National Coatings & Supplies, Inc. et al v. Valley Forge Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Single Source, Inc. and National Coatings & Supplies, Inc.
Defendant: Valley Forge Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2020cv00275
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard E Myers
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by National Coatings & Supplies, Inc., Single Source, Inc.. (McDougal, Gregg)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Counsel is reminded to read the Order in its entirety for critical information and deadlines. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/27/2020. (Waddell, K.)
July 27, 2020 REMINDER TO COUNSEL regarding #13 and #14 . Pursuant to Judge Myers Practice Preferences, counsel shall provide a courtesy copy of any motion, memorandum, or brief which exceeds 30 pages or of any exhibits which exceed a total of 30 pages, by mailing or delivering to the attention of the Clerk, U.S. District Court, 1003 South 17th Street, Wilmington, NC 28401. The courtesy copies of any motion, memorandum, or brief and supporting exhibits which exceed a combined total of 100 pages shall be submitted in a three-ring binder. (Waddell, K.)
July 24, 2020 Filing 14 Memorandum in Support regarding #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Valley Forge Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Transcript of Preliminary Injunction Hearing, #2 Exhibit B - Order Granting Michigan Insurance Company's Motion for Summary Disposition) (Welch, Jennifer)
July 24, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Valley Forge Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Executive Order No. 121, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Policy # PMT 6079579447) (Welch, Jennifer)
July 1, 2020 Filing 12 Financial Disclosure Statement by Single Source, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent National Coatings & Supplies, Inc. for Single Source, Inc.. (Worrell, Henry)
July 1, 2020 Filing 11 Financial Disclosure Statement by National Coatings & Supplies, Inc. (Worrell, Henry)
July 1, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Henry Denton Worrell on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Worrell, Henry)
July 1, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Lawrence Russell Duke on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Duke, Lawrence)
July 1, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Gregg E. McDougal on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (McDougal, Gregg)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Counsel is reminded to read the Order in its entirety for critical information and deadlines. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 6/22/2020. (copy of order sent to Gregg E. McDougal, H. Denton Worrell, and Lawrence R. Duke, counsel for plaintiffs, at McDougal Worrell LLP, 316 W. Edenton Street, Suite 100, Raleigh, NC 27603. (Waddell, K.)
June 19, 2020 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. (Waddell, K.)
June 19, 2020 Notice to Counsel regarding: #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The incorrect event has been selected. Counsel should have filed the document using the Motion for Extension of Time to Answer event. The deputy clerk clarified the docket text. Counsel is also reminded that the case number on the pleadings should read as 5:20-CV-275-M. No action by counsel is required. (Waddell, K.)
June 18, 2020 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Valley Forge Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Smyth, Theodore) Modified on 6/19/2020 to correct document description (Waddell, K.).
June 17, 2020 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Waddell, K.)
June 17, 2020 Filing 5 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Counsel for Plaintiff, Gregg E. McDougal, H. Denton Worrell and Lawrence R. Duke of McDougal Worrell, LLP at 316 W. Edenton Street, Suite 100, Raleigh, N.C. 27603 mailed via US Mail on June 17, 2020. (Rudd, D.)
June 17, 2020 Notice to Counsel - Counsel is reminded that the filing user must lock or flatten the PDF document. Failure to flatten documents may result in the clerks office issuing a notice of deficiency. Counsel should "flatten" the Financial Disclosure Statement prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. *No further action is needed. (Rudd, D.)
June 17, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Theodore B. Smyth on behalf of Valley Forge Insurance Company. (Smyth, Theodore)
June 17, 2020 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Valley Forge Insurance Company (Welch, Jennifer) (Main Document 3 flattened and replaced on 7/8/2020) (Edwards, S.).
June 17, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Jennifer A. Welch on behalf of Valley Forge Insurance Company. (Welch, Jennifer)
June 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Valley Forge Insurance Company from Wake County Superior Court, case number 20 CVS 5094. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5474835), filed by Valley Forge Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Removal Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - Civil Summons to State Court Action, #4 Exhibit B - State Court Suit, #5 Exhibit C - State Court Removal Action) (Welch, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Coatings & Supplies, Inc. et al v. Valley Forge Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Single Source, Inc.
Represented By: Henry Denton Worrell
Represented By: Gregg E. McDougal
Represented By: Lawrence Russell Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Coatings & Supplies, Inc.
Represented By: Henry Denton Worrell
Represented By: Gregg E. McDougal
Represented By: Lawrence Russell Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley Forge Insurance Company
Represented By: Theodore B. Smyth
Represented By: Jennifer A. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?