Sanders v. GNC Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Todd D. Sanders, Sr.
Defendant: Casey Winters, Josh McDowell, Kent Williams, Lekeisha Burke and GNC Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv00238
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2020 Filing 8 OBJECTION to #7 Memorandum and Recommendations by Todd D. Sanders, Sr. (Sellers, N.)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER & MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Todd D. Sanders, Sr. Objections to Memorandum and Recommendations due by 7/22/2020. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 7/8/2020. (Sellers, N.)
July 7, 2020 Filing 6 Notice filed by GNC Holdings, Inc. NOTICE OF SUGGESTION OF PENDENCY OF BANKRUPTCY AND AUTOMATIC STAY OF PROCEEDINGS. (Eggleston, Tracy)
July 7, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Tracy L. Eggleston on behalf of GNC Holdings, Inc.. (Eggleston, Tracy)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Todd D. Sanders, Sr. Motion referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 6/10/2020. (Sellers, N.)
June 10, 2020 Notice of Pro Se E-Noticing - Pro se party Todd D. Sanders, Sr has consented to receiving electronic service of all motions, notices, orders, and documents in civil cases in the Eastern District of North Carolina. All documents filed in CM-ECF will be served on this party via email pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 5.1. (Sellers, N.)
June 5, 2020 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Sellers, N.)
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Todd D. Sanders, Sr. (Rudd, D.)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Todd D. Sanders, Sr. (Rudd, D.)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Todd D. Sanders, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint 1, #2 Proposed Complaint 2, #3 Notice of Suit Rights, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons Burke, #6 Proposed Summons GNC, #7 Proposed Summons Williams, #8 Proposed Summons Winters, #9 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons Lekeisha Burke, #10 Waiver of the Service of Summons - Lakeisha Burke, #11 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waiver Service of a Summons GNC Holdings, Inc. (GNC), #12 Waiver of the Service of Summons - General Nutrition Corporation, #13 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to aiver Service of a Summons Josh McDowell, #14 Waiver of the Service of Summons - Josh McDowell, #15 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons Kent Williams, #16 Waiver of the Service of Summons - Kent Williams, #17 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons Casey Winters, #18 Wiaver of the Service of Summons - Casey Winters) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders v. GNC Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lekeisha Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GNC Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Tracy L. Eggleston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd D. Sanders, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?