MacGregor v. Sink, Trustee
Interested Party: Stephanie J. Butler
Appellant: Bannor Michael MacGregor
Appellee: Kevin L. Sink, Trustee
Case Number: 5:2020cv00318
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Referring Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Motion Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #6 MOTION for Leave to Appeal. (Stouch, L.)
June 25, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #6 MOTION for Leave to Appeal filed by Kevin L. Sink, Trustee. (Sink, Kevin)
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appeal filed by Bannor Michael MacGregor. (Stouch, L.)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - At the direction of the Court, and for the continued efficient administration of justice, the above-captioned case is reassigned to the Honorable Terrence W. Boyle, Chief United States District Judge, for all further proceedings. United States District Judge James C. Dever III is no longer assigned to the case. All future documents shall reflect the revised case number of 5:20-CV-318-BO. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 6/24/2020. Sent to Bannor Michael MacGregor at 1024 Merrion Avenue Apt. 216 Durham, NC 27703 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
June 22, 2020 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Kevin L. Sink, Trustee (Sink, Kevin)
June 22, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Kevin L. Sink on behalf of Kevin L. Sink, Trustee. (Sink, Kevin)
June 22, 2020 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel shall file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
June 22, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Docketing and Briefing Deadline regarding #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. A Copy of notice mailed via US Mail to Bannor Michael MacGregor at 1024 Merrion Avenue, Apt. 216, Durham, NC 27703. (Rudd, D.)
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-03113-5-DMW. (Attachments: #1 Judge David M. Warren's Order dated June 4, 2020, #2 Judge David M. Warren's Order dated June 5, 2020) (Donleycott, S.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MacGregor v. Sink, Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Stephanie J. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Bannor Michael MacGregor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Kevin L. Sink, Trustee
Represented By: Kevin L. Sink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?