Griffin v. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Scott Allen Griffin
Defendant: Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2020cv00510
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1104
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order Setting Hearings - Hearing on the parties' Rule 26(f) Report set for 12/4/2020 at 02:00 PM by videoconference before Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers II. The Clerk of Court shall provide the parties the necessary information to join the videoconference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 11/24/2020. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. (Stouch, L.)
November 19, 2020 Remark - #22 Rule 26(f) Report referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II for the entry of a scheduling order. (Stouch, L.)
November 16, 2020 Filing 22 Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by Scott Allen Griffin. (Nabors, Darryl)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/2/2020. (Stouch, L.)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying as moot #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and granting #15 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 11/2/2020. (Stouch, L.)
October 30, 2020 Motion Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #15 Joint MOTION to Amend For Leave For Plaintiff To File Second Amended Complaint. (Stouch, L.)
October 29, 2020 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. (Symonds, Hannah)
October 28, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #16 Second Amended Complaint by Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. (Symonds, Hannah)
October 27, 2020 Filing 17 Memorandum in Opposition regarding #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #8 Memorandum in Support filed by Scott Allen Griffin. (Nabors, Darryl)
October 23, 2020 Filing 16 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company, filed by Scott Allen Griffin. (Nabors, Darryl)
October 21, 2020 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct For Leave For Plaintiff To File Second Amended Complaint filed by Scott Allen Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Nabors, Darryl)
October 15, 2020 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance filed by Hannah Styron Symonds on behalf of Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. (Symonds, Hannah)
October 14, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance filed by Hannah Styron Symonds on behalf of Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. (Symonds, Hannah)
October 13, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company, filed by Scott Allen Griffin. (Nabors, Darryl)
October 7, 2020 Filing 11 Financial Disclosure Statement by Scott Allen Griffin (Nabors, Darryl)
October 7, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Darryl T. Nabors on behalf of Scott Allen Griffin. (Nabors, Darryl)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company answer due 11/5/2020. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/6/2020. Copy sent to Counsel for Plaintiff, D. Tyler Nabors of Crumley Roberts, LLP at 2400 Freeman Mill Road, Suite 200, Greensboro, NC 27406. (Stouch, L.)
October 6, 2020 Filing 8 Memorandum in Support regarding #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Insurance Policy LSC 97,200) (Gregson, Maxwell)
October 6, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. (Gregson, Maxwell)
October 6, 2020 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Stouch, L.)
October 1, 2020 Filing 6 Notice filed by Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company regarding #1 Notice of Removal, 28 USC 1446(d) certification. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Notice) (Gregson, Maxwell)
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Gregson, Maxwell)
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Counsel for Plaintiff, D. Tyler Nabors of Crumley Roberts, LLP at 2400 Freeman Mill Road, Suite 200, Greensboro, NC 27406 mailed September 29, 2020. (Rudd, D.)
September 29, 2020 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc. for Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. (Gregson, Maxwell)
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Maxwell Lee Gregson on behalf of Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. (Gregson, Maxwell)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company from Wake County Superior Court, case number 20 CVS 8961. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5645025), filed by Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Removal) (Gregson, Maxwell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin v. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Allen Griffin
Represented By: Darryl T. Nabors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Maxwell Lee Gregson
Represented By: Hannah Styron Symonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?