Mangum v. Oxygen Media, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Crystal Gail Mangum
Defendant: Oxygen Media, LLC and Jennifer Geisser
Case Number: 5:2021cv00337
Filed: August 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2021 Filing 15 Rule 12 Letter Issued as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7, and Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1), 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6). Response due by 11/11/2021. Sent to Crystal Gail Mangum at Anson Correctional Institution P.O. Box 280 Polkton, NC 28135 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
October 18, 2021 Filing 14 Memorandum in Support regarding #13 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7, and Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1), 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) filed by Oxygen Media, LLC. (McGuire, Matthew)
October 18, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7, and Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1), 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) filed by Oxygen Media, LLC. (McGuire, Matthew)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Oxygen Media, LLC answer due 10/20/2021. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 9/29/2021. Sent to Crystal Gail Mangum at Anson Correctional Institution via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
September 29, 2021 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. (Sellers, N.)
September 28, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint filed by Oxygen Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (McGuire, Matthew)
September 28, 2021 Filing 10 Financial Disclosure Statement by Oxygen Media, LLC identifying Corporate Parent NBCUniversal Media LLC for Oxygen Media, LLC. (McGuire, Matthew)
September 28, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Michael A. Kaeding on behalf of Oxygen Media, LLC. (Kaeding, Michael)
September 28, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew Patrick McGuire on behalf of Oxygen Media, LLC. (McGuire, Matthew)
September 27, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant Jennifer Geisser filed by Crystal Gail Mangum. (Sellers, N.)
September 22, 2021 Filing 6 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Oxygen Media, LLC c/o Christopher Boyd on 9/8/2021. (Sellers, N.)
August 23, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Manual Filing Exhibit Disk R filed by Crystal Gail Mangum. (Rudd, D.)
August 23, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Jennifer Geisser, Oxygen Media, LLC. (Summons issued at intake) (Rudd, D.)
August 23, 2021 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Crystal Gail Mangum. (Rudd, D.)
August 23, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Crystal Gail Mangum. (Rudd, D.)
August 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jennifer Geisser, Oxygen Media, LLC (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number RAL086791), filed by Crystal Gail Mangum. (Attachments: #1 Index (Schedule) of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, A2, A3, A4- Online article by Oxygen, #3 Exhibit B, B2, B3- Letter from Harr to Oxygen dated 5/14/2020, #4 Exhibit C, C2, C3, C4- Letter from Harr to Geisser/Oxygen dated 4/26/21 and unopened enveope returned to sender received by Harr on 5/17/21, #5 Exhibit D, D2- Email from Harr to all NC Legislators about Mangum's no-crime wrongful conviction, dated 2/11/2015, #6 Exhibit E, E2 through E8- Report by r. Wecht on Mangum's case/review of Nichls' 4/14/2011 autopsy report, dated 10/5/2019, #7 Exhibit F- Letter rom Harr to RAL-5 News counse seekin amendment to its 2013 and 2014 articles, ated 7/9/2020, #8 Exhibit G, G2- Letter from Harr to WRAL-5 News counse dated 7/30/2020, #9 Exhibit H, H2, H3- Email from unidentified individual to Mangum's attorney sent 4/14/2011, #10 Exhibit I, I2- Email exchange between Harr and Dr. Wecht sent 11/27/2019 with a reply exchanged on 12/2/2019, #11 Exhibit J- Email from Dr. Wecht to Harr expressing his disappointment at the media's refusal to revisit Mangum's case dated 4/3/20, #12 Exhibit K, K2, K3- Letter fro Harr to CBS-17 Genera Manager John Lewis dated 8/4/21 and John Lewis email response dated 8/9/21, #13 Exhibit L- Email from Harr to Dr. Wecht sent 8/10/21 and Dr. Wecht's email reply sent 8/11/21, #14 Exhibit M, M2- News article titled "State pathologist now under investigation loses his job" dated 11/8/2013, #15 Exhibit N, N2, N3- Letter from Harr to Cohen rqusting a review of th Nichols autopsy report, dated 5/26/2020, #16 Exhibit O, O2, O3, O4- Letter from Willingham to Cohen requesting an autopsy review dated 9/9/20, an Cohen's email reply dated 9/14/20, #17 Exhibit P- DVD titled "Justice Dies in Darkness" Parts One an Two." Plays computer/laptop, #18 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mangum v. Oxygen Media, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Gail Mangum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oxygen Media, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Patrick McGuire
Represented By: Michael A. Kaeding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Geisser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?