Williamson v. Bridgestone Americas, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: William Williamson
Defendant: John Deere Company, GREENE TWEED & COMPANY, INC., DCO LLC, f/k/a DANA COMPANIES, LLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, National Automotive Parts Association (aka NAPA), Bridgestone Americas, Inc., DANLY MACHINE DIVISION OF CONNELL LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, Union Carbide Corporation, General Electric Corporation, Hyster Company, Caterpillar Inc., Ford Motor Company, NIDEC MINSTER CORPORATION, Genuine Parts Company, Hyster-Yale Materials Handling, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Pneumo Abex Corporation, MORSE TEC, LLC, Kelsey-Hayes Company, DCO LLC, National Automotive Parts Association and Genuine Parts Company individually and d/b/a NAPA, and d/b/a Rayloc, a/k/a NAPA
Case Number: 5:2020cv00377
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting #154 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Union Carbide Corporation WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 11/23/2021. (Waddell, K.)
November 22, 2021 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #154 Joint MOTION to Dismiss, #153 Joint MOTION to Dismiss. (Sellers, N.)
November 19, 2021 Filing 156 WITHDRAWAL of Motion by Union Carbide Corporation. regarding #119 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Union Carbide Corporation (McDonald, Moffatt)
November 19, 2021 Filing 155 WITHDRAWAL of Motion by Kelsey-Hayes Company. regarding #121 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Kelsey-Hayes Company (McDonald, Moffatt)
November 19, 2021 Filing 154 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by Union Carbide Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (McDonald, Moffatt)
November 19, 2021 Filing 153 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by Kelsey-Hayes Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (McDonald, Moffatt)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER granting #137 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Caterpillar Inc., improperly named as a successor-in-interest to Prentice Hydraulics, Inc., in this matter. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 11/16/2021. (Sellers, N.)
November 16, 2021 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #137 Joint MOTION to Dismiss. (Sellers, N.)
November 15, 2021 Filing 151 Statement of Material Facts regarding #142 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ford Motor Company. (Kiger, Christopher)
November 15, 2021 Filing 150 Memorandum in Support regarding #148 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by John Deere Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 10.20.20 Deposition of William Williamson, #2 Exhibit B - 10.29.20 Deposition of William Williamson) (Tomlin, Tracy)
November 15, 2021 Filing 149 Statement of Material Facts regarding #148 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by John Deere Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - 10.20.20 Deposition of William Williamson, #3 Exhibit C - 10.29.20 Deposition of William Williamson) (Tomlin, Tracy)
November 15, 2021 Filing 148 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by John Deere Company. (Tomlin, Tracy)
November 15, 2021 Filing 147 Memorandum in Support regarding #146 MOTION in Limine Daubert Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Drs. Bedrossian, Finkelstein and Brody filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit A - Cases Excluding Each and Every Exposure Theory, #3 Exhibit B - Bedrossian 5-1-2018 Deposition, #4 Exhibit C - Williamson Video Depostion - 10-20-2021, #5 Exhibit D - Finkelstein Deposition - Williamson, #6 Exhibit E - Bedrossian Deposition - Ratcliff 3-6-19, #7 Exhibit F - Williamson Disc Deposition - 10-29-2021, #8 Exhibit G - Finkelstein General Report, #9 Exhibit H - Finkelstein Friction Report, #10 Exhibit I - Brody Report - Williamson, #11 Exhibit J - Bedrossian Report - Williamson, #12 Exhibit K - Roggli Affidavit, #13 Exhibit L - Bedrossian Report - Ratcliff, #14 Exhibit M - Finkelstein Deposition - Walls 04-05-21, #15 Exhibit N - Bedrossian - Williamson 100621, #16 Exhibit O - Langer 2003, #17 Exhibit P - Fisher study 1997, #18 Exhibit Q - Fubini_1997, #19 Exhibit R - Valentine Study, #20 Exhibit S - Bernstein 2014, #21 Exhibit T - Bernstein 2015, #22 Exhibit U - Dr. Alexander_Report_Williamson, #23 Exhibit V - Brody Trial Testimony - Herring, #24 Exhibit W - Garabrant 2016, #25 Exhibit X - Goodman 2004 Meta Analysis, #26 Exhibit Y - Thomsen et al. 2021) (Ries, Addie)
