Duke University v. Endurance Risk Solutions Assurance Company
Plaintiff: Duke University
Defendant: Endurance Risk Solutions Assurance Company
Case Number: 5:2020cv00672
Filed: December 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Endurance Risk Solutions Assurance Company. (Coats, David)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Motion Submitted to District Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #7 MOTION to Dismiss. (Stouch, L.)
January 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Mitchell f. Dolin on behalf of Duke University. (Dolin, Mitchell)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Jad H. Khazem on behalf of Duke University. (Khazem, Jad)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by Duke University. (Cooney, James)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Remark - #18 Rule 26(f) Report (joint) referred to US Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers for the entry of a scheduling order. (Stouch, L.)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Declaration regarding #16 Memorandum in Opposition Declaration of Mitchell Dolin ISO Brief in Opposition by Duke University (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memorandum Opinion & Order, #2 Exhibit B - Joint Motion to Stay Deadlines, #3 Exhibit C - Letter dated 3/3/20 from William Bulfer & James Stanley) (Cooney, James)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Duke University. (Cooney, James)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Stouch, L.)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Richard R. Johnson on behalf of Endurance Risk Solutions Assurance Company. (Johnson, Richard)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Michael F. Perlis on behalf of Endurance Risk Solutions Assurance Company. (Perlis, Michael)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss "Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss". (Stouch, L.)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #13 / For good cause shown, it is ordered that Defendant has up to and including January 20, 2021, within which to respond to the Motion to Dismiss #7 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/4/2021. (Hockaday, A.)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss "Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss" filed by Duke University. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Cooney, James)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Financial Disclosure Statement by Duke University (Cooney, James)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 12/22/2020. (Stouch, L.)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO COUNSEL as to Duke University. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Stouch, L.)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by James P. Cooney, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Cooney, James)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Notice to Counsel regarding: #4 Notice of Special Appearance, #5 Notice of Special Appearance. Each attorney must file his or her own notice of appearance. The CM/ECF electronic filing and docketing system does not recognize filings made on behalf of other attorneys for purposes of appearing on the court's docket. (Stouch, L.)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Memorandum in Support regarding #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Endurance Risk Solutions Assurance Company. (Coats, David)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Declaration regarding #7 MOTION to Dismiss by Endurance Risk Solutions Assurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - 12/09/20 Order) (Coats, David)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Endurance Risk Solutions Assurance Company. (Coats, David)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Counsel for Plaintiff, James P. Cooney III of Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP at One Wells Fargo Center, Suite 3500, 301 College Street,Charlotte, NC 28202-6037; Mitchell Dolin, Benjamin J. Razi and Jad H. Khazen of Covington & Burling, LLP at One City Center, 850 Tenth Street, NW, Washington, DC 20001-4956 mailed via US Mail on December 15, 2020. (Rudd, D.)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Notice to Counsel - Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.1(e)(1), Out of State Counsel shall file their Notice of Special Appearance once they have received their login and password so that they can be added to the docket to receive notices of electronic filing (NEF's). (Rudd, D.)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Notice to Counsel regarding: [1-4] Civil Cover Sheet. Counsel is reminded that the filing user must lock or flatten the PDF document. Failure to flatten documents may result in the clerks office issuing a notice of deficiency. Counsel should "flatten" the civil cover sheet prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No further action is needed. (Rudd, D.)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by David S. Coats on behalf of Endurance Risk Solutions Assurance Company. (Coats, David)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by David S. Coats on behalf of Endurance Risk Solutions Assurance Company. (Coats, David)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by David S. Coats on behalf of Endurance Risk Solutions Assurance Company. (Coats, David)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Endurance Risk Solutions Assurance Company (Coats, David)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Endurance Risk Solutions Assurance Company from Wake Superior Court, case number 20 CVS 13011. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-5774276), filed by Endurance Risk Solutions Assurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 to Notice of Removal - Summons, #3 Exhibit 3 to Notice of Removal - Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #5 Supplement Supplemental Coversheet) (Coats, David) (Attachment 4 flattened and replaced on 12/16/2020) (Edwards, S.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duke University v. Endurance Risk Solutions Assurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endurance Risk Solutions Assurance Company
Represented By: David S. Coats
Represented By: Richard R. Johnson
Represented By: Michael F. Perlis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duke University
Represented By: James P. Cooney, III
Represented By: Jad H. Khazem
Represented By: Mitchell f. Dolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?