Phillips v. Naphcare, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Robin Denise Phillips
Defendant: Christy Bunn, Joseph Lee Hackett, Thomas B. Smith, Mary J. Denuzzia, Cynthia Swain, University of Massachusetts Medical School, Michael Van Sickle, Stephanie Hollembaek, Vanceboro Internal Medicine, P.A., Kellie Harden, Gurinder Sandhu, N. Thompson, Yvonne Lane, Amy Jo Rosenthal, Warden Sara M. Revell, Henry McMillan, Andrew E. Stock, Naphcare, Inc., Ivy Manning, Donna M. Smith, Alnissa Shaw, James C. Holland, Sara Beyer, United Sates of America, Teri Perkinson, Justin F. Andrews and UMASS Correctional Health
Case Number: 5:2021ct03099
Filed: April 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard E Myers
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2021 Motion Submitted to Chief Judge Richard E. Myers II regarding #91 First MOTION to Amend and to Join Defendant United States of America by ROBIN DENISE PHILLIPS. (Lopez, R.)
April 8, 2021 Filing 102 Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Middle. Case Number 1:18-cv-00974. transfer order and docket sheet obtained from transferring district.
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER For the reasons explained herein, this action is transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina. Signed by JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR. on 4/8/2021. (Daniel, J) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
July 24, 2020 Motions Submitted: #91 First MOTION to Amend and to Join Defendant United States of America to JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR. (Winchester, Robin) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
July 23, 2020 Filing 100 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff ROBIN DENISE PHILLIPS, to Response to #91 First MOTION to Amend and to Join Defendant United States of America filed by ROBIN DENISE PHILLIPS. (EDWARDS, CATHARINE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
July 9, 2020 Filing 99 RESPONSE in Opposition re #91 First MOTION to Amend and to Join Defendant United States of America filed by ROBIN DENISE PHILLIPS filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Replies due by 7/23/2020 (KLAUER, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
July 1, 2020 Set/Reset Reply Deadline re: #91 First MOTION to Amend and to Join Defendant United States of America. Replies due by 7/23/2020. (Daniel, J) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
June 29, 2020 TEXT ORDER granting #98 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. For good cause shown, Plaintiff shall have up to and including July 23, 2020, to file her reply to all Defendants' responses to her Motion to Amend. Issued by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 6/29/2020.(Lee, Pedra) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
June 28, 2020 Motions Referred: RE: #98 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #96 Response in Opposition to Motion, #97 Response in Opposition to Motion , to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER (Winchester, Robin) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
June 19, 2020 Filing 98 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #96 Response in Opposition to Motion, #97 Response in Opposition to Motion by ROBIN DENISE PHILLIPS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(EDWARDS, CATHARINE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
June 11, 2020 TEXT ORDER granting #95 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. For good cause shown, the United States of America shall have up to and including July 9, 2020 within which to respond to the Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint and to Join Defendant United States of America. Issued by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 6/11/2020.(Lee, Pedra) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 97 RESPONSE in Opposition re #91 First MOTION to Amend and to Join Defendant United States of America filed by ROBIN DENISE PHILLIPS filed by TERI PERKINSON. (BRATHWAITE, ASHLEY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
June 9, 2020 Motions Referred: RE: #95 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #91 First MOTION to Amend and to Join Defendant United States of America , to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER (Winchester, Robin) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 96 RESPONSE in Opposition re #91 First MOTION to Amend and to Join Defendant United States of America filed by ROBIN DENISE PHILLIPS, #93 Corrected Document filed by JUSTIN F. ANDREWS, SARA BEYER, MARY J. DENUZZIA, JOSEPH LEE HACKETT, JAMES C. HOLLAND, STEPHANIE HOLLEMBAEK, YVONNE LANE, SARA M. REVELL, AMY JO ROSENTHAL, DONNA M. SMITH, THOMAS B. SMITH, ANDREW E. STOCK, CYNTHIA SWAIN. Replies due by 6/23/2020 (COBB, BARRY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 95 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #91 First MOTION to Amend and to Join Defendant United States of America