November 15, 2021 Filing 146 MOTION in Limine Daubert Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Drs. Bedrossian, Finkelstein and Brody filed by Ford Motor Company. (Ries, Addie)
November 15, 2021 Filing 145 Memorandum in Support regarding #144 MOTION in Limine Daubert Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert David Rosner filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit A - Williamson Deposition - 10-29-2021, #3 Exhibit B - Williamson Depostion - 10-20-2021, #4 Exhibit C - Rosner Report - Williamson, #5 Exhibit D - Rosner's Deposition in Williamson, #6 Exhibit E - Rosner's Deposition in Hattenburg, #7 Exhibit F - Rosner's Deposition in Ratcliff, #8 Exhibit G - Markowitz Deposition - LaMonica case, #9 Exhibit H - Quester order, #10 Exhibit I - LaMonica transcript, #11 Exhibit J - Reid Order) (Kiger, Christopher)
November 15, 2021 Filing 144 MOTION in Limine Daubert Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert David Rosner filed by Ford Motor Company. (Kiger, Christopher)
November 15, 2021 Filing 143 Memorandum in Support regarding #142 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit A - Williamson Depostion - 10-20-2020, #3 Exhibit B - Williamson Deposition - 10-29-2020, #4 Exhibit C - Mowat_Report_Williamson, #5 Exhibit D - Paskal Report - Williamson, #6 Exhibit E - Carlos Bedrossian Deposition - Williamson, #7 Exhibit F - Bedrossian Report - Williamson, #8 Exhibit G - Finkelstein Deposition - Williamson, #9 Exhibit H - Brody Fed Report-10-2018 - Ratcliff, #10 Exhibit I - Bedrossian 5-1-2018 Deposition, #11 Exhibit J - Bedrossian Deposition - Ratcliff 3-6-19, #12 Exhibit K - Finkelstein Deposition - Walls 04-05-21, #13 Exhibit L - Rosner Report - Williamson) (Kiger, Christopher)
November 15, 2021 Filing 142 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ford Motor Company. (Kiger, Christopher)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER granting #118 Motion to Dismiss. The action of Plaintiff, William Williamson, against Defendant Caterpillar Inc., shall be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Each party to bear its own costs. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 11/15/2021. (Sellers, N.)
November 15, 2021 Filing 140 Statement of Material Facts regarding #136 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Pneumo Abex Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Responses to Master Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit B - Williamson Deposition Transcript, #3 Exhibit C - Williamson SSPO (Redacted), #4 Exhibit D - Abex Responses to Interrogatories (Walls), #5 Exhibit E - GPC Responses to Interrogatories (Winslow)) (McLeod, Yancey)
November 15, 2021 Filing 139 Memorandum in Support regarding #136 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Pneumo Abex Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Responses to Master Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit B - Williamson Deposition Transcript, #3 Exhibit C - Williamson SSPO (Redacted), #4 Exhibit D - Abex Responses to Interrogatories (Walls), #5 Exhibit E - Bedrossian Deposition Transcript) (McLeod, Yancey)
November 15, 2021 Filing 138 Statement of Material Facts regarding #123 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Morse Tec, LLC. (Stein, Gerald)
November 15, 2021 Filing 137 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by Caterpillar Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Williamson, Stephen)
November 15, 2021 Filing 136 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Pneumo Abex Corporation. (McLeod, Yancey)
November 15, 2021 Filing 135 Statement of Material Facts regarding #121 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Kelsey-Hayes Company. (McDonald, Moffatt)
November 15, 2021 Filing 134 Statement of Material Facts regarding #119 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Union Carbide Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Williamson Deposition 10-20-2020) (McDonald, Moffatt)
November 15, 2021 Filing 133 Proposed Order regarding #131 MOTION in Limine and Motion under Daubert and Rule 702, #132 Memorandum in Support,,,,,, filed by Pneumo Abex Corporation. (McLeod, Yancey)
