Robinson v. Saul
Plaintiff: Margie L. Robinson
Defendant: Commissioner Andrew M. Saul and Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 5:2020cv00285
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Filing 9 USM 285 Forms and USPS Return Receipt - Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint served on US Attorney General on 7/24/2020. (Stouch, L.)
July 31, 2020 Filing 8 USM 285 Form - Summons Returned Executed by Personal Service as to Andrew M. Saul served on 7/28/2020, answer due 9/26/2020. (Stouch, L.)
July 30, 2020 Filing 7 USM 285 Form - Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Andrew M. Saul on 7/21/2020. (Stouch, L.)
July 2, 2020 Remark: Certified copy of #4 Order and file-stamped copies of summonses and complaint forwarded to the United States Marshal for service, along with USM-285 Forms. (Sellers, N.)
July 2, 2020 Filing 6 Summonses Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Sellers, N.)
July 2, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul, filed by Margie L. Robinson. (Sellers, N.)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 7/1/2020. (Sellers, N.)
June 19, 2020 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Sellers, N.)
June 19, 2020 Notice to Counsel - Counsel is reminded that the filing user must lock or flatten the PDF document. Failure to flatten documents may result in the clerks office issuing a notice of deficiency. Counsel should "flatten" the USM 285 Process Receipt and Return prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No further action is needed. (Rudd, D.)
June 18, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Michael W. Bertics on behalf of Margie L. Robinson. (Bertics, Michael)
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Margie L. Robinson (Bertics, Michael)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Margie L. Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 USM 285, #7 USM 285, #8 USM 285) (Bertics, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margie L. Robinson
Represented By: Michael W. Bertics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?