by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(KLAUER, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney LYNNE P. KLAUER on behalf of Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (KLAUER, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 93 Corrected document re #92 Memorandum. (EDWARDS, CATHARINE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 92 MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff ROBIN DENISE PHILLIPS re #91 First MOTION to Amend and to Join Defendant United States of America filed by ROBIN DENISE PHILLIPS. (EDWARDS, CATHARINE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 91 First MOTION to Amend and to Join Defendant United States of America by ROBIN DENISE PHILLIPS. Response to Motion due by 6/9/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Second Amended Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(EDWARDS, CATHARINE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MEMORANDUM ORDER signed by JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR on 04/01/2020; that Defendant University of Massachusetts Medical School's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) [Doc. [#20 ] is GRANTED. (Hicks, Samantha) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
January 31, 2020 Filing 89 NOTICE by UMASS CORRECTIONAL HEALTH, UNIVERSITY OF MASSACHUSETTS MEDICAL SCHOOL re #86 Order, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-ZSN Contract)(BLAKE, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
January 31, 2020 Filing 88 NOTICE by ROBIN DENISE PHILLIPS re #86 Order, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(KURTH, MARY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
January 31, 2020 Filing 87 NOTICE by GURINDER SANDHU re: #86 Order. (MADDEN, JOHN) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER signed by JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR. on 1/22/2020. The parties, singularly or jointly, must inform the Court of Gurinder Sandhu's relationship, if any, with University of Massachusetts Medical School or a related entity in May 2017 within ten days of the entry of this Order. If response and reply briefs are required, the Local Rules of Civil Procedure will dictate the time by which to file those. (Daniel, J) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR. on 1/10/2020. For the reasons explained in this Memorandum Opinion, Defendant Michael Van Sickle's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #24 ) as converted to a motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. Defendants Henry McMillan's, Ivy Manning's, Kellie Harden's, Christy Bunn's, and Alnissa Shaw's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #64 ) as converted to a motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. Defendants James C. Holland's, Sara M. Revell's, Justin F. Andrews' Stephanie L. Hollembaek's, Thomas B. Smith's, Donna M. Smith's, Cynthia Swain's, Sara Beyer's, Amy Jo Rosenthal's, Andrew E. Stock's, Mary J. DeNuzzia's, Yvonne Lane's, and Joseph Lee Hackett's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #66 ) is GRANTED IN PART WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Holland, Revell, Andrews, Hollembaek, Thomas Smith, Donna Smith, Swain, Beyer, Rosenthal, Stock, DeNuzzia, and Hackett and is DENIED IN PART as to Lane. Defendant Terri Perkinson's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #70 ) is GRANTED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The United States of Americas Motion to Substitute [Doc. #29] andMotion to Dismiss (Doc. #30 ) are DENIED AS MOOT; and Plaintiff Robin Denise Phillips's Motion to Strike Portions of Defendants Sandhu and Vanceboro's Answer (Doc. #61 ) is DENIED AS MOOT.(Daniel, J) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
December 18, 2019 Filing 84 NOTICE by GURINDER SANDHU, VANCEBORO INTERNAL MEDICINE, P.A. re #81 Order,, (MADDEN, JOHN) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
December 11, 2019 Filing 83 NOTICE by ROBIN DENISE PHILLIPS re #82 Order, Notice in Response to December 5, 2019 Order (KURTH, MARY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER signed by JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR. on 12/5/2019. Plaintiff has one week to notify the Court if she wishes to respond to the facts as stated in these Defendants' declarations. FURTHER that, if Plaintiff chooses to respond, she must do so within twenty-one days of the entry of this Order. (Daniel, J) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER signed by JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR. on 11/6/2019. The parties are afforded an opportunity to conduct limited discovery to ascertain with whom Gurinder Sandhu contracted to provide medical services at FCC Butner during the relevant period. The parties have until December 16, 2019 to complete this limited discovery. By December 23, 2019, the parties, singularly or jointly, must inform the Court either by notice or motion, whichever is appropriate, with whom Sandhu contracted. If response and reply briefs are required, the Local Rules of Civil Procedure will dictate the time by which to file those. (Daniel, J) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