November 15, 2021 Filing 132 Memorandum in Support regarding #131 MOTION in Limine and Motion under Daubert and Rule 702 filed by Pneumo Abex Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - H.B. Andervont Article, #2 Attachment B - John J. Bitner Article, #3 Attachment C - W. E. Heston 1942 Article, #4 Attachment D - G. B. Mider Publication, #5 Attachment E - Rodarmel, #6 Attachment F - Menssen, #7 Attachment G - Gillenwater, #8 Attachment H - Ellis, #9 Attachment I - Morton MIL Ruling, #10 Attachment J - Swasey, #11 Attachment K - Phillips, #12 Attachment L - Winford, #13 Attachment M - Foster, #14 Attachment N - Lasich, #15 Attachment O - Pratt Trial Testimony, #16 Attachment P - Putt Saranac Ruling, #17 Attachment Q - Fouche, #18 Attachment R - Klopman Rulings, #19 Attachment S - Bretado MIL Discussion, #20 Attachment T - Jones Saranac Ruling, #21 Attachment U - Shaffer Order, #22 Exhibit AX 600, #23 Exhibit AX 600A, #24 Exhibit AX 601, #25 Exhibit AX 602, #26 Exhibit AX 603, #27 Exhibit AX 604, #28 Exhibit AX 605, #29 Exhibit AX 606, #30 Exhibit AX 607, #31 Exhibit AX 608, #32 Exhibit AX 611, #33 Exhibit AX 618, #34 Exhibit AX 632, #35 Exhibit AX 637, #36 Exhibit AX 638, #37 Exhibit AX 639, #38 Exhibit AX 639.1, #39 Exhibit AX 640, #40 Exhibit AX 640A, #41 Exhibit AX 640.1, #42 Exhibit AX 640.1A, #43 Exhibit AX 641, #44 Exhibit AX 642, #45 Exhibit AX 644, #46 Exhibit AX 652, #47 Exhibit AX 653, #48 Exhibit AX 681, #49 Exhibit AX 739, #50 Exhibit AX 739.1, #51 Exhibit AX 743, #52 Exhibit AX 746, #53 Exhibit AX 748, #54 Exhibit AX 783) (McLeod, Yancey)
November 15, 2021 Filing 131 MOTION in Limine and Motion under Daubert and Rule 702 filed by Pneumo Abex Corporation. (McLeod, Yancey)
November 15, 2021 Filing 130 Memorandum in Support regarding #129 MOTION Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Carlos Bedrossian filed by Morse Tec, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Report of Dr. Carlos Bedrossian) (Stein, Gerald)
November 15, 2021 Filing 129 MOTION Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Carlos Bedrossian filed by Morse Tec, LLC. (Stein, Gerald)
November 15, 2021 Filing 128 Memorandum in Support regarding #127 MOTION Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Murray Finkelstein filed by Morse Tec, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Dr. Murray Finkelstein, #2 Exhibit Dr. Finkelstein's Declaration on Brake Dust Exposure) (Stein, Gerald)
November 15, 2021 Filing 127 MOTION Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Murray Finkelstein filed by Morse Tec, LLC. (Stein, Gerald)
November 15, 2021 Filing 126 Memorandum in Support regarding #125 MOTION Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony of Steven Paskal filed by Morse Tec, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Report of Steven Paskal) (Stein, Gerald)
November 15, 2021 Filing 125 MOTION Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony of Steven Paskal filed by Morse Tec, LLC. (Stein, Gerald)
November 15, 2021 Filing 124 Memorandum in Support regarding #123 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Morse Tec, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition of William Williamson, #2 Exhibit Deposition of William Williamson-Vol. 1) (Stein, Gerald)
November 15, 2021 Filing 123 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Morse Tec, LLC. (Stein, Gerald)
November 15, 2021 Filing 122 Memorandum in Support regarding #121 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Kelsey-Hayes Company. (McDonald, Moffatt)
November 15, 2021 Filing 121 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Kelsey-Hayes Company. (McDonald, Moffatt)
November 15, 2021 Filing 120 Memorandum in Support regarding #119 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Union Carbide Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Williamson Deposition 10-20-2020) (McDonald, Moffatt)
November 15, 2021 Filing 119 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Union Carbide Corporation. (McDonald, Moffatt)
November 15, 2021 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #118 Joint MOTION to Dismiss. (Sellers, N.)
November 10, 2021 Filing 118 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by Caterpillar Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Starr, William)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting #116 Motion to Dismiss. The action of Plaintiff William Williamson against Defendant Genuine Parts Company, named in the Complaint as "Genuine Parts Company, individually and d/b/a NAPA, and d/b/a Rayloc, a/k/a NAP A," is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2), with each party to bear its own costs. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 11/9/2021. (Sellers, N.)
November 8, 2021 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #116 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice as to Defendant Genuine Parts Company. (Sellers, N.)
