Rouse v. Harley-Davidson, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: William Alex Rouse
Defendant: Harley-Davidson Motor Company Group, LLC, Harley-Davidson, Inc., Harley-Davidson Motor Company, Inc., Harley-Davidson Motor Company Group, Inc., Harley-Davidson Motor Company, Harley Davidson Motor Co., Inc., Harley-Davidson Motor Company Operations, Inc. and Harley-Davidson Motor Co.
Case Number: 5:2021cv00039
Filed: January 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #40 Motion for Extension of Time. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 3/15/2021. (Collins, S.)
March 12, 2021 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #40 MOTION for Extension of Time. (Collins, S.)
March 11, 2021 Filing 43 Notice filed by William Alex Rouse regarding #40 MOTION for Extension of Time . (Kornbluth, Michael)
March 11, 2021 Filing 42 Financial Disclosure Statement by William Alex Rouse (Kornbluth, Michael)
March 9, 2021 Filing 41 Proposed Order regarding #40 MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Harley-Davidson Motor Company Group, LLC. (Warner, Kirk)
March 9, 2021 Filing 40 MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Harley-Davidson Motor Company Group, LLC. (Warner, Kirk)
March 9, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #40 Motion for Extension of Time. At the direction of the court, counsel shall file a proposed order. The order must be filed electronically using the event PROPOSED ORDER located in the RESPONSES AND REPLIES category. (Collins, S.)
March 8, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to William Alex Rouse. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Collins, S.)
March 3, 2021 Filing 39 Notice of Appearance filed by Michael A. Kornbluth on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Kornbluth, Michael)
March 3, 2021 Filing 38 Notice of Appearance filed by Amelia L. Serrat on behalf of All Defendants. (Serrat, Amelia)
March 3, 2021 Filing 37 Notice of Appearance filed by Christopher R. Kiger on behalf of All Defendants. (Kiger, Christopher)
March 3, 2021 Filing 36 Financial Disclosure Statement by Harley-Davidson Motor Company Group, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Harley-Davidson, Inc. for Harley-Davidson Motor Company Group, LLC. (Warner, Kirk)
March 3, 2021 Filing 35 Notice of Appearance filed by Kirk G. Warner on behalf of All Defendants. (Warner, Kirk)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING - The court VACATES the transferring courts August 31, 2020, scheduling order, and lifts the stay of the same entered by the transferring court on December 10, 2020. The court orders otherwise, a supplemental Rule 26(f) conference must occur on or before 14 days from entry of this order. The report and plan shall be filed with the court within 14 days after the supplemental Rule 26(f) conference. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 2/10/2021. (A copy of this Order was sent via US mail to all out of district counsel of record.) (Collins, S.)
February 8, 2021 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Collins, S.)
January 27, 2021 Filing 33 Notice to Parties regarding Transfer of Case to the Eastern District of North Carolina. Counsel should read the notice in its entirety for additional information. (Rudd, D.)
January 27, 2021 Filing 32 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Middle. Case Number 1:20-cv-00528. Transfer order and docket sheet obtained from transferring district.
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry)1.Defendants Motion to Transfer, (Doc. 20), is GRANTED IN PART.2.The Clerk of Court SHALL TRANSFER this case to the Eastern District of North Carolina.3.Defendants Motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE in all other respects. (eo) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/27/2021.]
January 26, 2021 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re #20 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) and to Apply North Carolina Law filed by Harley-Davidson Motor Company Group, LLC (eo) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/27/2021.]
December 21, 2020 Filing 29 REPLY BRIEF re #20 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) and to Apply North Carolina Law filed by Harley-Davidson Motor Company Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Shienvold, Adam) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/27/2021.]
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Motion to Stay all case management dates in this matter are STAYED and shall be reset as necessary following the Court's decision on the pending motion to transfer. (eo) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/27/2021.]
December 10, 2020 Filing 27 Joint MOTION to Stay by William Alex Rouse.(O'Neill, Michael) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/27/2021.]
December 7, 2020 Filing 26 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #22 MOTION for Extension of Time to Plaintiff Requests Seven Additional Days to File a Response and Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue and Apply North Carolina Law, #20 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) and to Apply North Carolina Law filed by William Alex Rouse. (Attachments: #1 RESPONSE TO MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE)(O'Neill, Michael) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/27/2021.]
December 7, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Doc. 25 deleted and refiled as Doc. 26. (pjr) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/27/2021.]
December 7, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to refile Doc. 25 using the event: Civil Events Motions and Related Filings Responses and Replies (Briefs)- Brief in Opposition (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions). (pjr) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/27/2021.]
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Extend Time (eo) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/27/2021.]
