Anders v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: George Anders
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 5:2021cv00290
Filed: July 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 206
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Returned Executed by Personal Service on US Attorney as to Kilolo Kijakazi served on 8/4/2021, answer due 10/3/2021. (Collins, S.)
August 11, 2021 Filing 8 Process Receipt and Return for Summons and Complaint served on Commissioner of Social Security on 8/4/21. (Collins, S.)
August 11, 2021 Filing 7 Process Receipt and Return for Summons and Complaint served on Acting US Attorney General on 8/3/21. (Collins, S.)
July 15, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Collins, S.)
July 15, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi filed by George Anders. (Collins, S.)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is DIRECTED to file the complaint and issue the summonses prepared by plaintiff [D.E. 1-2 and 1-3]. The U.S. Marshal is DIRECTED to serve defendant by delivering each summons to the addressee listed in the summons along with a copy of the complaint, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(i)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers on 7/15/2021. (Collins, S.)
July 15, 2021 Remark - Certified copy of Order #4 and file-stamped copies of summonses, complaint, notice of appearance and financial disclosure statements forwarded to U.S. Marshal, along with USM-285 forms. (Collins, S.)
July 14, 2021 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Collins, S.)
July 12, 2021 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by George Anders (Hall, Charlotte)
July 12, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Charlotte Williams Hall on behalf of George Anders. (Hall, Charlotte)
July 12, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by George Anders. (Attachments: #1 US Marshal Form, #2 Complaint, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hall, Charlotte)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anders v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Anders
Represented By: Charlotte Williams Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?