November 5, 2021 Filing 116 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice as to Defendant Genuine Parts Company filed by Genuine Parts Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Weaver, Brandon)
November 3, 2021 Filing 115 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by John R. Henderson on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (Henderson, John)
October 4, 2021 Filing 114 Notice filed by Caterpillar Inc. Notice of Filing of Rule 26 Expert Disclosures. (Williamson, Stephen)
October 1, 2021 Filing 113 Notice filed by Pneumo Abex Corporation Service of Rule 26 Expert Disclosures. (Sullivan, Kimberly)
September 29, 2021 Filing 112 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Shepherd D. Wainger on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (Wainger, Shepherd)
September 28, 2021 Filing 111 Notice of Appearance filed by Joyce Chambers Reichard on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Chambers Reichard, Joyce)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting #108 Motion to Dismiss. The action of Plaintiff, William Williamson, against Defendant, General Electric Company, is DISMISSED with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 8/20/2021. (Sellers, N.)
August 20, 2021 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #108 Joint MOTION to Dismiss. (Sellers, N.)
August 19, 2021 Filing 108 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by General Electric Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed order) (Techman, Jennifer)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting #106 Motion to Dismiss. The action of Plaintiff William Williamson against Defendant Bridgestone Americas, Inc. is DISMISSED with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 8/19/2021. (Sellers, N.)
August 18, 2021 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #106 Joint MOTION to Dismiss. (Sellers, N.)
August 17, 2021 Filing 106 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by Bridgestone Americas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Phillips, Anderson)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting #104 Motion to Dismiss. The action of Plaintiff, William Williamson, against Defendant, Parker Hannifin Corporation, is DISMISSED without prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 7/30/2021. (Sellers, N.)
July 29, 2021 Filing 104 Joint MOTION to Dismiss TO DISMISS CLAIMS AGAINST PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION filed by Parker-Hannifin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order of Dismissal of Parker Hannifin Corporation) (Proffitt, Robert)
July 29, 2021 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #104 Joint MOTION to Dismiss TO DISMISS CLAIMS AGAINST PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION. (Sellers, N.)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting #102 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant Danly is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 7/27/2021. (Sellers, N.)
July 26, 2021 Filing 102 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Danly Machine Corporation without Prejudice filed by Danly Machine Division of Connell Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Dismissing Defendant Danly Machine Corporation without Prejudice) (Holden, John)
July 26, 2021 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #102 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Danly Machine Corporation without Prejudice. (Sellers, N.)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting #100 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Defendants may conduct discovery, up to and including November 1, 2021, extending the Expert Report and Disclosures deadline to October 1, 2021, and extending the dispositive and Daubert motion deadline to November 15, 2021. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 7/23/2021. (Sellers, N.)
July 22, 2021 Filing 100 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Pneumo Abex Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (McLeod, Yancey)
July 22, 2021 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #100 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. (Sellers, N.)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting #98 Motion to Dismiss. The action of Plaintiff, William Williamson, against Defendant, DCo LLC (f/k/a Dana Companies, LLC), is DISMISSED without prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 7/20/2021. (Sellers, N.)
July 20, 2021 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #98 Joint MOTION to Dismiss. (Sellers, N.)
July 19, 2021 Filing 98 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by DCO LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Ord on Joint Motion to Dismiss) (Early, William)
June 1, 2021 Filing 97 Notice filed by William Williamson Plaintiff's Notice of Filing Expert Reports. (Attachments: #1 Report of Arnold R. Brody, Ph.D.;, #2 Declaration of Murray Finkelstein, Ph.D on General Asbestos Causation, #3 Declaration of Murray Finkelstein, Ph.D. on Brake Dust Exposure and Mesothelioma, #4 Report of David Rosner, Ph.D., #5 Appendix C to Report of David Rosner, Ph.D, #6 Report of Steven Paskal, CIH;, #7 Report of Carlos Bedrossian, M.D.) (Cavanaugh, Ryan)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting #95 Motion to Dismiss. The action of Plaintiff, WILLIAM WILLIAMSON, against Defendant, NIDEC MINSTER CORPORATION :f7k/a THE MINSTER MACHINE COMP ANY, is DISMISSED without prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 4/26/2021. (Sellers, N.)
April 15, 2021 Filing 95 Joint MOTION to Dismiss only defendant Nidec Minster Corporation f/k/a The Minster Machine Company without prejudice filed by Nidec Minster Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Peck, Timothy)
April 15, 2021 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #95 Joint MOTION to Dismiss only defendant Nidec Minster Corporation f/k/a The Minster Machine Company without prejudice. (Sellers, N.)
