Harrison v. United States of America
Petitioner: Michael Ray Harrison
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 5:2020hc02132
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement. (Indig, A.)
July 23, 2020 Case Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III for petition review. (Indig, A.)
July 23, 2020 Filing 5 TRUST FUND INFORMATION REQUESTED. (Indig, A.)
July 23, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Michael Ray Harrison. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of Deficiency. The filing fee of $5.00 was not received or application to proceed without payment of fees and affidavit was not submitted. Response due by 7/31/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 7/10/2020. Copy of order and form sent to petitioner via US Mail. (Indig, A.)
July 9, 2020 Filing 2 Letter regarding case opening sent via US Mail to Michael Ray Harrison at Butner Medium I - F.C.I. (Indig, A.)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Michael Ray Harrison. (Attachments: #1 Documents in Support, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope) (Indig, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrison v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Ray Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?