Sandoval v. John Doe No. 1 et al
Plaintiff: Tacho M Sandoval
Defendant: John Doe No. 1, John Doe No. 3 and John Doe No. 2
Case Number: 5:2020cv00579
Filed: November 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 Filing 13 Memorandum in Support regarding #12 MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Conduct Early Discovery by Tacho M Sandoval. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Errata F, #8 Exhibit G) (Schoeppl, Carl)
December 23, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Conduct Early Discovery filed by Tacho M Sandoval. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Schoeppl, Carl)
November 18, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Terry A.C. Gray on behalf of Tacho M Sandoval. (Gray, Terry)
November 18, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Carl F. Schoeppl on behalf of Tacho M Sandoval. (Schoeppl, Carl)
November 4, 2020 Notice to Counsel - Counsel is reminded that the filing user must lock or flatten the PDF document. Failure to flatten documents may result in the clerks office issuing a notice of deficiency. Counsel should "flatten" the civil cover sheet prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No further action is needed. (Rudd, D.)
November 4, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #2 Notice of Special Appearance, #3 Notice of Special Appearance. Once counsel receives their login and password, they must file their own notice of special appearance so that they will be added to the docket sheet in order to receive a "Notices of Electronic Filing" (NEF). (Rudd, D.)
November 4, 2020 Notice to Counsel - Counsel did not properly identify attachments pursuant to Section V.E. of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. Attachments must be clearly labeled (i.e., "Exhibit A" is not a sufficient description). Additionally, when filing a document with more than five attachments, the first attachment must be an index of all of the subsequent attached documents. No further action is needed. (Rudd, D.)
November 3, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Robert A. Meynardie on behalf of Tacho M Sandoval. (Meynardie, Robert)
November 3, 2020 Filing 8 Notice filed by Tacho M Sandoval Proposed Summons_Cartman. (Meynardie, Robert)
November 3, 2020 Filing 7 Notice filed by Tacho M Sandoval Proposed Summons_NoMoneyRules. (Meynardie, Robert)
November 3, 2020 Filing 6 Notice filed by Tacho M Sandoval Proposed Summons_Fullest Disclosure. (Meynardie, Robert)
November 3, 2020 Filing 5 Notice filed by Tacho M Sandoval Civil Cover Sheet. (Meynardie, Robert) (Main Document 5 flattened and replaced on 11/4/2020) (Edwards, S.).
November 3, 2020 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Tacho M Sandoval (Meynardie, Robert)
November 3, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Robert A. Meynardie on behalf of Tacho M Sandoval. (Meynardie, Robert)
November 3, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Robert A. Meynardie on behalf of Tacho M Sandoval. (Meynardie, Robert)
November 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tacho M Sandoval ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5706517.), filed by Tacho M Sandoval. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Website information regarding Fullest Disclosure, #2 Exhibit B- Web information from iHub regarding Fullest Disclosure, #3 Exhibit C- Web information from iHub regarding Fullest Disclosure, #4 Exhibit D- Web information from iHub regarding Fullest Disclosure, #5 Exhibit E- Web information from iHub regarding Fullest Disclosure, #6 Exhibit F- Web information from iHub regarding MoMoneyRules, #7 Exhibit G- Web information from iHub regarding MoMoneyRules, #8 Exhibit H- Web information from iHub regarding MoMoneyRules, #9 Exhibit I- Web information from iHub regarding Cartman_3_16, #10 Exhibit J- Copy of an Decision, Order on Motion from the Supreme Court of the State of New York, New York County) (Meynardie, Robert) Modified on 11/4/2020 to describe exhibits. (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandoval v. John Doe No. 1 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tacho M Sandoval
Represented By: Robert A. Meynardie
Represented By: Terry A.C. Gray
Represented By: Carl F. Schoeppl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe No. 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe No. 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe No. 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?