Roberts v. Cumberland County et al
Plaintiff: Sabara Fisher Roberts
Defendant: Cumberland County, P. A. Hernandez, P. Sansome, Sgt. J. Evans, D. Doody, L. Fermin, R. Murphy, R. Stallings and C. Parker
Case Number: 5:2021cv00356
Filed: September 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1343
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2021 Filing 41 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Cumberland County, D. Doody, J. Evans, L. Fermin, P. A. Hernandez, R. Murphy, C. Parker, P. Sansome, R. Stallings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- Proposed Order Extending Time) (Gillespie, Reginald)
October 28, 2021 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #41 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Sellers, N.)
October 28, 2021 TEXT ORDER granting Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time #41 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Defendants have up to and including December 8, 2021, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/28/2021. (Hockaday, A.)
October 14, 2021 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Sellers, N.)
October 7, 2021 Filing 40 Notice of Appearance filed by Reginald B. Gillespie, Jr on behalf of J. Evans. (Gillespie, Reginald)
October 7, 2021 Filing 39 Financial Disclosure Statement by J. Evans (Gillespie, Reginald)
October 7, 2021 Filing 38 DISREGARD. Wrong document attached. Corrected and re-filed at #40 . Notice of Appearance filed by Reginald B. Gillespie, Jr on behalf of J. Evans. (Gillespie, Reginald) Modified on 10/8/2021 (Sellers, N.).
October 7, 2021 Filing 37 Financial Disclosure Statement by R. Stallings (Mitchell, Ronnie)
October 7, 2021 Filing 36 Notice of Appearance filed by Ronnie M. Mitchell on behalf of R. Stallings. (Mitchell, Ronnie)
October 7, 2021 Filing 35 Financial Disclosure Statement by P. Sansome (Mitchell, Ronnie)
October 7, 2021 Filing 34 Notice of Appearance filed by Ronnie M. Mitchell on behalf of P. Sansome. (Mitchell, Ronnie)
October 7, 2021 Filing 33 Financial Disclosure Statement by C. Parker (Mitchell, Ronnie)
October 7, 2021 Filing 32 Notice of Appearance filed by Ronnie M. Mitchell on behalf of C. Parker. (Mitchell, Ronnie)
October 7, 2021 Filing 31 Financial Disclosure Statement by R. Murphy (Mitchell, Ronnie)
October 7, 2021 Filing 30 Notice of Appearance filed by Ronnie M. Mitchell on behalf of R. Murphy. (Mitchell, Ronnie)
October 7, 2021 Filing 29 Financial Disclosure Statement by P. A. Hernandez (Mitchell, Ronnie)
October 7, 2021 Filing 28 Notice of Appearance filed by Ronnie M. Mitchell on behalf of P. A. Hernandez. (Mitchell, Ronnie)
October 7, 2021 Filing 27 Financial Disclosure Statement by L. Fermin (Mitchell, Ronnie)
October 7, 2021 Filing 26 Notice of Appearance filed by Ronnie M. Mitchell on behalf of L. Fermin. (Mitchell, Ronnie)
October 7, 2021 Filing 25 Financial Disclosure Statement by D. Doody (Mitchell, Ronnie)
October 7, 2021 Filing 24 Notice of Appearance filed by Ronnie M. Mitchell on behalf of D. Doody. (Mitchell, Ronnie)
October 7, 2021 Filing 23 Financial Disclosure Statement by Cumberland County (Mitchell, Ronnie)
October 7, 2021 Filing 22 Notice of Appearance filed by Ronnie M. Mitchell on behalf of Cumberland County. (Mitchell, Ronnie)
October 7, 2021 Filing 21 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Sabara Fisher Roberts. R. Stallings waiver sent on 9/7/2021, answer due 11/6/2021. (Coyle, John)
October 7, 2021 Filing 20 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Sabara Fisher Roberts. P. Sansome waiver sent on 9/7/2021, answer due 11/6/2021. (Coyle, John)
October 7, 2021 Filing 19 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Sabara Fisher Roberts. C. Parker waiver sent on 9/7/2021, answer due 11/6/2021. (Coyle, John)
October 7, 2021 Filing 18 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Sabara Fisher Roberts. R. Murphy waiver sent on 9/7/2021, answer due 11/6/2021. (Coyle, John)
October 7, 2021 Filing 17 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Sabara Fisher Roberts. P. A. Hernandez waiver sent on 9/7/2021, answer due 11/6/2021. (Coyle, John)
October 7, 2021 Filing 16 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Sabara Fisher Roberts. L. Fermin waiver sent on 9/7/2021, answer due 11/6/2021. (Coyle, John)
October 7, 2021 Filing 15 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Sabara Fisher Roberts. D. Doody waiver sent on 9/7/2021, answer due 11/6/2021. (Coyle, John)
October 7, 2021 Filing 14 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Sabara Fisher Roberts. Cumberland County waiver sent on 9/7/2021, answer due 11/6/2021. (Coyle, John)
October 7, 2021 Filing 13 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Sabara Fisher Roberts. J. Evans waiver sent on 9/7/2021, answer due 11/6/2021. (Coyle, John)
