Blount v. Ajinomoto Health and Nutrition
Plaintiff: David Lee Blount
Defendant: Ajinomoto Health and Nutrition
Case Number: 5:2020cv00356
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance filed by Regina Worley Calabro on behalf of Ajinomoto Health and Nutrition. (Calabro, Regina)
October 8, 2020 Filing 13 Financial Disclosure Statement by Ajinomoto Health and Nutrition (Erwin, Brodie)
October 8, 2020 Filing 12 Memorandum in Support regarding #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Ajinomoto Health and Nutrition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -1 Declaration of Tobie Haskins) (Erwin, Brodie)
October 8, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Ajinomoto Health and Nutrition. (Erwin, Brodie)
October 8, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Brodie D. Erwin on behalf of Ajinomoto Health and Nutrition. (Erwin, Brodie)
September 29, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Ajinomoto Health and Nutrition served on 9/17/2020, answer due 10/8/2020. (Tripp, S.)
September 18, 2020 Filing 8 Supplement to #5 Complaint filed by David Lee Blount. (Tripp, S.)
September 2, 2020 Remark - Certified copy of Order #6 and file-stamped copies of summons, complaint, notice of appearance and financial disclosure statement forwarded to U.S. Marshal, along with USM-285 form. (Collins, S.)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Ajinomoto Health and Nutrition. (Attachments: #1 USM285 Process Form) (Collins, S.)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations regarding #4 Order and Memorandum and Recommendations. Plaintiff's retaliation claim is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Where plaintiff's hostile work environment claim survives frivolity review under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B), the clerk is DIRECTED to serve plaintiff's complaint by a United States marshal or deputy marshal in accordance with Rule 4(c)(3). Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 9/2/2020. (Pro se party has consented to receiving electronic service of all motions, notices, orders, and documents in civil cases in the Eastern District of North Carolina.) (Collins, S.)
September 1, 2020 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #4 Order and MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS. (Collins, S.)
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Ajinomoto Health and Nutrition filed by David Lee Blount. (Collins, S.)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER and MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATION - The court will grant Blount's motion to proceed IFP (D.E. #1 ) and allow his Title VII hostile work environment claim to proceed. But the undersigned recommends the district court dismiss Blount's Title VII retaliation claim for failure to state a claim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 8/14/2020. (Castania, M) Modified on 8/18/2020 to indicate that Pro se party has consented to receiving electronic service of all motions, notices, orders, and documents in civil cases in the Eastern District of North Carolina. (Collins, S.)
July 15, 2020 Notice of Pro Se E-Noticing - Pro se party has consented to receiving electronic service of all motions, notices, orders, and documents in civil cases in the Eastern District of North Carolina. All documents filed in CM-ECF will be served on this party via email pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 5.1. (Collins, S.)
July 9, 2020 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Collins, S.)
July 7, 2020 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by David Lee Blount. (Rudd, D.)
July 7, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Self-Representation filed by David Lee Blount. (Rudd, D.)
July 7, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by David Lee Blount. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blount v. Ajinomoto Health and Nutrition
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Lee Blount
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ajinomoto Health and Nutrition
Represented By: Brodie D. Erwin
Represented By: Regina Worley Calabro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?