Goree v. The Shaw University et al
Plaintiff: DiShondra Goree
Defendant: The Shaw University and Alfonza Carter
Case Number: 5:2020cv00360
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 TEXT ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time #14 . For good cause shown and with the consent of Defendants, it is ordered that Plaintiff has up to and including September 18, 2020, within which to respond to the Motion to Dismiss #11 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 9/2/2020. (Hockaday, A.)
September 2, 2020 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. (Stouch, L.)
September 1, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by DiShondra Goree. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Byrd, Quintin)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/17/2020. (Stouch, L.)
August 14, 2020 Filing 12 Memorandum in Support regarding #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Alfonza Carter, The Shaw University. (Blue, Daniel)
August 14, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Alfonza Carter, The Shaw University. (Blue, Daniel)
July 21, 2020 Filing 10 Financial Disclosure Statement by DiShondra Goree (Byrd, Quintin)
July 21, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Quintin D. Byrd on behalf of DiShondra Goree. (Byrd, Quintin)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. Alfonza Carter answer due 8/14/2020; The Shaw University answer due 8/14/2020. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/15/2020. Copy sent via US Mail to Quintin D. Byrd of Q Byrd Law at 9121 Anson Way, Suite 200, Raleigh, NC 27615. (Stouch, L.)
July 15, 2020 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Unopposed). (Stouch, L.)
July 15, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Unopposed) filed by Alfonza Carter, The Shaw University. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Blue, Daniel)
July 10, 2020 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Stouch, L.)
July 10, 2020 Filing 6 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Counsel for Plaintiff Quintin D. Byrd of Q Byrd Law at 9121 Anson Way, Suite 200, Raleigh, NC 27615 mailed via US Mail on July 10, 2020. (Rudd, D.)
July 8, 2020 Filing 5 Notice filed by Alfonza Carter, The Shaw University regarding #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet and Removal Cover Sheet. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet) (Blue, Daniel)
July 8, 2020 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Alfonza Carter (Blue, Daniel)
July 8, 2020 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by The Shaw University (Blue, Daniel)
July 8, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Daniel T. Blue, III on behalf of All Defendants. (Blue, Daniel)
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Shaw University, Alfonza Carter from NC Superior Ct, Wake Co, case number 20-CVS-500112. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5507778), filed by The Shaw University, Alfonza Carter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Process and Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Notice to Clerk of Filing of Joint Notice of Removal) (Blue, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goree v. The Shaw University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DiShondra Goree
Represented By: Quintin D. Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Shaw University
Represented By: Daniel T. Blue, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfonza Carter
Represented By: Daniel T. Blue, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?