September 6, 2019 Motions Submitted: #61 MOTION to Strike #14 Answer to Amended Complaint Only As To Motions To Dismiss, #70 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim, #66 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #29 MOTION to Substitute , #64 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, #20 MOTION to Dismiss to JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR. (Winchester, Robin) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 80 Letter to plaintiff' s counsel regarding response to #30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (Winchester, Robin) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
August 21, 2019 Filing 79 REPLY, filed by Defendant TERI PERKINSON, to Response to #70 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by TERI PERKINSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. August 9, 2019 E-mail)(BRATHWAITE, ASHLEY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 78 REPLY, filed by Defendants JUSTIN F. ANDREWS, SARA BEYER, MARY J. DENUZZIA, JOSEPH LEE HACKETT, JAMES C. HOLLAND, STEPHANIE HOLLEMBAEK, YVONNE LANE, SARA M. REVELL, AMY JO ROSENTHAL, DONNA M. SMITH, THOMAS B. SMITH, ANDREW E. STOCK, CYNTHIA SWAIN, to Response to #66 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by JUSTIN F. ANDREWS, SARA BEYER, MARY J. DENUZZIA, JOSEPH LEE HACKETT, JAMES C. HOLLAND, STEPHANIE HOLLEMBAEK, YVONNE LANE, SARA M. REVELL, AMY JO ROSENTHAL, DONNA M. SMITH, THOMAS B. SMITH, ANDREW E. STOCK, CYNTHIA SWAIN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit English v. Murphy (Unpublished Opinion), #2 Exhibit Johnson v. Fields (Unpublished Opinion))(COBB, BARRY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 77 REPLY, filed by Defendants CHRISTY BUNN, KELLIE HARDEN, IVY MANNING, HENRY MCMILLAN, ALNISSA SHAW, to Response to #64 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by CHRISTY BUNN, KELLIE HARDEN, IVY MANNING, HENRY MCMILLAN, ALNISSA SHAW. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Centeno v. Meeks (Unpublished Opinion), #2 Exhibit English v. Murphy (Unpublished Opinion), #3 Exhibit Johnson v. Fields (Unpublished Opinion), #4 Exhibit Marshall v. Stewart (Unpublished Opinion), #5 Exhibit St. Louis v. Loranth (Unpublished Opinion))(COBB, BARRY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 76 RESPONSE in Opposition re #70 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by TERI PERKINSON filed by ROBIN DENISE PHILLIPS. Replies due by 8/21/2019 (KURTH, MARY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
July 25, 2019 Filing 75 RESPONSE in Opposition re #66 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by MARY J. DENUZZIA, CYNTHIA SWAIN, STEPHANIE HOLLEMBAEK, JOSEPH LEE HACKETT, AMY JO ROSENTHAL, JUSTIN F. ANDREWS, SARA BEYER, YVONNE LANE, THOMAS B. SMITH, ANDREW E. STOCK, SARA M. REVELL, JAMES C. HOLLAND, DONNA M. SMITH filed by ROBIN DENISE PHILLIPS. Replies due by 8/8/2019 (EDWARDS, CATHARINE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
July 25, 2019 Filing 74 RESPONSE in Opposition re #64 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by IVY MANNING, HENRY MCMILLAN, ALNISSA SHAW, CHRISTY BUNN, KELLIE HARDEN filed by ROBIN DENISE PHILLIPS. Replies due by 8/8/2019 (EDWARDS, CATHARINE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
July 22, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting #68 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. For good cause shown, Plaintiff shall have up to and including July 25, 2019 to respond to the Motion to Dismiss of Defendants McMillan, Manning, Harden, Bunn and Shaw, and the Motion to Dismiss of Defendants Holland, Revell, Andrews, Hollembaek, Smith, T., Smith, D., Swain, Beyer, Rosenthal, Stock, DeNuzzia, Lane and Hackett. Issued by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 7/22/2019.(Lee, Pedra) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 73 RESPONSE in Opposition re #61 MOTION to Strike #14 Answer to Amended Complaint Only As To Motions To Dismiss filed by ROBIN DENISE PHILLIPS filed by GURINDER SANDHU, VANCEBORO INTERNAL MEDICINE, P.A.. Replies due by 8/2/2019 (MADDEN, JOHN) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
July 19, 2019 Motions Referred: RE: #68 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #66 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #64 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction , to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER (Winchester, Robin) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
