Ratchford et al v. Gist & Hendrix, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Abigail Ratchford, Cielo Jean Gibson, Dessie Mitcheson, Jennifer Zharinovan, Jesse Golden, Jessa Hinton, Katarina Van Derham, Laurie Romeo, Lina Posada, Lucy Pinder, Nikki Leigh, Paola Canas, Rachel Koren, Sandra Valencia, Sarah Stage, Sara Underwood, Tiffany Toth Gray, Ursula Mayes, Jaime Edmondson Longoria and Rhian Sugden
Defendant: Gist & Hendrix, LLC d/b/a Secrets Cabaret and William Scott Hendrix
Case Number: 5:2021cv00417
Filed: October 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Referring Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2021 Filing 26 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Tiffany Toth Gray, Jessa Hinton, Cielo Jean Gibson, Ursula Mayes, Abigail Ratchford, Sandra Valencia, Lucy Pinder, Rachel Koren, Jaime Edmondson Longoria, Dessie Mitcheson, Katarina Van Derham, Lina Posada, Paola Canas, Nikki Leigh, Sara Underwood, Jennifer Zharinovan, Rhian Sugden, Laurie Romeo, Sarah Stage, Jesse Golden. Gist & Hendrix, LLC waiver sent on 11/30/2021, answer due 1/29/2022. (Gambale, Matthew)
December 10, 2021 Filing 25 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Tiffany Toth Gray, Jessa Hinton, Cielo Jean Gibson, Ursula Mayes, Abigail Ratchford, Sandra Valencia, Lucy Pinder, Rachel Koren, Jaime Edmondson Longoria, Dessie Mitcheson, Katarina Van Derham, Lina Posada, Paola Canas, Nikki Leigh, Sara Underwood, Jennifer Zharinovan, Rhian Sugden, Laurie Romeo, Sarah Stage, Jesse Golden. William Scott Hendrix waiver sent on 11/30/2021, answer due 1/29/2022. (Gambale, Matthew)
November 23, 2021 Filing 24 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by John V. Golaszewski on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Golaszewski, John)
October 20, 2021 Filing 23 Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew Ryan Gambale on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Gambale, Matthew)
October 19, 2021 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. At the direction of the Court and for the efficient administration of justice, this case is reassigned to United States District Judge James C. Dever III for all further proceedings. United States District Judge Terrence W. Boyle is no longer assigned to the case. All future filings should reflect the revised case number of 5:21-CV-417-D. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/19/2021. (Hockaday, A.)
October 14, 2021 Filing 22 Summons Issued as to Gist & Hendrix, LLC, William Scott Hendrix. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
October 14, 2021 Filing 21 Financial Disclosure Statement by Jennifer Zharinovan (Gambale, Matthew)
October 14, 2021 Filing 20 Financial Disclosure Statement by Katarina Van Derham (Gambale, Matthew)
October 14, 2021 Filing 19 Financial Disclosure Statement by Sandra Valencia (Gambale, Matthew)
October 14, 2021 Filing 18 Financial Disclosure Statement by Sara Underwood (Gambale, Matthew)
October 14, 2021 Filing 17 Financial Disclosure Statement by Rhian Sugden (Gambale, Matthew)
October 14, 2021 Filing 16 Financial Disclosure Statement by Sarah Stage (Gambale, Matthew)
October 14, 2021 Filing 15 Financial Disclosure Statement by Laurie Romeo (Gambale, Matthew)
October 14, 2021 Filing 14 Financial Disclosure Statement by Abigail Ritchford (Gambale, Matthew)
October 14, 2021 Filing 13 Financial Disclosure Statement by Lina Posada (Gambale, Matthew)
October 14, 2021 Filing 12 Financial Disclosure Statement by Lucy Pinder (Gambale, Matthew)
October 14, 2021 Filing 11 Financial Disclosure Statement by Dessie Mitcheson (Gambale, Matthew)
October 14, 2021 Filing 10 Financial Disclosure Statement by Ursula Mayes (Gambale, Matthew)
October 14, 2021 Filing 9 Financial Disclosure Statement by Jaime Edmondson Longoria (Gambale, Matthew)
October 14, 2021 Filing 8 Financial Disclosure Statement by Nikki Leigh (Gambale, Matthew)
October 14, 2021 Filing 7 Financial Disclosure Statement by Rachel Koren (Gambale, Matthew)
October 14, 2021 Filing 6 Financial Disclosure Statement by Jessa Hinton (Gambale, Matthew)
October 14, 2021 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by Tiffany Toth Gray (Gambale, Matthew)
October 14, 2021 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Jesse Golden (Gambale, Matthew)
October 14, 2021 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Cielo Jean Gibson (Gambale, Matthew)
October 14, 2021 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Paola Canas (Gambale, Matthew)
October 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6275154.), filed by Tiffany Toth Gray, Jessa Hinton, Cielo Jean Gibson, Ursula Mayes, Abigail Ritchford, Sandra Valencia, Lucy Pinder, Rachel Koren, Jaime Edmondson Longoria, Dessie Mitcheson, Katarina Van Derham, Lina Posada, Paola Canas, Nikki Leigh, Sara Underwood, Jennifer Zharinovan, Rhian Sugden, Laurie Romeo, Sarah Stage, Jesse Golden. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Abigail Ratchford Photos, #2 Exhibit B - CJ Gibson Photos, #3 Exhibit C - Dessie Mitcheson Photos, #4 Exhibit D - Jennifer Zharinova Photos, #5 Exhibit E - Jesse Golden Photos, #6 Exhibit F - Jessica Hinton Photos, #7 Exhibit G - Katarina Van Derham Photos, #8 Exhibit H - Laurie Young Romero Photos, #9 Exhibit I - Lina Posado Photos, #10 Exhibit J - Lucy Pinder Photos, #11 Exhibit K - Nikki Leigh Photos, #12 Exhibit L - Paola Canas Photos, #13 Exhibit M - Rachel Koren Photos, #14 Exhibit N - Sandra Valencia Photos, #15 Exhibit O - Sarah Stage Photos, #16 Exhibit P - Sara Underwood Photos, #17 Exhibit Q - Tiffany Toth Gray Photos, #18 Exhibit R - Ursual Mayes Photos, #19 Exhibit S - Jaime Edmondson Longoria Photos, #20 Exhibit T - Rhian Sugden Photos, #21 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #22 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons - Hendrix, #23 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons - Secrets) (Gambale, Matthew)
October 14, 2021 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ratchford et al v. Gist & Hendrix, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abigail Ratchford
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cielo Jean Gibson
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dessie Mitcheson
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Zharinovan
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Golden
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessa Hinton
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katarina Van Derham
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Romeo
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lina Posada
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucy Pinder
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikki Leigh
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paola Canas
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Koren
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Valencia
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Stage
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Underwood
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Toth Gray
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ursula Mayes
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Edmondson Longoria
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhian Sugden
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gist & Hendrix, LLC d/b/a Secrets Cabaret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Scott Hendrix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?