March 18, 2021 Filing 94 Notice of Appearance filed by Gerald A. Stein, II on behalf of Morse Tec, LLC. (Stein, Gerald)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting #90 Motion for Clarification of Scheduling Order. Reports from retained expert witnesses under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2)(B), and disclosuresfrom any expert witness under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2)(C) who will provide an opinion regarding the cause of Decedent's injuries, are due following the fact discovery period: (i) From Plaintiff by June 1, 2021. (ii) From Defendants by August 1, 2021. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 2/2/2021. (Sellers, N.)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER Appointing Mediator Thomas M. Clare. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/29/2021. Sent to Thomas M. Clare at 1011 Vance Street Raleigh, NC 27608 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
January 29, 2021 Filing 91 Selection of Thomas M. Clare as mediator filed by William Williamson. (Graham, William)
January 27, 2021 Filing 90 Joint MOTION Clarification of Scheduling Order regarding #89 Scheduling Order, filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Ries, Addie)
January 27, 2021 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #90 Joint MOTION Clarification of Scheduling Order regarding #89 Scheduling Order. (Sellers, N.)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/1/2021. Motions due by 11/5/2021. The matter will be set for trial by separate order. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 1/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Form) (Sellers, N.)
January 11, 2021 NOTICE TO COUNSEL - Pursuant to Local ADR Rule 101.1c(a), counsel is reminded that the parties must file a written statement identifying an agreed upon mediator within twenty one (21) days of the entry of the Scheduling Order. If a statement is not timely filed, the Clerk of Court will appoint a mediator from the list of court certified mediators. Selection of Mediator must be electronically filed on or before 2/1/2021. (Sellers, N.)
November 23, 2020 Filing 88 Notice filed by William Williamson . (Kelley, Edward)
November 23, 2020 Notice to Counsel regarding: #88 Notice - other. It is unnecessary to notify the court when documents have been exchanged in discovery. (Sellers, N.)
October 30, 2020 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Sellers, N.)
October 21, 2020 Filing 87 Notice filed by William Williamson . (Cavanaugh, Ryan)
October 20, 2020 Filing 86 Notice of Appearance filed by Ryan J. Cavanaugh on behalf of William Williamson. (Cavanaugh, Ryan)
October 15, 2020 Filing 85 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by James N. Kline on behalf of Nidec Minster Corporation. (Kline, James)
October 12, 2020 Filing 84 Notice of Appearance filed by Edward J. Kelley on behalf of William Williamson. (Kelley, Edward)
October 9, 2020 Filing 83 Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by Ford Motor Company. (Ries, Addie)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 9/30/2020. (Stouch, L.)
September 25, 2020 Filing 81 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Stephanie G. Flynn on behalf of Nidec Minster Corporation. (Flynn, Stephanie)
September 25, 2020 Filing 80 Financial Disclosure Statement by Caterpillar Inc. (Williamson, Stephen)
September 25, 2020 Filing 79 Notice of Appearance filed by Stephen B. Williamson on behalf of Caterpillar Inc.. (Williamson, Stephen)
September 25, 2020 Filing 78 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, with Jury Demand by Caterpillar Inc.. (Williamson, Stephen)
September 24, 2020 Filing 77 DEFENDANT DANLY MACHINE CORP. IMPROPERLY DESIGNATED HEREIN AS DANLY MACHINE DIVISION OF CONNELL LIMITED PARTNERSHIP'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, with Jury Demand AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Danly Machine Division of Connell Limited Partnership. (Holden, John)
September 24, 2020 Filing 76 Financial Disclosure Statement by Danly Machine Division of Connell Limited Partnership (Holden, John)
September 15, 2020 Filing 75 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by William Williamson as to National Automotive Parts Association (NAPA). (Graham, William)
September 15, 2020 Filing 74 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by William Williamson as to Honeywell International, Inc.. (Graham, William)
September 15, 2020 Filing 73 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by William Williamson as to Greene Tweed & Co., Inc.. (Graham, William)
September 9, 2020 Filing 72 Defendant Hyster-Yale Group, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, with Jury Demand by Hyster Company. (Holden, John)
September 9, 2020 Filing 71 Financial Disclosure Statement by Hyster Company (Holden, John)
September 4, 2020 Filing 70 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Genuine Parts Company. Amendment to #41 Financial Disclosure Statement of Genuine Parts Company (Frankel, Shannon)
September 4, 2020 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #68 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #43 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (Stouch, L.)
September 4, 2020 TEXT ORDER granting Plaintiff's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #68 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Plaintiff has up to and including September 22, 2020, within which to respond to the Motion to Dismiss #43 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 9/4/2020. (Hockaday, A.)
