Precision Siding and Windows Inc. v. Ridgley et al
Plaintiff: Precision Siding and Windows Inc.
Defendant: Steel Works and Supply Inc., Daniel Hickman, Jeffrey Hickman and Chris Ridgley
Case Number: 5:2021cv00244
Filed: June 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/2/2021. (Stouch, L.)
August 2, 2021 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Stouch, L.)
July 30, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by Daniel Hickman, Jeffrey Hickman, Chris Ridgley, Steel Works and Supply Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint from State Action, #2 Exhibit Copyright Registration Information) (Bain, Edgar)
July 28, 2021 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Edgar R. Bain on behalf of All Defendants. (Bain, Edgar)
June 15, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT Notice of Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Precision Siding and Windows Inc. (Attachments: #1 redline of Amended Complaint, #2 clean copy Amended Complaint) (Haas, Emily)
June 15, 2021 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Precision Siding and Windows Inc.. All Defendants. (Haas, Emily)
June 4, 2021 Filing 7 Financial Disclosure Statement by Precision Siding and Windows Inc. (Haas, Emily)
June 4, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Counsel for Chris Ridgley, Steel Works and Supply Inc., Jeffrey Hickman, and Daniel Hickmannd on June 4, 2021 by Precision Siding and Windows Inc.. Waiver of Service due by 7/5/2021. (Haas, Emily)
June 4, 2021 Filing 5 Notice filed by Precision Siding and Windows Inc. Civil Cover Sheet. (Haas, Emily)
June 4, 2021 Filing 4 COPYRIGHT REPORT: Copy of report and complaint forwarded to Register of Copyrights, U.S. Copyright Office, 101 Independence Ave. S.E., Washington, D.C. 20559-6000 via US Mail on June 4, 2021. (Rudd, D.)
June 4, 2021 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Precision Siding and Windows Inc. (Haas, Emily) (Main Document 3 flattened and replaced on 6/10/2021) (Edwards, S.).
June 4, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Emily M. Haas on behalf of Precision Siding and Windows Inc.. (Haas, Emily)
June 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6076186.), filed by Precision Siding and Windows Inc. (Haas, Emily)
June 4, 2021 Notice to Counsel - No Summons provided for issuance or Waiver of Service filed. (Rudd, D.)
June 4, 2021 Notice to Counsel regarding: #3 Financial Disclosure Statement - Counsel is reminded that the filing user must lock or flatten the PDF document. Failure to flatten documents may result in the clerks office issuing a notice of deficiency. Counsel should "flatten" (the financial disclosure statement) prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. *No further action is needed. (Rudd, D.)
June 4, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint - Counsel failed to file a JS44 Civil Cover Sheet as required by the Court. Counsel should file a Cover Sheet using the event "Notice-Other" as soon as possible. (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Precision Siding and Windows Inc. v. Ridgley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Precision Siding and Windows Inc.
Represented By: Emily M. Haas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steel Works and Supply Inc.
Represented By: Edgar R. Bain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Hickman
Represented By: Edgar R. Bain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Hickman
Represented By: Edgar R. Bain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Ridgley
Represented By: Edgar R. Bain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?