Youngblood v. Saul
Plaintiff: Ernest Youngblood
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 5:2020cv00242
Filed: June 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:206
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Returned Executed by Personal Service on US Attorney as to Andrew Saul served on 6/22/2020, answer due 8/21/2020. (Collins, S.)
July 6, 2020 Filing 8 Process Receipt and Return served on Commissioner of Social Security on 6/23/20. (Collins, S.)
July 6, 2020 Filing 7 Process Receipt and Return served on US Attorney General on 6/23/20. (Collins, S.)
June 9, 2020 Remark - Certified copy of Order #4 and file-stamped copies of summonses, complaint, notice of appearance and financial disclosure statement forwarded to U.S. Marshal, along with USM-285 forms. (Collins, S.)
June 9, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Collins, S.)
June 8, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul filed by Ernest Youngblood. (Collins, S.)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is DIRECTED to file the complaint and issue the summonses prepared by Plaintiff, and the United States Marshal is DIRECTED to serve the summonses and a copy of the complaint on Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr on 6/8/2020. (Collins, S.)
June 8, 2020 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Collins, S.)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Ernest Youngblood (Arrowood, Derrick)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Derrick Kyle Arrowood on behalf of Ernest Youngblood. (Arrowood, Derrick)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Ernest Youngblood. (Attachments: #1 US Marshal Form, #2 Complaint, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Arrowood, Derrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Youngblood v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Youngblood
Represented By: Derrick Kyle Arrowood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?