September 3, 2020 Filing 69 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Yancey A. McLeod, III on behalf of Pneumo Abex Corporation. (McLeod, Yancey)
September 3, 2020 Filing 68 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #43 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by William Williamson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion for Extension of Time) (Graham, William)
September 1, 2020 Filing 67 Financial Disclosure Statement by Nidec Minster Corporation (Peck, Timothy)
September 1, 2020 Filing 66 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, with Jury Demand by Nidec Minster Corporation. (Peck, Timothy)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #63 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #1 Complaint. Hyster-Yale Materials Handling, Inc. answer due 9/11/2020. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/28/2020. (Stouch, L.)
August 28, 2020 Filing 64 Proposed Order regarding #63 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Hyster Company, Hyster-Yale Materials Handling, Inc.. (Holden, John)
August 27, 2020 Filing 63 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Hyster Company, Hyster-Yale Materials Handling, Inc.. (Holden, John)
August 27, 2020 Filing 62 Notice of Appearance filed by John T. Holden on behalf of Hyster Company, Hyster-Yale Materials Handling, Inc.. (Holden, John)
August 27, 2020 Filing 61 Financial Disclosure Statement by Pneumo Abex Corporation (O'Neill, Mary)
August 27, 2020 Filing 60 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, with Jury Demand by Pneumo Abex Corporation. (O'Neill, Mary)
August 27, 2020 Filing 59 Notice of Appearance filed by Kimberly Sullivan on behalf of Pneumo Abex Corporation. (Sullivan, Kimberly)
August 27, 2020 Filing 58 Notice of Appearance filed by Mary Elizabeth O'Neill on behalf of Pneumo Abex Corporation. (O'Neill, Mary)
August 27, 2020 Filing 57 Financial Disclosure Statement by Bridgestone Americas, Inc. (Phillips, Anderson)
August 27, 2020 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #63 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint. (Stouch, L.)
August 26, 2020 Filing 56 Financial Disclosure Statement by Parker-Hannifin Corporation (Cox, Ronald)
August 26, 2020 Filing 55 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, with Jury Demand by Parker-Hannifin Corporation. (Cox, Ronald)
August 26, 2020 Filing 54 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Ronald Brian Cox on behalf of Parker-Hannifin Corporation. (Cox, Ronald)
August 26, 2020 Filing 53 Notice of Appearance filed by Robert David Proffitt on behalf of Parker-Hannifin Corporation. (Proffitt, Robert)
August 24, 2020 Filing 52 Notice of Appearance filed by Brandon Michael Weaver on behalf of Genuine Parts Company, National Automotive Parts Association. (Weaver, Brandon)
August 21, 2020 Filing 51 Financial Disclosure Statement by General Electric Corporation (Techman, Jennifer)
August 21, 2020 Filing 50 Notice of Appearance filed by Jennifer M. Techman on behalf of General Electric Corporation. (Techman, Jennifer)
August 21, 2020 Filing 49 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, with Jury Demand by General Electric Corporation. (Techman, Jennifer)
August 19, 2020 Filing 48 Financial Disclosure Statement by Greene Tweed & Company, Inc. (Starr, William)
August 19, 2020 Filing 47 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, by Greene Tweed & Company, Inc.. (Starr, William)
August 19, 2020 Filing 46 Notice of Appearance filed by William Michael Starr on behalf of Greene Tweed & Company, Inc.. (Starr, William)
August 18, 2020 Filing 45 Financial Disclosure Statement by National Automotive Parts Association identifying Corporate Parent Genuine Parts Company for National Automotive Parts Association. (Frankel, Shannon)
August 18, 2020 Filing 44 Memorandum in Support regarding #43 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by National Automotive Parts Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Complaint, #2 Exhibit B. Affidavit of Whitney Swingle) (Frankel, Shannon)
August 18, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by National Automotive Parts Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. A Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exh. B Affidavit of Whitney Swingle) (Frankel, Shannon)
August 18, 2020 Filing 42 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, with Jury Demand by Genuine Parts Company. (Frankel, Shannon)
August 18, 2020 Filing 41 Financial Disclosure Statement by Genuine Parts Company (Frankel, Shannon)
August 18, 2020 Filing 40 Notice of Appearance filed by Shannon Strickland Frankel on behalf of Genuine Parts Company, National Automotive Parts Association. (Frankel, Shannon)
