UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $35,835.00 US Currency
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $35,380.00 US Currency and $35,385.00 in US Currency
Claimant: Awwad Mohamed
Case Number: 5:2020cv00508
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/12/2020. (Stouch, L.)
November 9, 2020 Filing 8 Notice filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re Declaration of Publication. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Publication Certification) (Fesak, Matthew)
November 6, 2020 Filing 7 CLAIM Asset owner Claim by Awwad Mohamed. (Axford, Chad)
November 6, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Awwad Mohamed. (Axford, Chad)
October 5, 2020 Filing 5 USM 285 Form - Funds in USMS Custody on 10/2/2020. (Stouch, L.)
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 WARRANT of Arrest and Notice In Rem issued. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 9/29/2020. (Rudd, D.)
September 29, 2020 Remark - #3 Notice referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court. (Rudd, D.)
September 28, 2020 Filing 3 Notice Requesting Clerk to Issue Warrant of Arrest filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Warrant) (Fesak, Matthew)
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew Lee Fesak on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Fesak, Matthew)
September 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $35,380.00 US Currency, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration of TFO Phillip Lewis, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fesak, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $35,835.00 US Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $35,380.00 US Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $35,385.00 in US Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Matthew Lee Fesak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Awwad Mohamed
Represented By: Chad E. Axford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?