July 18, 2019 Filing 72 Withdraw Pleading Notice of Withdrawal of Defendants' First Defense and Motions to Dismiss. (MADDEN, JOHN) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 71 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant TERI PERKINSON re #70 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by TERI PERKINSON. (BRATHWAITE, ASHLEY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 70 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by TERI PERKINSON. Response to Motion due by 8/7/2019 (BRATHWAITE, ASHLEY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 69 Amended ANSWER to Amended Complaint by TERI PERKINSON. (BRATHWAITE, ASHLEY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
July 16, 2019 Filing 68 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #66 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #64 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by ROBIN DENISE PHILLIPS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(EDWARDS, CATHARINE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 67 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendants JUSTIN F. ANDREWS, SARA BEYER, MARY J. DENUZZIA, JOSEPH LEE HACKETT, JAMES C. HOLLAND, STEPHANIE HOLLEMBAEK, YVONNE LANE, SARA M. REVELL, AMY JO ROSENTHAL, DONNA M. SMITH, THOMAS B. SMITH, ANDREW E. STOCK, CYNTHIA SWAIN re #66 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by JUSTIN F. ANDREWS, SARA BEYER, MARY J. DENUZZIA, JOSEPH LEE HACKETT, JAMES C. HOLLAND, STEPHANIE HOLLEMBAEK, YVONNE LANE, SARA M. REVELL, AMY JO ROSENTHAL, DONNA M. SMITH, THOMAS B. SMITH, ANDREW E. STOCK, CYNTHIA SWAIN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unpublished Opinion - Brack v. Jones, #2 Exhibit Unpublished Opinion - Eaker v. Miller, #3 Exhibit Unpublished Opinion - Johnson v. Fields, #4 Exhibit Unpublished Opinion - McKnight v. James, #5 Exhibit Unpublished Opinion - Safford v. Barnes, #6 Exhibit Unpublished Opinion - Simmons v. Stubbs, #7 Exhibit Unpublished Opinion - Young v. McCain)(COBB, BARRY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 66 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by JUSTIN F. ANDREWS, SARA BEYER, MARY J. DENUZZIA, JOSEPH LEE HACKETT, JAMES C. HOLLAND, STEPHANIE HOLLEMBAEK, YVONNE LANE, SARA M. REVELL, AMY JO ROSENTHAL, DONNA M. SMITH, THOMAS B. SMITH, ANDREW E. STOCK, CYNTHIA SWAIN. Response to Motion due by 7/25/2019 (COBB, BARRY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 65 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendants CHRISTY BUNN, KELLIE HARDEN, IVY MANNING, HENRY MCMILLAN, ALNISSA SHAW re #64 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by CHRISTY BUNN, KELLIE HARDEN, IVY MANNING, HENRY MCMILLAN, ALNISSA SHAW. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unpublished Opinion - Centeno v. Meeks, #2 Exhibit Unpublished Opinion - Johnson v. Fields, #3 Exhibit Unpublished Opinion - Marshall v. Stewart, #4 Exhibit Unpublished Opinion - St. Louis v. Loranth)(COBB, BARRY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 64 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by CHRISTY BUNN, KELLIE HARDEN, IVY MANNING, HENRY MCMILLAN, ALNISSA SHAW. Response to Motion due by 7/25/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Henry McMillan, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Ivy Manning, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Kellie Harden, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Christy Bunn, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Alnissa Shaw)(COBB, BARRY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
June 26, 2019 Filing 63 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by TERI PERKINSON. (BRATHWAITE, ASHLEY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
June 25, 2019 Filing 62 MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff ROBIN DENISE PHILLIPS re #61 MOTION to Strike #14 Answer to Amended Complaint Only As To Motions To Dismiss filed by ROBIN DENISE PHILLIPS. (EDWARDS, CATHARINE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
June 25, 2019 Filing 61 MOTION to Strike #14 Answer to Amended Complaint Only As To Motions To Dismiss by ROBIN DENISE PHILLIPS. Response to Motion due by 7/19/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(EDWARDS, CATHARINE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
June 25, 2019 Filing 60 REPLY, filed by Defendant MICHAEL VAN SICKLE, to Response to #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by MICHAEL VAN SICKLE. (JONES, KENNETH) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
June 19, 2019 Filing 59 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by MICHAEL VAN SICKLE, #32 Memorandum filed by MICHAEL VAN SICKLE filed by ROBIN DENISE PHILLIPS. Replies due by 7/8/2019 (EDWARDS, CATHARINE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
June 19, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Plaintiff ROBIN DENISE PHILLIPS (EDWARDS, CATHARINE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER signed by JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR. on 6/19/2019. The Motion to allow AUSA Steven N. Baker to Withdraw from Limited Appearance (Doc. #23 ) is GRANTED. **Attorney STEVEN N. BAKER terminated** (Daniel, J) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
