Rocky Mount Family YMCA, Inc. v. United States Fire Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Rocky Mount Family YMCA, Inc.
Defendant: The Redwoods Group, Inc. and United States Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2020cv00623
Filed: November 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #14 MOTION to Remand filed by The Redwoods Group, Inc., United States Fire Insurance Company. (Keister, Jeffrey)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER - Ordinarily at this juncture the court would trigger the parties' scheduling conference activities, and deadline for provision of their joint report and plan through issuance of initial order regarding planning and scheduling. Where plaintiff has filed a motion to remand, good cause appears to delay these activities. Unless a party raises objection in filing due within 14 days from this date, the court stays the parties' scheduling conference activities pending decision on motion filed 12/22/20. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 12/28/2020. (Collins, S.)
December 22, 2020 Filing 15 Memorandum in Support regarding #14 MOTION to Remand filed by Rocky Mount Family YMCA, Inc.. (Castellino, Dylan)
December 22, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Remand filed by Rocky Mount Family YMCA, Inc.. (Castellino, Dylan)
December 4, 2020 Filing 13 Financial Disclosure Statement by Rocky Mount Family YMCA, Inc. (Castellino, Dylan)
December 4, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance filed by Dylan J. Castellino on behalf of Rocky Mount Family YMCA, Inc.. (Castellino, Dylan)
December 4, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance filed by Timothy W. Wilson on behalf of Rocky Mount Family YMCA, Inc.. (Wilson, Timothy)
December 4, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Joseph P. Tunstall, III on behalf of Rocky Mount Family YMCA, Inc.. (Tunstall, Joseph)
December 4, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Joseph P. Tunstall, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Tunstall, Joseph)
December 1, 2020 Filing 8 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Collins, S.)
December 1, 2020 Notice to Counsel. Attorneys with Kennedys CMK, LLP will not receive electronic notifications for this case unless they file their own notice of special appearance. See Section VI.C.2 of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. (Collins, S.)
November 30, 2020 Filing 7 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by The Redwoods Group, Inc., United States Fire Insurance Company. (Keister, Jeffrey)
November 30, 2020 Filing 6 Financial Disclosure Statement by The Redwoods Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent United States Fire Insurance Company for The Redwoods Group, Inc.. (Keister, Jeffrey)
November 30, 2020 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by United States Fire Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Crum & Forster Holdings, Corp. for United States Fire Insurance Company. (Keister, Jeffrey)
November 23, 2020 Filing 4 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Counsel for Plaintiff, Joseph P. Tunstall, III of OMalley Tunstall, PLLC at Post Office Box 1158, Tarboro, NC 27886 and Timothy W. Wilson & Dylan J. Castellino of Poyner Spruill LLP at Post Office Box 353, Rocky Mount, NC 27802-9353 mailed via US Mail on November 23, 2020. (Rudd, D.)
November 23, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to The Redwoods Group, Inc., United States Fire Insurance Company. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
November 23, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance Local 83.1 Counsel filed by Stephen Kyle Pytlik on behalf of The Redwoods Group, Inc., United States Fire Insurance Company. (Pytlik, Stephen) Modified on 12/1/2020 to revise docket text. (Collins, S.).
November 23, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance Local 83.1 Counsel filed by Jeffrey D. Keister on behalf of The Redwoods Group, Inc., United States Fire Insurance Company. (Keister, Jeffrey) Modified on 12/1/2020 to revise docket text. (Collins, S.).
November 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Redwoods Group, Inc., United States Fire Insurance Company from Nash County Superior Court, case number 20-CVS-1337. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5739872), filed by The Redwoods Group, Inc., United States Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Filings, #2 Exhibit NC Sec of State - Rocky Mount YMCA, #3 Exhibit Company Look Up Summary - US Fire Ins. Co., #4 Exhibit NC Sec of State - Redwood, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Supplement Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet) (Keister, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rocky Mount Family YMCA, Inc. v. United States Fire Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Redwoods Group, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Kyle Pytlik
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Keister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephen Kyle Pytlik
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Keister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocky Mount Family YMCA, Inc.
Represented By: Dylan J. Castellino
Represented By: Timothy W. Wilson
Represented By: Joseph P. Tunstall, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?