Bower v. United States of America
Petitioner: Charles Bower
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 5:2020hc02162
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard E Myers
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED in accordance with the court's order entered this date, that this action is hereby dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/13/2020. Copy of order, judgment, and appellate rights information served on petitioner via U.S. Mail to address as noted in judgment. (Castania, M)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Dismissing Case without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Richard E. Myers II on 10/13/2020. Copy served via US Mail: Charles Bower 70695-067, Butner Medium II - F.C.I., P.O. Box 1500, Butner, NC 27509. (Castania, M)
September 14, 2020 Case Submitted to District Judge Richard E. Myers II regarding #3 order. (Castania, M)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of Deficiency. The filing fee of $5.00 was not received or application to proceed without payment of fees and affidavit was not submitted. Response due by 9/1/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr on 8/18/2020. Copy of order and form sent to petitioner via US Mail. (Indig, A.)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Letter regarding case opening sent via US Mail to Charles Bower at Butner Medium II - F.C.I. (Indig, A.)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Charles Bower. (Attachments: #1 Document in Support, #2 Envelope) (Received from the Western District of NC.) (Indig, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bower v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charles Bower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?