June 14, 2019 Filing 56 REPLY, filed by Defendant UNIVERSITY OF MASSACHUSETTS MEDICAL SCHOOL, to Response to #20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by UNIVERSITY OF MASSACHUSETTS MEDICAL SCHOOL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Mass Gen Laws ch 75 sec 34)(BLAKE, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
June 3, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by JUSTIN F. ANDREWS, SARA BEYER, CHRISTY BUNN, MARY J. DENUZZIA, JOSEPH LEE HACKETT, KELLIE HARDEN, JAMES C. HOLLAND, STEPHANIE HOLLEMBAEK, YVONNE LANE, IVY MANNING, HENRY MCMILLAN, SARA M. REVELL, AMY JO ROSENTHAL, ALNISSA SHAW, DONNA M. SMITH, THOMAS B. SMITH, ANDREW E. STOCK, CYNTHIA SWAIN. For good cause shown, movants shall have up to and including July 1, 2019 within which to object, answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Issued by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 6/3/2019.(Lee, Pedra) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
May 31, 2019 Answer updated for TERI PERKINSON to 7/1/2019. (Contreras, Jamie) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KRISTINA M. WILSON on behalf of Defendants JUSTIN F. ANDREWS, SARA BEYER, CHRISTY BUNN, MARY J. DENUZZIA, JOSEPH LEE HACKETT, KELLIE HARDEN, JAMES C. HOLLAND, STEPHANIE HOLLEMBAEK, YVONNE LANE, IVY MANNING, HENRY MCMILLAN, SARA M. REVELL, AMY JO ROSENTHAL, ALNISSA SHAW, DONNA M. SMITH, THOMAS B. SMITH, ANDREW E. STOCK, CYNTHIA SWAIN (WILSON, KRISTINA) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
May 31, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting #35 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by TERI PERKINSON. For good cause shown, Defendant Teri Perkinson shall have to and including July 1, 2019 within which to object, answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Issued by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 5/31/2019.(Lee, Pedra) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 54 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by UNIVERSITY OF MASSACHUSETTS MEDICAL SCHOOL filed by ROBIN DENISE PHILLIPS. Replies due by 6/14/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration of Catharine E. Edwards in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant UMMS' Motion to Dismiss)(KURTH, MARY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 53 Corporate Disclosure Statement by YVONNE LANE. (COBB, BARRY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 52 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THOMAS B. SMITH. (COBB, BARRY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 51 Corporate Disclosure Statement by STEPHANIE HOLLEMBAEK. (COBB, BARRY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 50 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SARA M. REVELL. (COBB, BARRY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 49 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SARA BEYER. (COBB, BARRY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 48 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MARY J. DENUZZIA. (COBB, BARRY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 47 Corporate Disclosure Statement by KELLIE HARDEN. (COBB, BARRY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 46 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JUSTIN F. ANDREWS. (COBB, BARRY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 45 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JOSEPH LEE HACKETT. (COBB, BARRY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 44 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JAMES C. HOLLAND. (COBB, BARRY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 43 Corporate Disclosure Statement by IVY MANNING. (COBB, BARRY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 42 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HENRY MCMILLAN. (COBB, BARRY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 41 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DONNA M. SMITH. (COBB, BARRY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 40 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CYNTHIA SWAIN. (COBB, BARRY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 39 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHRISTY BUNN. (COBB, BARRY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 38 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ANDREW E. STOCK. (COBB, BARRY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 37 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMY JO ROSENTHAL. (COBB, BARRY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ALNISSA SHAW. (COBB, BARRY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 35 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #9 Amended Complaint,, by TERI PERKINSON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BRATHWAITE, ASHLEY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney DIXIE THOMAS WELLS on behalf of Defendant TERI PERKINSON (WELLS, DIXIE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ASHLEY KAMPHAUS BRATHWAITE on behalf of Defendant TERI PERKINSON (BRATHWAITE, ASHLEY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant MICHAEL VAN SICKLE re #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim (Amended) filed by MICHAEL VAN SICKLE. (JONES, KENNETH) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
