SSS Holdings, LLC et al v. Selective Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: SSS Holdings, LLC and 4318 Medical Park Drive, LLC
Defendant: Selective Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 5:2021cv00296
Filed: July 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2021 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance filed by Harris McRae Watkins on behalf of Selective Insurance Company of America. (Watkins, Harris)
August 10, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Selective Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Bryan, James)
August 10, 2021 Filing 10 Financial Disclosure Statement by Selective Insurance Company of America (Bryan, James)
August 10, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by James W. Bryan on behalf of Selective Insurance Company of America. (Bryan, James)
August 10, 2021 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Sellers, N.)
August 10, 2021 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #1 Complaint. Defendant has up to and including September 13, 2021, to file the Answer. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/10/2021. (Schline, K.)
July 14, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Selective Insurance Company of America. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Stouch, L.)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Redesignating Division to Western Division. This case is redesignated as a Western Division case. The Honorable James C. Dever III, United States District Judge, will remain the presiding judge. All future documents shall reflect the new case number of 5:21-CV-296-D. No further filing shall be made in 4:21-CV-95-D. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/14/2021. (Stouch, L.)
July 14, 2021 Notice to Counsel - This case should have been filed in the Western Division. The Clerk will enter a reassignment order. (Stouch, L.)
July 14, 2021 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Stouch, L.)
July 13, 2021 Filing 6 Financial Disclosure Statement by SSS Holdings, LLC (Jessup, Robert)
July 13, 2021 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by 4318 Medical Park Drive, LLC (Jessup, Robert)
July 13, 2021 Filing 4 Notice filed by 4318 Medical Park Drive, LLC, SSS Holdings, LLC Civil Cover Sheet. (Jessup, Robert)
July 13, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Robert Henry Jessup, IV on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Jessup, Robert)
July 13, 2021 Filing 2 Notice filed by 4318 Medical Park Drive, LLC, SSS Holdings, LLC Proposed Summons. (Jessup, Robert)
July 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6134350.), filed by SSS Holdings, LLC, 4318 Medical Park Drive, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Policy, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B Proof of Loss, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C HiMark Report) (Jessup, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SSS Holdings, LLC et al v. Selective Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SSS Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Robert Henry Jessup, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 4318 Medical Park Drive, LLC
Represented By: Robert Henry Jessup, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selective Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Harris McRae Watkins
Represented By: James W. Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?