Symetra Life Insurance Company v. Estate of Cassia Renee Duval et al
Plaintiff: Symetra Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Melissa Jones, James Jacob Jones, Jr., David Todd Duval, Estate of Cassia Renee Duval and James Isaac Jones, Jr.
Case Number: 5:2021cv00237
Filed: June 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2021 Filing 19 Affidavit of Service for Amended Complaint filed by Symetra Life Insurance Company served on James Isaac Jones, Jr. on July 15, 2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - UPS tracking without signature) (Leigh, Rebecca) Modified on 7/29/2021 to label exhibit (Collins, S.).
July 29, 2021 Notice to Counsel regarding: #19 Affidavit of Service. Counsel indicated the incorrect division. In future filings, please reference the Western Division in the case caption. In addition, counsel did not properly identify exhibits pursuant to Section V.E. of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual (i.e., "Exhibit" is not a sufficient description). The deputy clerk corrected the docket entry. No action by counsel required. (Collins, S.)
July 28, 2021 SECOND NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #17 Affidavit of Service, #18 Affidavit of Service. Filing is not text searchable. Local Civil Rule 5.1 and Section IV(A) of the court's CM/ECF policies and procedures manual require that all documents submitted for filing be in a text searchable format. Counsel is directed to refile. Instructions for how to make a document text searchable is located on the courts website under the "CM/ECF" section in the "instructional guides" category. In addition, the attachments/exhibits (pages 3-7 of DE17 and pages 4-5 of DE18) should be filed as separate pdfs attached to the main document. See Section V.E.1(d) of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. (Collins, S.)
July 23, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #17 Affidavit of Service, #18 Affidavit of Service. Filing is not text searchable. Local Civil Rule 5.1 and Section IV(A) of the court's CM/ECF policies and procedures manual require that all documents submitted for filing be in a text searchable format. Counsel is directed to refile. Instructions for how to make a document text searchable is located on the courts website under the "CM/ECF" section in the "instructional guides" category. In addition, the attachments/exhibits (pages 3-7 of DE17 and pages 4-5 of DE18) should be filed as separate pdfs attached to the main document. See Section V.E.1(d) of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. (Collins, S.)
July 21, 2021 Filing 18 **CORRECTED AND REFILED AT #19 ** Affidavit of Service for Amended Complaint filed by Symetra Life Insurance Company served on James Isaac Jones, Jr. on July 15, 2021. (Leigh, Rebecca) Modified on 7/29/2021 (Collins, S.).
July 19, 2021 Filing 17 Affidavit of Service for Crossclaim filed by David Todd Duval, Estate of Cassia Renee Duval, Melissa Jones served on James Isaac Jones, Jr. on 07-15-2021. (Gottsegen, Adam)
July 13, 2021 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Crossclaim Defendant James Isaac Jones, Jr. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Collins, S.)
July 13, 2021 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Defendant James Isaac Jones, Jr. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Collins, S.)
July 13, 2021 Notice to Counsel regarding: #9 Answer to Amended Complaint, Crossclaim. Counsel indicated the incorrect division. In future filings, please reference the Western Division in the case caption. No action by counsel required. (Collins, S.)
July 12, 2021 Filing 14 Notice filed by David Todd Duval, Estate of Cassia Renee Duval, Melissa Jones regarding #9 Answer to Amended Complaint, Crossclaim Civil Summons. (Gottsegen, Adam)
July 12, 2021 Filing 13 Notice filed by Symetra Life Insurance Company Civil Summons. (Leigh, Rebecca)
June 22, 2021 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Estate of Cassia Renee Duval. Estate of Cassia Renee Duval waiver sent on 6/21/2021, answer due 8/20/2021. (Gottsegen, Adam)
June 22, 2021 Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by David Todd Duval. David Todd Duval waiver sent on 6/21/2021, answer due 8/20/2021. (Gottsegen, Adam)
June 22, 2021 Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Melissa Jones. Melissa Jones waiver sent on 6/21/2021, answer due 8/20/2021. (Gottsegen, Adam)
June 21, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against James Jacob Jones, Jr. by David Todd Duval, Estate of Cassia Renee Duval, Melissa Jones. (Gottsegen, Adam)
June 21, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Adam M Gottsegen on behalf of David Todd Duval, Estate of Cassia Renee Duval, Melissa Jones. (Gottsegen, Adam)
June 15, 2021 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Collins, S.)
June 10, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT Interpleader against All Defendants, filed by Symetra Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Leigh, Rebecca) Modified on 6/15/2021 to revise docket text. (Collins, S.).
June 4, 2021 Filing 6 CORRECTED COMPLAINT against Symetra Life Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6068973.), filed by Symetra Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit- Beneficiary Statement) (Leigh, Rebecca) Modified on 6/4/2021 to describe exhibit. (Rudd, D.)
June 2, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint. Counsel is directed to refile because the attachments/exhibits (page 6) should be filed as a separate pdf attached to the main document. See Section V.E.1(d) of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. (Rudd, D.)
June 2, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint. Filing is not text searchable. Local Civil Rule 5.1 requires that all documents submitted for filing be in a text searchable format. (Rudd, D.)
June 1, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Estate of Cassia Renee Duval by Symetra Life Insurance Company. Waiver of Service due by 7/6/2021. (Leigh, Rebecca)
June 1, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to David Todd Duval by Symetra Life Insurance Company. Waiver of Service due by 7/6/2021. (Leigh, Rebecca)
June 1, 2021 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Symetra Life Insurance Company (Leigh, Rebecca)
June 1, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Rebecca A. Leigh on behalf of Symetra Life Insurance Company. (Leigh, Rebecca)
June 1, 2021 Filing 1 CORRECTED COMPLAINT REFILED AT DE #6 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6068973.), filed by Symetra Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Leigh, Rebecca) Modified on 6/4/2021 to reflect the refiling of the of the corrected complaint. (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Symetra Life Insurance Company v. Estate of Cassia Renee Duval et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Symetra Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Rebecca A. Leigh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Jones
Represented By: Adam M Gottsegen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Jacob Jones, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Todd Duval
Represented By: Adam M Gottsegen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Cassia Renee Duval
Represented By: Adam M Gottsegen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Isaac Jones, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?