May 31, 2019 Motions Referred: RE: #28 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER (Winchester, Robin) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM re #30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(BAKER, STEVEN) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Response to Motion due by 6/21/2019 (BAKER, STEVEN) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Substitute by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Response to Motion due by 6/21/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(BAKER, STEVEN) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
May 30, 2019 Filing 28 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by JUSTIN F. ANDREWS, SARA BEYER, CHRISTY BUNN, MARY J. DENUZZIA, JOSEPH LEE HACKETT, KELLIE HARDEN, JAMES C. HOLLAND, STEPHANIE HOLLEMBAEK, YVONNE LANE, IVY MANNING, HENRY MCMILLAN, SARA M. REVELL, AMY JO ROSENTHAL, ALNISSA SHAW, DONNA M. SMITH, THOMAS B. SMITH, ANDREW E. STOCK, CYNTHIA SWAIN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(COBB, BARRY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
May 30, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney PATRICIA S. WALKER on behalf of Defendants JUSTIN F. ANDREWS, SARA BEYER, CHRISTY BUNN, MARY J. DENUZZIA, JOSEPH LEE HACKETT, KELLIE HARDEN, JAMES C. HOLLAND, STEPHANIE HOLLEMBAEK, YVONNE LANE, IVY MANNING, HENRY MCMILLAN, SARA M. REVELL, AMY JO ROSENTHAL, ALNISSA SHAW, DONNA M. SMITH, THOMAS B. SMITH, ANDREW E. STOCK, CYNTHIA SWAIN (WALKER, PATRICIA) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
May 30, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney BARRY S. COBB on behalf of Defendants JUSTIN F. ANDREWS, SARA BEYER, CHRISTY BUNN, MARY J. DENUZZIA, JOSEPH LEE HACKETT, KELLIE HARDEN, JAMES C. HOLLAND, STEPHANIE HOLLEMBAEK, YVONNE LANE, IVY MANNING, HENRY MCMILLAN, SARA M. REVELL, AMY JO ROSENTHAL, ALNISSA SHAW, DONNA M. SMITH, THOMAS B. SMITH, ANDREW E. STOCK, CYNTHIA SWAIN (COBB, BARRY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
May 29, 2019 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant MICHAEL VAN SICKLE re #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by MICHAEL VAN SICKLE. (JONES, KENNETH) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
May 29, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by MICHAEL VAN SICKLE. Response to Motion due by 6/19/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Lt. Michael Van Sickle)(JONES, KENNETH) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
May 28, 2019 Motions Submitted: #23 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney STEVEN N. BAKER to JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR. (Winchester, Robin) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
May 21, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney STEVEN N. BAKER by on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Responses due by 6/11/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BAKER, STEVEN) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
May 17, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KENNETH L. JONES on behalf of Defendant MICHAEL VAN SICKLE (JONES, KENNETH) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant UNIVERSITY OF MASSACHUSETTS MEDICAL SCHOOL re #20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by UNIVERSITY OF MASSACHUSETTS MEDICAL SCHOOL. (BLAKE, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss by UNIVERSITY OF MASSACHUSETTS MEDICAL SCHOOL. Response to Motion due by 5/31/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration of Dyana Nickl)(BLAKE, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
May 2, 2019 Set Answer Deadline to Amended Complaint as to UNIVERSITY OF MASSACHUSETTS MEDICAL SCHOOL. Answer due 5/10/2019. (Daniel, J) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
May 2, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by UNIVERSITY OF MASSACHUSETTS MEDICAL SCHOOL. For good cause shown, Defendant University of Massachusetts Medical School shall have up to and including May 10, 2019 within which to plead in response to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Issued by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 5/2/2019.(Lee, Pedra) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
May 2, 2019 Motions Referred: RE: #19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #9 Amended Complaint,, , to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER (Winchester, Robin) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
May 1, 2019 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #9 Amended Complaint,, by UNIVERSITY OF MASSACHUSETTS MEDICAL SCHOOL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent to extension of time, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(BLAKE, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
