New Horizon Group Home, LLC v. North Carolina Department of Health and Human Services, Division of Health Service Regulation
Plaintiff: New Horizon Group Home, LLC
Defendant: North Carolina Department of Health and Human Services, Division of Health Service Regulation
Case Number: 5:2020cv00441
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard E Myers
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 TEXT ORDER granting Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Extension of Time #16 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Plaintiff has up to and including November 12, 2020, within which to respond to the Motion to Dismiss #13 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/15/2020. (Hockaday, A.)
October 15, 2020 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. (Waddell, K.)
October 15, 2020 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by New Horizon Group Home, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Extending Time) (Neuman, Brandon)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/2/2020. (Waddell, K.)
October 2, 2020 REMINDER TO COUNSEL regarding #13 and #14 . Pursuant to Judge Myers Practice Preferences, counsel shall provide a courtesy copy of any motion, memorandum, or brief which exceeds 30 pages or of any exhibits which exceed a total of 30 pages, by mailing or delivering to the attention of the Clerk, U.S. District Court, 1003 South 17th Street, Wilmington, NC 28401. The courtesy copies of any motion, memorandum, or brief and supporting exhibits which exceed a combined total of 100 pages shall be submitted in a three-ring binder. (Waddell, K.)
October 1, 2020 Filing 14 Memorandum in Support regarding #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by North Carolina Department of Health and Human Services, Division of Health Service Regulation. (Hunt, Eric)
October 1, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by North Carolina Department of Health and Human Services, Division of Health Service Regulation. (Hunt, Eric)
September 14, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance filed by Eric R. Hunt on behalf of North Carolina Department of Health and Human Services, Division of Health Service Regulation. (Hunt, Eric)
September 11, 2020 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time #10 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Defendant has up to and including October 1, 2020, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 9/11/2020. (Hockaday, A.)
September 11, 2020 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #10 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Waddell, K.)
September 11, 2020 Notice to Counsel regarding: #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Counsel is reminded that in future filings the case number should read 5:20-CV-441-M. The "M" references the judge assignment. No action by counsel is required at this time. (Waddell, K.)
September 11, 2020 Notice to Counsel regarding: #9 Notice of Appearance filed on behalf of Eric Hunt. Pursuant to Section VI.C.2 of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual, each attorney making an appearance in the case must be a registered CM/ECF filer with this court and must file his or her own Notice of Appearance. Therefore, Eric Hunt should file his own Notice of Appearance. (Waddell, K.)
September 10, 2020 Filing 11 Financial Disclosure Statement by North Carolina Department of Health and Human Services, Division of Health Service Regulation (Hunter, Derek)
September 10, 2020 Filing 10 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by North Carolina Department of Health and Human Services, Division of Health Service Regulation. (Hunter, Derek)
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Derek L. Hunter on behalf of North Carolina Department of Health and Human Services, Division of Health Service Regulation. (Hunter, Derek)
September 10, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Derek L. Hunter on behalf of North Carolina Department of Health and Human Services, Division of Health Service Regulation. (Hunter, Derek)
September 4, 2020 Filing 7 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by New Horizon Group Home, LLC served on NC DHHS, Division of Health Service Regulation on 08/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service) (Neuman, Brandon)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to North Carolina Department of Health and Human Services, Division of Health Service Regulation. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Andrew D. Brown on behalf of New Horizon Group Home, LLC. (Brown, Andrew)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Kieran J. Shanahan on behalf of New Horizon Group Home, LLC. (Shanahan, Kieran)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Brandon S. Neuman on behalf of New Horizon Group Home, LLC. (Neuman, Brandon)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by New Horizon Group Home, LLC (Neuman, Brandon)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against North Carolina Department of Health and Human Services, Division of Health Service Regulation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5573665.), filed by New Horizon Group Home, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Summons to NCDHHS) (Neuman, Brandon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New Horizon Group Home, LLC v. North Carolina Department of Health and Human Services, Division of Health Service Regulation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Horizon Group Home, LLC
Represented By: Andrew D. Brown
Represented By: Kieran J. Shanahan
Represented By: Brandon S. Neuman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Carolina Department of Health and Human Services, Division of Health Service Regulation
Represented By: Eric R. Hunt
Represented By: Derek L. Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?