Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company v. Gonzalez et al
Plaintiff: Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Paula Ruiz, S. J. Seabrook, Inc. and Arnoldo Gonzalez
Case Number: 5:2020cv00241
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Appointing Mediator. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/30/2020. Copy sent via US Mail to Barbara (Bonnie) B. Weyher at Yates McLamb & Weyher LLP, One Bank of America Plaza, 421 Fayetteville Street, Suite 1200, Raleigh, North Carolina 27601. (Stouch, L.)
July 30, 2020 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Arnoldo Gonzalez, Paula Ruiz. (Weeks, Stevenson)
July 24, 2020 Filing 22 Selection of Barbara (Bonnie) B. Weyher as mediator filed by Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Connor, Heather)
July 24, 2020 NOTICE TO COUNSEL - Pursuant to Local ADR Rule 101.1c(a), counsel is reminded that the parties must file a written statement identifying an agreed upon mediator within twenty one (21) days of the entry of the Scheduling Order. If a statement is not timely filed, the Clerk of Court will appoint a mediator from the list of court certified mediators. Selection of Mediator must be electronically filed on or before 8/13/2020. (Sellers, N.)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/1/2021. Motions due by 3/16/2021. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for additional critical deadlines and information. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank on 7/23/2020. (Sellers, N.)
July 22, 2020 Remark - #20 Rule 26(f) Report referred to US Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank for the entry of a scheduling order. (Stouch, L.)
July 21, 2020 Filing 20 Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by Arnoldo Gonzalez, Paula Ruiz. (Newton, J.)
July 17, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion regarding #15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Connor, Heather)
July 14, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #8 Counterclaim by Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Connor, Heather)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 6/29/2020. (Stouch, L.)
June 29, 2020 Filing 16 Memorandum in Support regarding #15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Arnoldo Gonzalez, Paula Ruiz. (Weeks, Stevenson)
June 29, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Arnoldo Gonzalez, Paula Ruiz. (Weeks, Stevenson)
June 29, 2020 Filing 14 Notice filed by Arnoldo Gonzalez, Paula Ruiz of filing Index of Exhibits. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Services Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Answer (20-CVS-1268)) (Weeks, Stevenson)
June 29, 2020 Filing 13 Financial Disclosure Statement by Arnoldo Gonzalez (Weeks, Stevenson)
June 29, 2020 Filing 12 Financial Disclosure Statement by Paula Ruiz (Weeks, Stevenson)
June 29, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance filed by J. Jefferson Newton on behalf of Arnoldo Gonzalez, Paula Ruiz. (Newton, J.)
June 29, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Stevenson L. Weeks on behalf of Arnoldo Gonzalez, Paula Ruiz. (Weeks, Stevenson)
June 26, 2020 Filing 9 Financial Disclosure Statement by S. J. Seabrook, Inc. (Smyth, Theodore)
June 26, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company by S. J. Seabrook, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Account Application) (Smyth, Theodore)
June 26, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Theodore B. Smyth on behalf of S. J. Seabrook, Inc.. (Smyth, Theodore)
June 24, 2020 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Stouch, L.)
June 17, 2020 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company. Paula Ruiz waiver sent on 6/10/2020, answer due 8/9/2020. (Connor, Heather)
June 17, 2020 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company. Arnoldo Gonzalez waiver sent on 6/10/2020, answer due 8/9/2020. (Connor, Heather)
June 5, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Heather Graham Connor on behalf of Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Connor, Heather)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Arnoldo Gonzalez, Paula Ruiz, S. J. Seabrook, Inc. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
June 5, 2020 Notice to Counsel - Counsel did not properly identify attachments pursuant to Section V.E. of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. Attachments must be clearly labeled (i.e., "Exhibit A" is not a sufficient description). Additionally, when filing a document with more than five attachments, the first attachment must be an index of all of the subsequent attached documents. *No further action is needed. (Rudd, D.)
June 5, 2020 Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
June 5, 2020 Notice to Counsel - The address information in the signature block for Heather Connor on the complaint does not match the information that the court has in its CM/ECF database. Counsel should email the updated law firm information to the clerk's office at NCED-Attorney-Update@nced.uscourts.gov Once updated, the new contact information will be reflected on the docket of all cases in which counsel entered an appearance. (Rudd, D.)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Allied Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Allied Holdings, Inc. for Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Connor, Heather)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5455747.), filed by Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Copy of Johnston County Superior Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- Insurance Policy Information, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons) (Connor, Heather) Modified on 6/5/2020 to describe exhibits. (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company v. Gonzalez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Ruiz
Represented By: J. Jefferson Newton
Represented By: Stevenson L. Weeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. J. Seabrook, Inc.
Represented By: Theodore B. Smyth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnoldo Gonzalez
Represented By: J. Jefferson Newton
Represented By: Stevenson L. Weeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Heather Graham Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?