April 5, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. For good cause shown, Defendants James C. Holland, Sara M. Revell, Justin F. Andrews, Stephanie L. Hollembaek, Thomas B. Smith, Donna M. Smith, Cynthia Swain, Henry McMillan, Sara Beyer, Ivy Manning, Kellie Harden, Michael Van Sickle, Teri Perkinson, Amy Jo Rosenthal, Andrew E. Stock, Mary J. DeNuzzia, Yvonne Lane, Christy Bunn, Joseph Lee Hackett, and Alnissa Shaw shall have up to and including May 31, 2019 to file an Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Issued by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 4/5/2019.(Lee, Pedra) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
April 4, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by VANCEBORO INTERNAL MEDICINE, P.A.. (MADDEN, JOHN) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
April 4, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GURINDER SANDHU. (MADDEN, JOHN) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
April 4, 2019 Motions Referred: RE: #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint, to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER (Winchester, Robin) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
April 3, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint by JUSTIN F. ANDREWS, SARA BEYER, CHRISTY BUNN, MARY J. DENUZZIA, JOSEPH LEE HACKETT, KELLIE HARDEN, JAMES C. HOLLAND, STEPHANIE HOLLEMBAEK, YVONNE LANE, IVY MANNING, HENRY MCMILLAN, TERI PERKINSON, SARA M. REVELL, AMY JO ROSENTHAL, ALNISSA SHAW, DONNA M. SMITH, THOMAS B. SMITH, ANDREW E. STOCK, CYNTHIA SWAIN, MICHAEL VAN SICKLE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BAKER, STEVEN)[Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
April 1, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by GURINDER SANDHU, VANCEBORO INTERNAL MEDICINE, P.A. (MADDEN, JOHN) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
April 1, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JOHN D. MADDEN on behalf of Defendant VANCEBORO INTERNAL MEDICINE, P.A. (MADDEN, JOHN) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
April 1, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JOHN D. MADDEN on behalf of Defendant GURINDER SANDHU (MADDEN, JOHN) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to UMass Correctional Health, University of Massachusetts Medical School. (Coyne, Michelle) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
March 6, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Justin F. Andrews, JAMES C. HOLLAND, Stephanie Hollembaek, THOMAS B. SMITH, Vanceboro Internal Medicine, P.A. (Coyne, Michelle) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 9 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant SARA BEYER, CHRISTY BUNN, MARY J. DENUZZIA, JOSEPH LEE HACKETT, KELLIE HARDEN, YVONNE LANE, IVY MANNING, HENRY MCMILLAN, TERI PERKINSON, SARA M. REVELL, AMY JO ROSENTHAL, GURINDER SANDHU, ALNISSA SHAW, DONNA M. SMITH, ANDREW E. STOCK, CYNTHIA SWAIN, MICHAEL VAN SICKLE, UMass Correctional Health, University of Massachusetts Medical School, Stephanie Hollembaek, Justin F. Andrews, THOMAS B. SMITH, Vanceboro Internal Medicine, P.A., filed by ROBIN DENISE PHILLIPS.(EDWARDS, CATHARINE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
February 4, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to YVONNE LANE, HENRY MCMILLAN, TERI PERKINSON, DONNA M. SMITH, CYNTHIA SWAIN. (Attachments: #1 Smith, #2 Perkinson, #3 McMillan, #4 Lane)(Coyne, Michelle) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
January 31, 2019 TEXT ORDER denying #6 Motion to Stay as moot. The lapse of appropriations that caused the Government to request a stay of this action has terminated. Additionally, it appears that no Defendants have been served at this time. Thus, any consideration of extending responsive deadlines is also moot. Issued by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 1/31/2019.(Lee, Pedra) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
January 29, 2019 Motions Referred: RE: #6 MOTION to Stay , to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER (Winchester, Robin) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) NAPHCARE, INC., filed by Plaintiff ROBIN DENISE PHILLIPS (KURTH, MARY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
January 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay by SARA M. REVELL. Response to Motion due by 1/24/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(KLAUER, LYNNE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
January 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MARY K. KURTH on behalf of Plaintiff ROBIN DENISE PHILLIPS (KURTH, MARY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
January 2, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to JOSEPH LEE HACKETT. (Coyne, Michelle) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
December 13, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Coyne, Michelle) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
