Liu v. Eaton Corporation
Plaintiff: Hong Liu
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Case Number: 5:2020cv00255
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2020 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time #11 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Defendant has up to and including September 8, 2020, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/8/2020. (Hockaday, A.) Modified on 7/9/2020 to show that Pro se plaintiff has consented to receiving electronic service of all motions, notices, orders, and documents in civil cases in the Eastern District of North Carolina. (Collins, S.).
July 7, 2020 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint or Otherwise Plead. (Collins, S.)
July 2, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint or Otherwise Plead filed by Eaton Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Smith, Ann)
July 2, 2020 Filing 10 Financial Disclosure Statement by Eaton Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Eaton Corporation plc for Eaton Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Smith, Ann)
July 2, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Janean Bryant Dunn on behalf of Eaton Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Dunn, Janean)
July 2, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Ann Herlocker Smith on behalf of Eaton Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Smith, Ann)
June 25, 2020 Filing 7 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Hong Liu. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Collins, S.)
June 18, 2020 Notice of Pro Se E-Noticing - Pro se party has consented to receiving electronic service of all motions, notices, orders, and documents in civil cases in the Eastern District of North Carolina. All documents filed in CM-ECF will be served on this party via email pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 5.1. (Collins, S.)
June 16, 2020 Filing 5 Letter from S. Collins, Deputy Clerk, to Hong Liu regarding deficient Financial Disclosure Statement. (Collins, S.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/16/2020: #1 Amended Letter) (Collins, S.).
June 12, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Eaton Corporation. Summons issued at intake. (Rudd, D.)
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 **CORRECTED AND REFILED AT #7 ** Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Hong Liu. (Rudd, D.) Modified on 6/16/2020 TO INDICATE THAT PLAINTIFF MISTAKENLY FILED ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT. (Collins, S.). Modified on 6/25/2020 (Collins, S.).
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Hong Liu. (Rudd, D.)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hong Liu (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number RAL079066), filed by Hong Liu. (Attachments: #1 Complaint 2, #2 Attachment A - Summary, #3 Exhibit Notice of Suit Rights, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liu v. Eaton Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hong Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?