September 29, 2021 Filing 12 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by S Lee Merritt on behalf of Sabara Fisher Roberts. (Merritt, S)
September 20, 2021 Filing 11 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Daniel N. Purtell on behalf of Sabara Fisher Roberts. (Purtell, Daniel)
September 17, 2021 Filing 10 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by John J. Coyle on behalf of Sabara Fisher Roberts. (Coyle, John)
September 9, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Allen W. Rogers on behalf of Sabara Fisher Roberts. (Rogers, Allen)
September 9, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Allen W. Rogers on behalf of Sabara Fisher Roberts. (Rogers, Allen)
September 9, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Allen W. Rogers on behalf of Sabara Fisher Roberts. (Rogers, Allen)
September 9, 2021 Notice to Counsel regarding: #9 Notice of Special Appearance, #7 Notice of Special Appearance, #8 Notice of Special Appearance. Each attorney must file his or her own notice of appearance. The CM/ECF electronic filing and docketing system does not recognize filings made on behalf of other attorneys for purposes of appearing on the court's docket. The appropriate form for becoming a registered e-filer in this district is available to out-of-district counsel on this court's website www.nced.uscourts.gov. (Sellers, N.)
September 7, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to DEPUTY P.A. HERNANDEZ, DEPUTY P. SANSOME, DEPUTY J. EVANS, DEPUTY D. DOODY, DEPUTY L. FERMIN, DEPUTY R. MURPHY, SGT. R. STALLINGS, CAPTAIN C. PARKER on 09/07/2021 by Sabara Fisher Roberts. Waiver of Service due by 10/7/2021. (Rogers, Allen)
September 7, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Cumberland County on 09/07/2021 by Sabara Fisher Roberts. Waiver of Service due by 10/7/2021. (Rogers, Allen)
September 7, 2021 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Sabara Fisher Roberts (Attachments: #1 Supplement) (Rogers, Allen)
September 7, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Allen W. Rogers on behalf of Sabara Fisher Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Supplement) (Rogers, Allen)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Redesignating Division - At the direction of the Court, and for the continued efficient administration of justice, the above-captioned case is redesignated as a Western Division case. The Honorable James C. Dever III, United States District Judge, will remain the presiding judge. All future documents should reflect the new case number of 5:21-CV-356-D. No further filing shall be made in 2:21-CV-39-D. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 9/7/2021. (Sellers, N.)
September 7, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Sabara Fisher Roberts. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
September 7, 2021 Notice to Counsel - This case should have been filed in the Western division. Th Clerk will enter a reassignment order correcting the error. (Rudd, D.)
September 7, 2021 Notice to Counsel regarding: #1 Complaint. Counsel is reminded that all parties should be added at case opening. No further action is needed. (Rudd, D.)
September 7, 2021 Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
September 7, 2021 Notice to Counsel - No Summons provided for issuance or Waiver of Service filed. (Rudd, D.)
September 7, 2021 Case transferred in from Northern Division on 09/07/2021. Old Case Number 2:21-cv-39. (Sellers, N.)
September 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against cumberland county ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 04176216988.), filed by Sabara Fisher Roberts, cumberland county. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rogers, Allen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Cumberland County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabara Fisher Roberts
Represented By: Allen W. Rogers
Represented By: Daniel N. Purtell
Represented By: John J. Coyle
Represented By: S Lee Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cumberland County
Represented By: Ronnie M. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. A. Hernandez
Represented By: Ronnie M. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Sansome
Represented By: Ronnie M. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. J. Evans
Represented By: Reginald B. Gillespie, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Doody
Represented By: Ronnie M. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Fermin
Represented By: Ronnie M. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Murphy
Represented By: Ronnie M. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Stallings
Represented By: Ronnie M. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Parker
Represented By: Ronnie M. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?