November 26, 2018 Case Reassigned to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE no longer assigned to the case. (Powell, Gloria) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
November 21, 2018 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Coyne, Michelle) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NAPHCARE, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2466084.), filed by Robin Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(EDWARDS, CATHARINE) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 4/8/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Naphcare, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christy Bunn
Represented By: Kristina M. Wilson
Represented By: Barry S. Cobb
Represented By: Steven N. Baker
Represented By: Patricia S. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Lee Hackett
Represented By: Kristina M. Wilson
Represented By: Barry S. Cobb
Represented By: Steven N. Baker
Represented By: Patricia S. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas B. Smith
Represented By: Kristina M. Wilson
Represented By: Barry S. Cobb
Represented By: Steven N. Baker
Represented By: Patricia S. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary J. Denuzzia
Represented By: Kristina M. Wilson
Represented By: Barry S. Cobb
Represented By: Steven N. Baker
Represented By: Patricia S. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Swain
Represented By: Kristina M. Wilson
Represented By: Barry S. Cobb
Represented By: Steven N. Baker
Represented By: Patricia S. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Massachusetts Medical School
Represented By: Christopher J. Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Van Sickle
Represented By: Kenneth L. Jones
Represented By: Steven N. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Hollembaek
Represented By: Kristina M. Wilson
Represented By: Barry S. Cobb
Represented By: Steven N. Baker
Represented By: Patricia S. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanceboro Internal Medicine, P.A.
Represented By: John D. Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellie Harden
Represented By: Kristina M. Wilson
Represented By: Barry S. Cobb
Represented By: Steven N. Baker
Represented By: Patricia S. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gurinder Sandhu
Represented By: John D. Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yvonne Lane
Represented By: Kristina M. Wilson
Represented By: Barry S. Cobb
Represented By: Steven N. Baker
Represented By: Patricia S. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Jo Rosenthal
Represented By: Kristina M. Wilson
Represented By: Barry S. Cobb
Represented By: Steven N. Baker
Represented By: Patricia S. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Sara M. Revell
Represented By: Kristina M. Wilson
Represented By: Barry S. Cobb
Represented By: Steven N. Baker
Represented By: Patricia S. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry McMillan
Represented By: Kristina M. Wilson
Represented By: Barry S. Cobb
Represented By: Steven N. Baker
Represented By: Patricia S. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew E. Stock
Represented By: Kristina M. Wilson
Represented By: Barry S. Cobb
Represented By: Steven N. Baker
Represented By: Patricia S. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naphcare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivy Manning
Represented By: Kristina M. Wilson
Represented By: Barry S. Cobb
Represented By: Steven N. Baker
Represented By: Patricia S. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna M. Smith
Represented By: Kristina M. Wilson
Represented By: Barry S. Cobb
Represented By: Steven N. Baker
Represented By: Patricia S. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alnissa Shaw
Represented By: Kristina M. Wilson
Represented By: Barry S. Cobb
Represented By: Steven N. Baker
Represented By: Patricia S. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James C. Holland
Represented By: Kristina M. Wilson
Represented By: Barry S. Cobb
Represented By: Steven N. Baker
Represented By: Patricia S. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Beyer
Represented By: Kristina M. Wilson
Represented By: Barry S. Cobb
Represented By: Steven N. Baker
Represented By: Patricia S. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Sates of America
Represented By: Steven N. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teri Perkinson
Represented By: Ashley Kamphaus Brathwaite
Represented By: Dixie Thomas Wells
Represented By: Steven N. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin F. Andrews
Represented By: Kristina M. Wilson
Represented By: Barry S. Cobb
Represented By: Steven N. Baker
Represented By: Patricia S. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UMASS Correctional Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Denise Phillips
Represented By: Mary Kathryn Kurth
Represented By: Catharine E. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?