Kirby v. State of North Carolina
Plaintiff: Kenda R. Kirby
Defendant: State of North Carolina
Case Number: 5:2020cv00344
Filed: June 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Kenda R. Kirby. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Receipts, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #6 Envelope) (Stouch, L.)
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to State of North Carolina. Copy sent via US Mail to plaintiff Kenda R. Kirby 7493 County Road 73, Coyle, OK 73027. (Attachments: #1 Letter) (Stouch, L.) (Stouch, L.).
June 26, 2020 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Kenda R. Kirby. (Rudd, D.)
June 26, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Kenda R. Kirby. (Rudd, D.)
June 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against State of North Carolina (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number RAL0079538), filed by Kenda R. Kirby. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Various documents from 5:13-CV-850-FL, #2 Exhibit B- Documents from the Fourth Circuit and the Supreme Court, #3 Exhibit C- Various documents regarding student loans, #4 Exhibit D- Timeline of Events, #5 Appendix A- Judgment and Opinion from the Fourth Circuit rearding 5:13-CV-850-FL, #6 Appendix B- Order & Judgment dated 3/11/2015 in case 5:13-CV-850-FL, #7 Appendix C- Memorandum & Recommendaton from 5:13-CV-850-FL, #8 Attachment 1- On Appeal No. 18-1289, #9 Attachment 2- Petition for Writ of Certiorari 18-1289, #10 Attachment 3 - Documents regarding Fourth Circuit case 18-1289, #11 Attachment 4- Flowchart, #12 Attachment 5- Copy of Mandate and other documents regarding 5:17-CV-371-BO, #13 Attachment 6- Cop of various documents from 5:17-CV-37-BO, #14 Attachment 7- Document Entitled "Correction", #15 Attachment 8- Documnt Entitled: Appliction for Extension of Time to Re-File Petition for Writ of Certiorari and Pay Fee, #16 Attachment 9- Supreme Court 15-8399 Petition for Writ of Certiorari, #17 Attachment 10- Letter from the Supreme Court dated 11/19/2015, #18 Attachment 11- Plaintiff's Response, #19 Attachment 12- Documents regarding 5:13-CV-850, #20 Attachment 13- Documents regarding 5:13-CV-850, #21 Civil Cover Sheet, #22 Cover Page, #23 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #24 Waiver of the Service of Summons, #25 Proposed Summons, #26 Envelope) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirby v. State of North Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenda R. Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of North Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?