kaneria, Smitkumar Purushottam Kaneria, Vishvkumar Rameshbai Kaneria, Yash Ghanshyam Maradia. (Reingold, Steven)
May 26, 2020 Filing 17 Financial Disclosure Statement by Yash Ghanshyam Maradia (Clark, Daniel)
May 26, 2020 Filing 16 Financial Disclosure Statement by Vishvkumar Rameshbai Kaneria (Clark, Daniel)
May 26, 2020 Filing 15 Financial Disclosure Statement by Devkumar Kaneria (Clark, Daniel)
May 26, 2020 Filing 14 Financial Disclosure Statement by Smitkumar Purushottam Kaneria (Clark, Daniel)
May 22, 2020 Filing 13 Summonses Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Sellers, N.)
May 22, 2020 Filing 12 Notice filed by Devkumar Kaneria, Smitkumar Purushottam Kaneria, Vishvkumar Rameshbai Kaneria, Yash Ghanshyam Maradia regarding #1 Complaint, SUMMONS TO WILLIAM P. BARR, ATTORNEY GENERAL. (Clark, Daniel)
May 22, 2020 Filing 11 Notice filed by Devkumar Kaneria, Smitkumar Purushottam Kaneria, Vishvkumar Rameshbai Kaneria, Yash Ghanshyam Maradia regarding #1 Complaint, SUMMONS TO THE OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY, EDNC. (Clark, Daniel)
May 22, 2020 Filing 10 Notice filed by Devkumar Kaneria, Smitkumar Purushottam Kaneria, Vishvkumar Rameshbai Kaneria, Yash Ghanshyam Maradia regarding #1 Complaint, SUMMONS TO THE OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY, EDNC. (Clark, Daniel)
May 21, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Sarah Kendall, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, Chad F. Wolf. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Sellers, N.)
May 21, 2020 Filing 8 Notice filed by Devkumar Kaneria, Smitkumar Purushottam Kaneria, Vishvkumar Rameshbai Kaneria, Yash Ghanshyam Maradia regarding #1 Complaint, SUMMONS TO UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Clark, Daniel)
May 21, 2020 Filing 7 Notice filed by Devkumar Kaneria, Smitkumar Purushottam Kaneria, Vishvkumar Rameshbai Kaneria, Yash Ghanshyam Maradia regarding #1 Complaint, SUMMONS TO UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Clark, Daniel)
May 21, 2020 Filing 6 Notice filed by Devkumar Kaneria, Smitkumar Purushottam Kaneria, Vishvkumar Rameshbai Kaneria, Yash Ghanshyam Maradia regarding #1 Complaint, SUMMONS TO CHAD F. WOLF. (Clark, Daniel)
May 21, 2020 Filing 5 Notice filed by Devkumar Kaneria, Smitkumar Purushottam Kaneria, Vishvkumar Rameshbai Kaneria, Yash Ghanshyam Maradia regarding #1 Complaint, SUMMONS TO SARAH KENDALL. (Clark, Daniel)
May 21, 2020 Filing 4 Notice filed by Devkumar Kaneria, Smitkumar Purushottam Kaneria, Vishvkumar Rameshbai Kaneria, Yash Ghanshyam Maradia regarding #1 Complaint, SUMMONS TO KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI. (Clark, Daniel)
May 21, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Daniel W. Clark on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Clark, Daniel)
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Daniel W. Clark on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Clark, Daniel)
May 21, 2020 Notice to Counsel regarding: #3 Notice of Special Appearance. Each attorney must file his or her own notice of appearance. The CM/ECF electronic filing and docketing system does not recognize filings made on behalf of other attorneys for purposes of appearing on the court's docket. The appropriate form for becoming a registered e-filer in this district is available to out of district counsel on this court's website www.nced.uscourts.gov. (Sellers, N.)
May 21, 2020 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel shall file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
May 21, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Devkumar Kaneria, Smitkumar Purushottam Kaneria, Vishvkumar Rameshbai Kaneria, Yash Ghanshyam Maradia. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
May 21, 2020 Notice to Counsel - No Summons provided for issuance or Waiver of Service filed. (Rudd, D.)
May 21, 2020 Notice to Counsel - Counsel is reminded that the filing user must lock or flatten the PDF document. Failure to flatten documents may result in the clerks office issuing a notice of deficiency. Counsel should "flatten" the civil cover sheet prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No action is needed. (Rudd, D.)
May 21, 2020 Notice to Counsel - Counsel has not provided proposed summons(es) for all of the necessary parties for service of this action. You must prepare and file the additional proposed summons(es) as required by Rule 4(I) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Sellers, N.)
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND MANDAMUS RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5434677.), filed by YASH GHANSHYAM MARADIA, SMITKUMAR PURUSHOTTAM KANERIA, VISHVKUMAR RAMESHBAI KANERIA, DEVKUMAR KANERIA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Clark, Daniel) (Attachment 1 flattened and replaced on 6/15/2020) (Edwards, S.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaneria et al v. Kendall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SARAH KENDALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VISHVKUMAR RAMESHBAI KANERIA
Represented By: Daniel W. Clark
Represented By: Steven C. Reingold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEVKUMAR KANERIA
Represented By: Daniel W. Clark
Represented By: Steven C. Reingold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YASH GHANSHYAM MARADIA
Represented By: Daniel W. Clark
Represented By: Steven C. Reingold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SMITKUMAR PURUSHOTTAM KANERIA
Represented By: Daniel W. Clark
Represented By: Steven C. Reingold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?