November 27, 2020 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by William Alex Rouse re #22 MOTION for Extension of Time to Plaintiff Requests Seven Additional Days to File a Response and Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue and Apply North Carolina Law (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Concurrence)(Suda, Corey) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/27/2021.]
November 27, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to Plaintiff Requests Seven Additional Days to File a Response and Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue and Apply North Carolina Law by William Alex Rouse.(Suda, Corey) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/27/2021.]
November 27, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file a certificate of service and a certificate of concurrence/non concurrence for document 22 (mw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/27/2021.]
November 16, 2020 Filing 21 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #20 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) and to Apply North Carolina Law filed by Harley-Davidson Motor Company Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit E)(Shienvold, Adam) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/27/2021.]
November 16, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) and to Apply North Carolina Law by Harley-Davidson Motor Company Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shienvold, Adam) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/27/2021.]
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER #2- Practice order (eo) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/27/2021.]
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER #2- Practice order (eo) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/27/2021.]
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER #1- STANDARD CASE MANAGEMENT TRACK Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/3/2021 Jury Selection set for 6/2/2021 09:30AM before Chief Judge John E. Jones III. See order for all deadlines. (eo) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/27/2021.]
August 27, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis P. Ziemba on behalf of Harley-Davidson Motor Company Group, LLC (Ziemba, Dennis) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/27/2021.]
August 26, 2020 Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Harley-Davidson Motor Company Group, LLC. (Ziemba, Dennis) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/27/2021.]
July 7, 2020 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE REPORT. (Suda, Corey) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/27/2021.]
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 8/31/2020 09:15 AM before Chief Judge John E. Jones III. See court calendar for dates which must be utilized in the JCMP when a trial term is selected. See order for call instructions. (eo) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/27/2021.]
July 2, 2020 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Harley-Davidson Motor Company Group, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Harley-Davidson, Inc., Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc. for Harley-Davidson Motor Company Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ziemba, Dennis) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/27/2021.]
July 2, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by Harley-Davidson Motor Company Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ziemba, Dennis) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/27/2021.]
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference reset for 8/31/2020 at a time to be determined.(eo) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/27/2021.]
June 24, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION PLAINTIFF'S JOINT MOTION FOR ADJOURNMENT , filed by William Alex Rouse.(O'Neill, Michael) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/27/2021.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by William Alex Rouse.(Suda, Corey) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/27/2021.]
June 4, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is reminded to file brief in support for document 4 as a separate docket entry using the event: Civil Events, Motions and Related Filings, Responses and Replies (Briefs), Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions). (pjr) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/27/2021.]
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Amend/Correct (eo) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/27/2021.]
May 21, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by William Alex Rouse. (O'Neill, Michael) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/27/2021.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 4 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by William Alex Rouse.(O'Neill, Michael) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/27/2021.]
May 20, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file brief in support for document 4 as a separate docket entry using the event: Civil Events, Motions and Related Filings, Responses and Replies (Briefs), Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) (mfa) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/27/2021.]
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 6/29/2020 11:30 AM. See order for call instructions. Counsel MUST utilize the dates on the attached court calendar in their JCMP when a trial term is selected. (eo) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/27/2021.]
April 1, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (pjr) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/27/2021.]
April 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-5051561), filed by William Alex Rouse.(pjr) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/27/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rouse v. Harley-Davidson, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harley-Davidson Motor Company Group, LLC
Represented By: Adam M. Shienvold
Represented By: Dennis P. Ziemba
Represented By: Christopher R. Kiger
Represented By: Kirk G. Warner
Represented By: Amelia L. Serrat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harley-Davidson, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher R. Kiger
Represented By: Kirk G. Warner
Represented By: Amelia L. Serrat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harley-Davidson Motor Company, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher R. Kiger
Represented By: Kirk G. Warner
Represented By: Amelia L. Serrat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harley-Davidson Motor Company Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harley-Davidson Motor Company
Represented By: Christopher R. Kiger
Represented By: Kirk G. Warner
Represented By: Amelia L. Serrat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harley Davidson Motor Co., Inc.
Represented By: Christopher R. Kiger
Represented By: Kirk G. Warner
Represented By: Amelia L. Serrat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harley-Davidson Motor Company Operations, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher R. Kiger
Represented By: Kirk G. Warner
Represented By: Amelia L. Serrat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harley-Davidson Motor Co.
Represented By: Christopher R. Kiger
Represented By: Kirk G. Warner
Represented By: Amelia L. Serrat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Alex Rouse
Represented By: Michael J. O'Neill
Represented By: Corey S. Suda
Represented By: Michael A. Kornbluth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?