Clean & Sober Media, LLC v. Renew Counseling Center of NC, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Clean & Sober Media, LLC
Defendant: DOES 1-10, Renew Counseling Center of NC, LLC, Giani Rivera, Norma Negron, Frankie Kennedy and Kornelia Purcell
Case Number: 5:2020cv00252
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard E Myers
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Filing 15 Financial Disclosure Statement by Norma Negron, Renew Counseling Center of NC, LLC, Giani Rivera (Biller, Anthony)
July 27, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,, with Jury Demand by Kornelia Purcell. (Wall, F.)
July 27, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance filed by F. Marshall Wall on behalf of Kornelia Purcell. (Wall, F.)
July 27, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Norma Negron and Giani Rivera. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Waddell, K.)
July 27, 2020 Filing 12 Financial Disclosure Statement by Renew Counseling Center of NC, LLC (Biller, Anthony)
July 27, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,, by Norma Negron, Renew Counseling Center of NC, LLC, Giani Rivera. (Biller, Anthony)
July 14, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Kevin J. Leichter on behalf of Clean & Sober Media, LLC. (Leichter, Kevin)
July 14, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Andrew E. Hewitt on behalf of Clean & Sober Media, LLC. (Hewitt, Andrew)
July 2, 2020 TEXT ORDER granting the Consent Motion for Extension of Time #8 filed by Defendants Renew Counseling Center of NC, LLC, Norma Negron, and Giani Rivera. For good cause shown, it is ordered that these defendants have up to and including July 27, 2020, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/2/2020. (Hockaday, A.)
July 2, 2020 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint. (Waddell, K.)
July 2, 2020 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint, filed by Norma Negron, Renew Counseling Center of NC, LLC, Giani Rivera. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Biller, Anthony)
July 2, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Emily M. Haas on behalf of Norma Negron, Renew Counseling Center of NC, LLC, Giani Rivera. (Haas, Emily)
July 2, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Anthony J. Biller on behalf of Norma Negron, Renew Counseling Center of NC, LLC, Giani Rivera. (Biller, Anthony)
June 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE: Summons Issued as to Frankie Kennedy, Norma Negron, Kornelia Purcell, Renew Counseling Center of NC, LLC, Giani Rivera. *Counsel shall print the attached summonses and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4.* (Waddell, K.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/11/2020: #1 CORRECTED SUMMONSES ISSUED)*Counsel shall print the attached CORRECTED summonses and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4.* (Waddell, K.).
June 11, 2020 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Waddell, K.)
June 11, 2020 REMINDER TO COUNSEL regarding #1 . Pursuant to Judge Myers Practice Preferences, counsel shall provide a courtesy copy of any motion, memorandum, or brief which exceeds 30 pages or of any exhibits which exceed a total of 30 pages, by mailing or delivering to the attention of the Clerk, U.S. District Court, 1003 South 17th Street, Wilmington, NC 28401. The courtesy copies of any motion, memorandum, or brief and supporting exhibits which exceed a combined total of 100 pages shall be submitted in a three-ring binder. (Waddell, K.)
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 COPYRIGHT REPORT: Copy of report and complaint forwarded to the Register of Copyrights located at the Copyright Office, Library of Congress, Washington, DC 20559 via US Mail on June 11, 2020. (Rudd, D.)
June 11, 2020 Notice to Counsel - Counsel did not properly identify attachments pursuant to Section V.E. of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. Attachments must be clearly labeled (i.e., "Exhibit" is not a sufficient description). *No further action is needed at this time. (Rudd, D.)
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Clean & Sober Media, LLC (Stanfield, Kevin)
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Kevin J. Stanfield on behalf of Clean & Sober Media, LLC. (Stanfield, Kevin)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number 0417-5463948), filed by Clean & Sober Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit A- Article 1 "Control, or Myth of It: Mental Health and Addiction", #3 Exhibit B- Article "Control, or the Myth of It: Mental Health and Addiction", #4 Exhibit C- Article 2 "What It's Like to Be on Methadone During a Pandemic", #5 Exhibit D- Article "What It's Like to B on Methadone During a Pandemic", #6 Exhibit E- Article 3 "Before and After I Got Sober: Musings on Creativity", #7 Exhibit F- Article "Before and After I Got Sober: Musings on Creativity", #8 Exhibit G- Article 4 "Relapses Could Increase Amid COVID-19; Here's How to Stay Safe", #9 Exhibit H- Article "Relapses Could Increase Amid COVID-19; Here's How to Stay Safe", #10 Exhibit I- Article 5 "Practicing Our Principles In Perilous Times", #11 Exhibit J- Article "Practicing Our Principles In Perilous Times", #12 Exhibit K- Article 6 "Ne Study Supports AA's Effectiveness but Professionals Caution", #13 Exhibit L- Article "New Study Supports AA's Effectiveness but Professionals Caution", #14 Exhibit M- Article 7 "Ho Recovery Prepared Us for Coronavirus", #15 Exhibit N- Article "How Recovery Prepared Us for Coronavirus", #16 Exhibit O- Article 8 "Evolution and Alcoholics Anonymous", #17 Exhibit P- Article "Evolution and Alcoholics Anonymous", #18 Exhibit Q- Article 9 "6 Ways to Stay Sane and Not Despair During a Pandemic", #19 Exhibit R- Article "6 Ways to Stay Sane and Not Despair During a Pandemic", #20 Exhibit S- Article 10 "Recovery and Religion: Conflict and Solutions", #21 Exhibit T- Article "Recovery and Religion: Conflict and Solutions", #22 Civil Cover Sheet, #23 Proposed Summons) (Stanfield, Kevin) Modified on 6/11/2020 to describe exhibits. (Rudd, D.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clean & Sober Media, LLC v. Renew Counseling Center of NC, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renew Counseling Center of NC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giani Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norma Negron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frankie Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kornelia Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clean & Sober Media, LLC
Represented By: Kevin J. Stanfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?