United States of America v. $66,015.00 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $66,015.00 in U.S. Currency
Claimant: Mazen Abdelmuwl Manaei
Case Number: 5:2020cv00701
Filed: December 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard E Myers
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 981
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2021 Filing 14 Amended Notice of Appearance filed by James D. Williams, Jr on behalf of Mazen Abdelmuwl Manaei. (Waddell, K.)
February 24, 2021 Filing 13 Amended Notice of Appearance filed by Shy Quon Bridges on behalf of Mazen Abdelmuwl Manaei. (Waddell, K.)
February 24, 2021 Filing 12 Notice filed by United States of America Declaration of Publication. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Certification of Publication) (Fesak, Matthew)
February 24, 2021 Motion Submitted to Chief US District Judge Richard E. Myers II regarding #7 MOTION for Leave to File. (Waddell, K.)
February 18, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED AND REFILED AT #14 Notice of Appearance, filed by James D. Williams, Jr. (Waddell, K.)
February 18, 2021 Filing 10 AMENDED AND REFILED AT #13 Corrected Notice of Appearance, filed by S. Quon Bridges. (Waddell, K.)
February 18, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #10 Notice of Appearance by S. Quon Bridges and #11 Notice of Appearance by James D. Williams, Jr. In each notice of appearance, counsel indicate they represent defendant, not claimant. However,in the Notice of Claim for Seized Property filed at #8 and the Answer filed at #9 , counsel appear to represent claimant, Mazen Abdelmulwl Manaei. Counsel are directed to clarify which party they represent and correct and/or amend the appropriate documents. (Copy of notice of deficiency sent to S. Quon Bridges, P. 0. Box 2426, 104 Court Street, Oxford, NC 27565 and James D. Williams, Jr., The Law Office of James D. Williams, 3200 Croasdaile Drive, Suite 604, Durham, NC 27705 via US Mail.) (Waddell, K.)
February 16, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand, filed by Mazen Abdelmuwl Manaei. (Waddell, K.)
February 16, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Claim for Seized Property, filed by Mazen Abdelmuwl Manaei. (Waddell, K.)
February 16, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File Manually, filed by S. Quon Bridges. (Waddell, K.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/16/2021: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Waddell, K.).
February 16, 2021 Filing 6 CORRECTED AND REFILED AT #10 Notice of Appearance, filed by S. Quon Bridges. (Waddell, K.)
February 8, 2021 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service for Complaint and Warrant of Arrest filed by United States of America served on Defendant on 1/12/2021. (Fesak, Matthew)
January 5, 2021 Filing 4 WARRANT of Arrest and Notice In Rem issued by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on January 4, 2021. (Waddell, K.)
December 30, 2020 Document Referred: #3 Notice Requesting Clerk to Issue Warrant of Arrest referred to Clerk of Court, Peter A. Moore, Jr. (Waddell, K.)
December 29, 2020 Filing 3 Notice Requesting Clerk to Issue Warrant of Arrest filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Warrant) (Fesak, Matthew)
December 29, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew Lee Fesak on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Fesak, Matthew)
December 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $66,015.00 in U.S. Currency, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fesak, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $66,015.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $66,015.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Matthew Lee Fesak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Mazen Abdelmuwl Manaei
Represented By: James D. Williams, Jr.
Represented By: Shy Quon Bridges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?