August 18, 2020 Filing 39 Financial Disclosure Statement by Caterpillar Inc. (Starr, William)
August 18, 2020 Filing 38 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, by Caterpillar Inc.. (Starr, William)
August 18, 2020 Filing 37 Notice of Appearance filed by William Michael Starr on behalf of Caterpillar Inc.. (Starr, William)
August 17, 2020 Filing 36 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, with Jury Demand by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Walters, Jason)
August 17, 2020 Filing 35 Financial Disclosure Statement by John Deere Company (Tomlin, Tracy)
August 17, 2020 Filing 34 Financial Disclosure Statement by Honeywell International, Inc. (Walters, Jason)
August 17, 2020 Filing 33 Notice of Appearance filed by Jason Larry Walters on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc.. (Walters, Jason)
August 17, 2020 Filing 32 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, by John Deere Company. (Tomlin, Tracy)
August 17, 2020 Filing 31 Notice of Appearance filed by Tracy E. Tomlin on behalf of John Deere Company. (Tomlin, Tracy)
August 17, 2020 Filing 30 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, with Jury Demand by Bridgestone Americas, Inc.. (Phillips, Anderson)
August 17, 2020 Filing 29 Notice of Appearance filed by Anderson Herman Phillips on behalf of Bridgestone Americas, Inc.. (Phillips, Anderson)
August 17, 2020 Filing 28 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Scott E. Frick on behalf of Kelsey-Hayes Company, Union Carbide Corporation. (Frick, Scott)
August 17, 2020 Filing 27 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by William David Conner on behalf of Kelsey-Hayes Company, Union Carbide Corporation. (Conner, William)
August 17, 2020 Filing 26 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Moffatt G. McDonald on behalf of Kelsey-Hayes Company, Union Carbide Corporation. (McDonald, Moffatt)
August 17, 2020 Filing 25 Financial Disclosure Statement by Union Carbide Corporation (Major, Christopher)
August 17, 2020 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, with Jury Demand by Union Carbide Corporation. (Major, Christopher)
August 17, 2020 Filing 23 Financial Disclosure Statement by Kelsey-Hayes Company (Major, Christopher)
August 17, 2020 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, with Jury Demand by Kelsey-Hayes Company. (Major, Christopher)
August 14, 2020 Filing 21 Notice of Appearance filed by Christopher R. Kiger on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (Kiger, Christopher)
August 14, 2020 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance filed by Addie K.S. Ries on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (Ries, Addie)
August 14, 2020 Filing 19 Financial Disclosure Statement by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Companies) (Warner, Kirk)
August 14, 2020 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance filed by Kirk G. Warner on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (Warner, Kirk)
August 14, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, with Jury Demand by Ford Motor Company. (Warner, Kirk)
August 13, 2020 Filing 16 Financial Disclosure Statement by Morse Tec, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Enstar Holdings, Inc. for Morse Tec, LLC. (Levy, David)
August 13, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, with Jury Demand by Morse Tec, LLC. (Levy, David)
August 11, 2020 TEXT ORDER granting the unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #13 filed by Danly Machine Division of Connell Limited Partnership. For good cause shown, it is ordered that this defendant has up to and including September 14, 2020, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/11/2020. (Hockaday, A.)
August 10, 2020 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance filed by William P Early on behalf of DCO LLC. (Early, William)
August 10, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint filed by Danly Machine Division of Connell Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Motion of Extension of Time To Answer Complaint) (Holden, John) Modified on 8/11/2020 to correct event(Hockaday, A.).
August 10, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance filed by John T. Holden on behalf of Danly Machine Division of Connell Limited Partnership. (Holden, John)
August 10, 2020 Filing 11 Financial Disclosure Statement by DCO LLC identifying Corporate Parent Dana Companies, LLC for DCO LLC. (Lambeth, Carter)
August 10, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, with Jury Demand by DCO LLC. (Lambeth, Carter)
August 10, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Carter T. Lambeth on behalf of DCO LLC. (Lambeth, Carter)
August 10, 2020 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint. (Stouch, L.)
