Graham v. Family Dollar Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Aaron Thomas Graham
Defendant: Family Dollar Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2021cv00037
Filed: January 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Family Dollar Stores, Inc.. (Flynn, William)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. (Collins, S.)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING - Discovery Plan due by 4/2/21. Counsel should read attached order in its entirety for critical information and deadlines. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 2/26/2021. (Collins, S.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/26/2021: #1 Signed Order) (Collins, S.).
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Memorandum in Opposition regarding #15 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Aaron Thomas Graham. (Adams, Brenton) Modified on 2/26/2021 to create docket entry relationship to motion #9 . (Collins, S.).
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Aaron Thomas Graham. (Adams, Brenton)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Financial Disclosure Statement by Aaron Thomas Graham (Adams, Brenton)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Notice of Appearance filed by Brenton D. Adams on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Adams, Brenton)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Certificate of Service filed by Family Dollar Stores, Inc. regarding #10 Memorandum in Support, #8 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Upon Plaintiff Counsel. (Henkle, S. Mark)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Family Dollar Stores, Inc.. (Flynn, William)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Memorandum in Support regarding #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Family Dollar Stores, Inc.. (Flynn, William)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Family Dollar Stores, Inc.. (Flynn, William)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 **CORRECTED AND REFILED AT #9 ** MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Family Dollar Stores, Inc.. (Flynn, William) Modified on 2/5/2021 (Collins, S.).
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #10 Memorandum in Support, #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #11 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal). Counsel shall file a document entitled "Certificate of Service" indicating a manner of service on counsel for plaintiff, other than CM/ECF. Counsel for plaintiff has not yet filed Notice of Appearance and therefore cannot receive electronic notifications. (Collins, S.)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Collins, S.)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by William James Flynn on behalf of Family Dollar Stores, Inc.. (Flynn, William)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice filed by Family Dollar Stores, Inc. regarding #1 Notice of Removal, Supplemental Cover Sheet. (Henkle, S. Mark)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by Family Dollar Stores, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Dollar Tree, Inc. for Family Dollar Stores, Inc.. (Henkle, S. Mark)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice filed by Family Dollar Stores, Inc. regarding #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet. (Henkle, S. Mark)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by S. Mark Henkle on behalf of Family Dollar Stores, Inc.. (Henkle, S. Mark)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Counsel for Plaintiff, Brenton D. Adams of Brent Adams & Associates at P. O. Box 1389, Dunn, NC 28335 mailed via US Mail on January 27, 2021. (Rudd, D.)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Notice of Removal - Counsel failed to file a JS44 Civil Cover Sheet as required by the Court. Counsel should file a Cover Sheet using the event "Notice-Other" as soon as possible. (Rudd, D.)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Notice of Removal: Counsel has failed to attach the Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet as required by Local Rule 5.3(a). This form can be found on the court's website and can be filed using the event Notice - Other. Counsel should add as attachments any other documents required under Local Rule 5.3(a) that have not already been filed. (Rudd, D.)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Family Dollar Stores, Inc. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Family Dollar Stores, Inc. from Cumberland, case number 20CVS6976. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-5844574), filed by Family Dollar Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint) (Henkle, S. Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graham v. Family Dollar Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Thomas Graham
Represented By: Brenton D. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Dollar Stores, Inc.
Represented By: S. Mark Henkle
Represented By: William James Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?