Buxton R. Bailey, P.C. et al v. Wolf et al
Plaintiff: President Buxton Reed Bailey and Buxton R. Bailey, P.C.
Defendant: Acting Secretary Chad F. Wolf, Chief Barbara Q Velarde, Senior Official Matthew T Albence, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, Barbara Q Velarde and Chad F. Wolf
Case Number: 5:2020cv00253
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard E Myers
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2020 Filing 12 Affidavit of Service for Return of Service of Process filed by Buxton Reed Bailey, Buxton R. Bailey, P.C. served on Wolf/Chad F, Cuccinelli/Kenneth T, Velarde/Barbara Q, Albence/Matthew T on 07/01/2020. (Bailey, Buxton)
July 9, 2020 Notice to Counsel regarding: #12 Affidavit of Service, #11 Affidavit of Service, #10 Certificate of Service, Affidavit of Service. In future filings, the case number should read 5:20-CV-253-M. No action by counsel required at this time. (Waddell, K.)
July 6, 2020 Filing 11 Affidavit of Service for Service of Process filed by Buxton Reed Bailey, Buxton R. Bailey, P.C. served on William Barr, U.S. Atty. General on 07/02/2020. (Bailey, Buxton)
July 6, 2020 Filing 10 Affidavit of Service for Service of Process filed by Buxton Reed Bailey, Buxton R. Bailey, P.C. served on Civil Process Clerk on 07/01/2020. (Bailey, Buxton) Modified on 7/6/2020 to correct docket text (Waddell, K.).
June 12, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Matthew T. Albence, Barbara Q. Velarde, Chad F. Wolf, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli. Counsel shall print the attached summonses and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. (Waddell, K.)
June 12, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to service on behalf of US Attorney and Attorney General. Counsel shall print the attached summonses and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. (Waddell, K.)
June 11, 2020 Filing 7 Notice filed by Buxton R. Bailey, P.C. proposed summons/civil process clerk. (Bailey, Buxton)
June 11, 2020 Filing 6 Notice filed by Buxton R. Bailey, P.C. proposed summons/Barr, William. (Bailey, Buxton)
June 11, 2020 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by Buxton Reed Bailey. (Bailey, Buxton)
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Buxton R. Bailey, P.C. (Bailey, Buxton).
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Buxton Reed Bailey on behalf of Buxton Reed Bailey. (Bailey, Buxton)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Buxton Reed Bailey on behalf of Buxton R. Bailey, P.C.. (Bailey, Buxton)
June 11, 2020 Notice to Counsel regarding: #1 . The defendant is a government agency or employee, and summonses are required for the agency or employee, the U.S. Attorney General and the U.S. Attorney Civil Process Clerk. Counsel should use the event "Notice-Other" to file the summonses. (Waddell, K.)
June 11, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint - The Notice of Appearance is a stand alone document. Counsel is direct to refile the notice of appearance using the event "Notices - Notice of Appearance". (Rudd, D.)
June 11, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint - The Financial Disclosure Statement is a stand alone document. Counsel is directed to refile the financial disclosure statements using the event "Other Documents - Financial Disclosure Statement". (Rudd, D.)
June 11, 2020 Notice to Counsel - A party who is proceeding without an attorney shall file a notice of self representation pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(b). (Rudd, D.)
June 11, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTION regarding: #4 Financial Disclosure Statement, #5 Financial Disclosure Statement. Removed text identifying party having a corporate parent, as no such relationship was indicated on the financial disclosures attached. (Waddell, K.)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5463995.), filed by Buxton R. Bailey, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Corp. Disclosure for BRB individually, #7 Corp Disclosure for BRBPC, #8 appearance) (Bailey, Buxton) Modified docket text to correct filing fee receipt number on 7/9/2020 (Waddell, K.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buxton R. Bailey, P.C. et al v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary Chad F. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Barbara Q Velarde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Senior Official Matthew T Albence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Q Velarde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: President Buxton Reed Bailey
Represented By: Buxton Reed Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Buxton R. Bailey, P.C.
Represented By: Buxton Reed Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?