August 5, 2020 Filing 8 Financial Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Coltrain, Keith)
August 5, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, with Jury Demand and to Cross-Claims of any and all other Defendants and Third-Party Defendants by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Coltrain, Keith)
August 5, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Keith E. Coltrain on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Coltrain, Keith)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by William Williamson (Graham, William)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by William M. Graham on behalf of William Williamson. (Graham, William)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 Notice filed by William Williamson regarding #1 Complaint,,,,, Civil Cover Sheet. (Graham, William)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 Summonses Issued as to Bridgestone Americas, Inc., Caterpillar Inc., DCO LLC, Danly Machine Division of Connell Limited Partnership, Ford Motor Company, General Electric Corporation, Genuine Parts Company, Greene Tweed & Company, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Hyster Company, Hyster-Yale Materials Handling, Inc., John Deere Company, Kelsey-Hayes Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Morse Tec, LLC, National Automotive Parts Association, Nidec Minster Corporation, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Pneumo Abex Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Sellers, N.)
July 16, 2020 Notice to Counsel - No Summons provided for issuance or Waiver of Service filed. (Rudd, D.)
July 16, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint - Counsel failed to file a JS44 Civil Cover Sheet as required by the Court. Counsel should file a Cover Sheet using the event "Notice-Other" as soon as possible. (Rudd, D.)
July 16, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to William Williamson. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
July 16, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTION regarding: #1 Complaint. Counsel filed the summons at the time the complaint was filed. No further action is needed. (Rudd, D.)
July 16, 2020 Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
July 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5514815.), filed by William Williamson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Summons for Bridgestone Americas, Inc., #2 Proposed Summons Summons for Caterpillar, Inc., #3 Proposed Summons Summons for DCO LLC, #4 Proposed Summons Summons for Danly Machine, #5 Proposed Summons Summons for Ford Motor Company, #6 Proposed Summons Summons for General Electric Corporation, #7 Proposed Summons Summons for Genuine Parts Company, #8 Proposed Summons Summons for Greene Tweed & Company, Inc., #9 Proposed Summons Summons for Honeywell International, Inc., #10 Proposed Summons Summons for Hyster Company, #11 Proposed Summons Summons for Hyster-Yale Materials Handling, Inc., #12 Proposed Summons Summons for John Deere Company, #13 Proposed Summons Summons for Kelsey-Hayes Company, #14 Proposed Summons Summons for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, #15 Proposed Summons Summons for Morse Tec, LLC, #16 Proposed Summons Summons for NAPA, #17 Proposed Summons Summons for Nidec Minster Corporation, #18 Proposed Summons Summons for Parker-Hannifin Corporation, #19 Proposed Summons Summons for Pneumo Abex Corporation, #20 Proposed Summons Summons for Union Carbide Corporation) (Graham, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williamson v. Bridgestone Americas, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Deere Company
Represented By: Tracy E. Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREENE TWEED & COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: William Michael Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCO LLC, f/k/a DANA COMPANIES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Keith E. Coltrain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker-Hannifin Corporation
Represented By: Robert David Proffitt
Represented By: Ronald Brian Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Automotive Parts Association (aka NAPA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridgestone Americas, Inc.
Represented By: Anderson Herman Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANLY MACHINE DIVISION OF CONNELL LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Represented By: John T. Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Scott E. Frick
Represented By: Moffatt G. McDonald
Represented By: Christopher Barton Major
Represented By: William David Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer M. Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyster Company
Represented By: John T. Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar Inc.
Represented By: William Michael Starr
Represented By: Stephen B. Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Kirk G. Warner
Represented By: Addie K.S. Ries
Represented By: Christopher R. Kiger
Represented By: Shepherd D. Wainger
Represented By: John R. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NIDEC MINSTER CORPORATION
Represented By: Timothy Peck
Represented By: Stephanie G. Flynn
Represented By: James N. Kline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyster-Yale Materials Handling, Inc.
Represented By: John T. Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Jason Larry Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex Corporation
Represented By: Kimberly Sullivan
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth O'Neill
Represented By: Yancey A. McLeod, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORSE TEC, LLC
Represented By: David L. Levy
Represented By: Gerald A. Stein, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelsey-Hayes Company
Represented By: Scott E. Frick
Represented By: Moffatt G. McDonald
Represented By: Christopher Barton Major
Represented By: William David Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCO LLC
Represented By: William P Early
Represented By: Carter T. Lambeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Automotive Parts Association
Represented By: Brandon Michael Weaver
Represented By: Shannon Strickland Frankel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company individually and d/b/a NAPA, and d/b/a Rayloc, a/k/a NAPA
Represented By: Brandon Michael Weaver
Represented By: Shannon Strickland Frankel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Williamson
Represented By: William M. Graham
Represented By: Ryan J. Cavanaugh
Represented By: Edward J. Kelley
Represented By: Joyce Chambers Reichard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?